Pennsylvania Middle District Court
Judge:Jennifer P Wilson
Case #: 1:22-cv-00935
Nature of Suit480 Other Statutes - Consumer Credit
Cause15:1681 Fair Credit Reporting Act
Case Filed:Jun 13, 2022
Terminated:Mar 08, 2023
Last checked: Saturday Dec 10, 2022 4:42 AM EST
Counterclaim Defendant
Jaye Kotschessa
Represented By
Jody Thomas Lopez-Jacobs
Flitter Milz, PC
contact info
Cary L. Flitter
Flitter Milz, P.C..
contact info
Andrew M. Milz
Flitter Milz, P.C.
contact info
Counterclaim Plaintiff
Clearfield Motors, Inc.
Represented By
Walter A. Tilley, III
Stock And Leader
contact info
Jason Statler
Johnson Duffie Stewart & Weidner
contact info
Defendant
Clearfield Motors, Inc.
Represented By
Walter A. Tilley, III
Stock And Leader
contact info
John A. Statler
Johnson, Duffie, Stewart & Weidner
contact info
Jason Statler
Johnson Duffie Stewart & Weidner
contact info
Plaintiff
Jaye Kotschessa
Represented By
Jody Thomas Lopez-Jacobs
Flitter Milz, PC
contact info
Cary L. Flitter
Flitter Milz, P.C..
contact info
Andrew M. Milz
Flitter Milz, P.C.
contact info


Docket last updated: 83 minutes ago
Wednesday, March 08, 2023
16 16 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Wed 03/08 12:06 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal by Jaye Kotschessa. (Lopez-Jacobs, Jody)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 17, 2022
15 15 1 pgs order Order Mon 10/17 1:41 PM
ORDER - AND NOW, on this 17th day of October, 2022, following a case management conference with counsel on this date, IT IS ORDERED THAT counsel for Plaintiff shall provide opposing counsel with an estimated figure for attorneys fees pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 68 by October 21, 2022. Signed by Honorable Jennifer P. Wilson on 10/17/2022. (ve)
Related: [-]
14 14 order Case Management Order - Standard Track Mon 10/17 1:40 PM
CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER. Signed by Honorable Jennifer P. Wilson on 10/17/2022. (ve)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 11, 2022
12 12 misc Case Management Plan Tue 10/11 3:35 PM
CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN (Joint) by Jaye Kotschessa. (Lopez-Jacobs, Jody)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 29, 2022
11 11 notice Attorney Appearance - Entry of Appearance Thu 09/29 3:01 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Jason Statler on behalf of Clearfield Motors, Inc. (Statler, Jason)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 28, 2022
10 10 9 pgs order Order Wed 09/28 2:52 PM
CIVIL PRACTICE ORDER. Signed by Honorable Jennifer P. Wilson on 9/28/2022. (ve)
Related: [-]
9 9 order Scheduling Order Wed 09/28 2:51 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER - IT IS ORDERED THAT: The initial case management conference pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 16 will be conducted via telephone by the court on October 17, 2022, at 10:00 a.m. Plaintiffs counsel shall initiate the call when all parties are on the line to chambers at (717) 221-3970. See order for further details. Signed by Honorable Jennifer P. Wilson on 9/28/2022.(ve)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Case Management Calendar
Thursday, August 18, 2022
8 8 notice Attorney Appearance - Entry of Appearance Thu 08/18 9:42 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by John A. Statler on behalf of Clearfield Motors, Inc. (Statler, John)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 03, 2022
7 7 answer Answer to Counterclaim Wed 08/03 4:01 PM
Plaintiff's ANSWER to6 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim Defendant's Counterclaim by Jaye Kotschessa.(Lopez-Jacobs, Jody)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 21, 2022
6 6 answer Answer to Complaint Counterclaim Thu 07/21 11:56 AM
Defendant's ANSWER to1 Complaint , Affirmative Defenses and , COUNTERCLAIM against Jaye Kotschessa by Clearfield Motors, Inc..(Tilley, Walter)
Related: [-]
5 5 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Thu 07/21 11:53 AM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Clearfield Motors, Inc.. (Tilley, Walter)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 07, 2022
4 4 misc Letter Thu 07/07 10:22 AM
Letter from the Court to Counsel re: Case Assignment and Procedures. Signed by Honorable Jennifer P. Wilson on 7/7/22. (pjr)
Related: [-]
3 3 service Summons Returned Executed Thu 07/07 10:18 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jaye Kotschessa. Clearfield Motors, Inc. served on 6/30/2022, answer due 7/21/2022. (Lopez-Jacobs, Jody)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 13, 2022
2 2 service Summons Issued Mon 06/13 4:28 PM
Summons Issued as to Clearfield Motors, Inc. and provided TO ATTORNEY ELECTRONICALLY VIA ECF for service on Defendant(s)in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (NOTICE TO ATTORNEYS RECEIVING THE SUMMONS ELECTRONICALLY: You must print the summons and the attachment when you receive it in your e-mail and serve the complaint on all defendants in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure). (gs)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Mon 06/13 4:28 PM
COMPLAINT against Clearfield Motors, Inc. ( Filing fee $402, Receipt Number APAMDC-5973257), filed by Jaye Kotschessa.(gs)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet