Consolidated
Lead case: 3:19-md-02885

Florida Northern District Court
Judge:M Casey Rodgers
Referred: Gary R Jones
Case #: 3:22-cv-08015
Nature of Suit365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Case Filed:Jun 13, 2022
Last checked: Saturday Dec 10, 2022 4:00 AM EST
Defendant
3M COMPANY
Defendant
AEARO HOLDING LLC
Defendant
AEARO INTERMEDIATE LLC
Defendant
AEARO LLC
Defendant
AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC
Defendant
3M OCCUPATIONAL SAFETY LLC
Plaintiff
MICHAEL L. MARTINEZ
Represented By
JASON BENJAMIN WOLF
Parafinczuk & Wolf - Fort Lauderdale Fl
contact info


Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Monday, June 20, 2022
5 5 notice Notice - Other - See Separate Menu for Ntc of Appeal Options Mon 06/20 4:18 PM
NOTICE OD DESIGNATED FORUM - TXWDC by MICHAEL L. MARTINEZ (WOLF, JASON)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 14, 2022
misc Docket Annotation Tue 06/14 11:07 AM
DOCKET ANNOTATION BY COURT: NOTICE TO FILER - Please file an amended notice of designated forum for each case that does not include the district in the final text, example: District of Nevada or WDTX. This information has to be included in your final text for reporting purposes. (djb)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 13, 2022
3 3 notice Notice - Other - See Separate Menu for Ntc of Appeal Options Mon 06/13 1:26 PM
NOTICE OF DESIGNATED FORUM by MICHAEL L. MARTINEZ (WOLF, JASON)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet Mon 06/13 1:25 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET. (WOLF, JASON)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Mon 06/13 1:08 PM
COMPLAINT AND TRIAL JURY DEMAND against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AFLNDC-7183384.), filed by MICHAEL L. MARTINEZ. (WOLF, JASON)
Related: [-]