Michigan Eastern District Court
Judge:Judith E Levy
Referred: David R Grand
Case #: 5:22-cv-11314
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Account Receivable
Case Filed:Jun 14, 2022
Terminated:Sep 14, 2022
Last checked: Sunday Dec 11, 2022 3:34 AM EST
Defendant
B2B Industrial Supply, LLC
Defendant
Novo Bojovic
Plaintiff
PNC Bank, National Association, a national banking association
Represented By
Erik Johnson
Plunkett Cooney
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/16/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Wednesday, September 14, 2022
8 8 order Dismissing Case - Stipulated Order Wed 09/14 2:10 PM
STIPULATED ORDER DISMISSING CASE, Signed by District Judge Judith E. Levy. (WBar)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 11, 2022
7 7 order Stipulation and Order ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings Thu 08/11 8:08 AM
STIPULATED ORDER Extending Time for Defendants to Respond to1 Complaint; Responsive Pleading due by 9/9/2022, Signed by District Judge Judith E. Levy. (WBar)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 03, 2022
6 6 service Certificate of Service/Summons Returned Executed Wed 08/03 1:47 PM
CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. B2B Industrial Supply, LLC served on 6/22/2022, answer due 7/13/2022. (Johnson, Erik)
Related: [-]
5 5 service Certificate of Service/Summons Returned Executed Wed 08/03 1:46 PM
CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Novo Bojovic served on 6/22/2022, answer due 7/13/2022. (Johnson, Erik)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 16, 2022
4 4 misc Statement of Disclosure of Corporate Affiliations Thu 06/16 3:45 PM
STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by PNC Bank, National Association, a national banking association (Johnson, Erik)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 14, 2022
3 3 service Summons Issued* Tue 06/14 12:31 PM
SUMMONS Issued for *Novo Bojovic* (NAhm)
Related: [-]
2 2 service Summons Issued* Tue 06/14 12:30 PM
SUMMONS Issued for *B2B Industrial Supply, LLC* (NAhm)
Related: [-]
1 1 5 pgs cmp Civil Case - Complaint Tue 06/14 11:23 AM
COMPLAINT filed by PNC Bank, National Association, a national banking association against B2B Industrial Supply, LLC, Novo Bojovic with Jury Demand. Plaintiff requests summons issued. Receipt No: AMIEDC-8945540 - Fee: $ 402. County of 1st Plaintiff: Oakland - County Where Action Arose: Oakland - County of 1st Defendant: Oakland. [ Previously dismissed case: No] [ Possible companion case(s): None ] (Johnson, Erik)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Note and Guaranty,
Att: 2 Exhibit B - Termination Notice 2-24-22,
Att: 3 Exhibit C - Default Letter 4-26-22
notice Notice to Parties of Consent of a Civil Action before a Magistrate Judge Option Tue 06/14 12:31 PM
A United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at[LINK:http://www.mied.uscourts.gov] (NAhm)
Related: [-]