New Jersey District Court
Judge:Karen M Williams
Referred: Elizabeth A Pascal
Case #: 1:22-cv-03816
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause28:1441 Notice of Removal--Other Contract
Case Filed:Jun 14, 2022
Terminated:Aug 17, 2022
Case in other court:Burlington County Superior Court, BUR-L-00865-22
Last checked: Sunday Dec 11, 2022 3:55 AM EST
Defendant
PORCH.COM, INC.
411 1st Avenue South Suite 501
Seattle, WA 98104
Represented By
MICHAEL A. SPIZZUCO, JR.
Brach Eichler LLC
contact info
ANTHONY M. RAINONE
Brach Eichler LLC
contact info
Defendant
JOHN DOES 1-10
Notice Only
arbtre
Plaintiff
PAUL LIBERTI
INDIVIDUALLY AND ON BEHALF OF ALL PERSONS SIMILARLY SITUATED 5 Austen Court
Medford, NJ 08055
Represented By
LEWIS G. ADLER
Law Office Of Lewis Adler
contact info
Plaintiff
SUZANNE LIBERTI
INDIVIDUALLY AND ON BEHALF OF ALL PERSONS SIMILARLY SITUATED 5 Austen Court
Medford, NJ 08055
Represented By
LEWIS G. ADLER
Law Office Of Lewis Adler
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/19/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Wednesday, August 17, 2022
23 23 misc Letter: Remand Wed 08/17 2:47 PM
Transmittal Letter for remanded case to Burlington County Courthouse 49 Rancocas Road Mount Holly, NJ 08060 State No: BUR-L-00865-22. Mailed certified copy of the Order remanding case. (dmr)
Related: [-]
22 22 order Stipulation and Order Wed 08/17 2:43 PM
AMENDED JOINT STIPULATION AND CONSENT ORDER OF REMAND. This matter is remanded to the Superior Court of New Jersey, Burlington County. Signed by Judge Karen M. Williams on 8/17/2022. (dmr)
Related: [-]
utility Terminate Civil Case Wed 08/17 2:51 PM
***Civil Case Terminated. (dmr)
Related: [-]
Saturday, August 13, 2022
21 21 misc Stipulation Sat 08/13 10:54 AM
STIPULATION AND CONSENT ORDER FOR REMAND (AMENDED) by PORCH.COM, INC.. (SPIZZUCO, MICHAEL)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 12, 2022
19 19 misc Stipulation Fri 08/12 2:14 PM
STIPULATION AND CONSENT ORDER OF REMAND by PORCH.COM, INC.. (SPIZZUCO, MICHAEL)
Related: [-]
18 18 misc Transcript Fri 08/12 1:12 PM
Transcript of Status Conference Proceedings held on 7/27/2022, before Judge ELIZABETH A. PASCAL. Court Reporter/Transcriber DIANA DOMAN TRANSCRIBING, LLC ((856) 435-7172). NOTICE REGARDING (1) REDACTION OF PERSONAL IDENTIFIERS IN TRANSCRIPTS AND (2) MOTION TO REDACT AND SEAL: The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this Transcript to comply with Fed.R.Civ.P.5.2(a) (personal identifiers). Parties seeking to redact and seal this Transcript, or portions thereof, pursuant to L.Civ.R. 5.3(g) must e-file a Motion to Redact and Seal utilizing the event `Redact and Seal Transcript/Digital Recording`. Redaction Request to Court Reporter/Transcription Agency due, but not filed, by 9/2/2022. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/12/2022. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/10/2022. (tf, )
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 11, 2022
20 20 minutes Status Conference Fri 08/12 2:27 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Karen M. Williams: Telephone Status Conference held on 8/11/2022. (Court Reporter, Sharon Ricci (267-249-8780)) (alb, )
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 03, 2022
17 17 order Scheduling Order ~Util - Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings Wed 08/03 10:55 AM
SCHEDULING ORDER resetting Deadlines as to8 First MOTION to Dismiss: Defendant's Motion to Dismiss is adjourned to 9/19/2022. Defendants initial brief addressing subject matter jurisdiction is due on 8/26/2022. Plaintiff's opposition is due on 9/6/2022 and Defendant's reply briefs are due by 9/19/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth A. Pascal on 8/3/2022. (dmr)
Related: [-]
utility Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings Wed 08/03 10:56 AM
Set/Reset Deadlines as to8 First MOTION to Dismiss . Motion set for 9/19/2022 before Judge Karen M. Williams. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (dmr)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 28, 2022
order Order ~Util - Set Hearings Thu 07/28 12:44 PM
TEXT ORDER The Court has scheduled a telephone conference for 8/11/2022 at 11:00 AM regarding the Court's Orders requiring the filing of a Joint Certification of the Citizenship of the Parties. All counsel shall dial 1-888-684-8852, Access Code: 1488577# to connect to the call. So Ordered by Judge Karen M. Williams on 7/28/22. (nar)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 27, 2022
16 16 minutes Status Conference Fri 07/29 12:16 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Elizabeth A. Pascal: Telephone Status Conference held on the record on 7/27/2022. Scheduling Order to be entered. (Court Reporter, Recorded) (dmr)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 21, 2022
14 14 misc Letter Thu 07/21 6:11 PM
Letter from Lewis G. Adler re 13 Order,. (ADLER, LEWIS)
Related: [-]
order Order Thu 07/21 12:32 PM
TEXT ORDER Within five (5) days of this Order, the parties shall file a Joint Certification of the Citizenship of the Parties as instructed in the Court`s June 16, 2022 Text Order. So Ordered by Judge Karen M. Williams on 7/21/22. (nar)
Related: [-]
order Order Thu 07/21 4:39 PM
TEXT ORDER: Plaintiff shall respond to Defendant's submission, ECF No. 11, no later than July 26, 2022. The Court will conduct a conference call on July 27, 2022, at 11:00 a.m. Counsel shall use the following dial-in information: 888-684-8852 access code 1051623. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth A. Pascal on 7/21/2022. (bda)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 18, 2022
11 11 misc Letter Mon 07/18 12:35 PM
Letter from Michael A. Spizzuco, Jr., Esq. Requesting Conference. (SPIZZUCO, MICHAEL)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 14, 2022
utility Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings Thu 07/14 9:21 AM
Set/Reset Deadlines as to8 First MOTION to Dismiss. Motion set for 9/6/2022 before Judge Karen M. Williams. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (dmr)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 13, 2022
10 10 respm Letter Rule 7.1 Wed 07/13 4:52 PM
Rule 7.1(d)(5) Letter for an automatic extension of the return date of a dispositive motion filed by PAUL LIBERTI, SUZANNE LIBERTI re8 First MOTION to Dismiss (ADLER, LEWIS)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 12, 2022
9 9 respm Brief in Support of Motion Tue 07/12 12:33 PM
BRIEF in Support filed by PORCH.COM, INC. re8 First MOTION to Dismiss (SPIZZUCO, MICHAEL)
Related: [-]
8 8 motion Dismiss Tue 07/12 12:27 PM
First MOTION to Dismiss by PORCH.COM, INC.. Responses due by 8/1/2022(SPIZZUCO, MICHAEL)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration Declaration of Nicole Pelley,
Att: 2 Exhibit Exhibit 1 to Nicole Pelley Declaration,
Att: 3 Exhibit Exhibit 2 to Nicole Pelley Declaration,
Att: 4 Declaration Declaration of Michael A. Spizzuco, Jr., Esq.,
Att: 5 Exhibit Exhibit 1 to Michael A. Spizzuco, Jr., Esq. Declaration,
Att: 6 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order
Tuesday, July 05, 2022
7 7 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement (aty) Tue 07/05 12:51 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by PORCH.COM, INC. identifying Porch Group, Inc. as Corporate Parent.. (SPIZZUCO, MICHAEL)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 29, 2022
6 6 2 pgs order Order Wed 06/29 10:47 AM
LETTER ORDER granting Defendant's request for an extension until 7/12/2022 to respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth A. Pascal on 6/28/2022. (dmr)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 27, 2022
5 5 misc Letter Mon 06/27 3:00 PM
Letter from Michael A. Spizzuco, Jr., Esq.. (SPIZZUCO, MICHAEL)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 16, 2022
qc QC - Attorney Case Opening Thu 06/16 10:01 AM
CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The case you electronically filed has been processed, however, the following deficiencies were found: Cause of Action,Party Information, . The Clerk's Office has made the appropriate changes. Please refer to the Attorney Case Opening Guide for processing electronically filed cases. (jab)
Related: [-]
qc QC - Lack of Disclosure Statement Thu 06/16 10:02 AM
CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - Please be advised, pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. Pro. 7.1, a disclosure statement is required to be filed by a nongovernmental corporate party. Please refer to the Court's website at www.njd.uscourts.gov for a form and filing instructions. (jab)
Related: [-]
notice Notice of Judicial Preferences Thu 06/16 10:02 AM
Notice of Judicial Preferences.[LINK:Click here] for the Judge's Individual Procedure Requirements. (jab)
Related: [-]
order Order re Diversity of Citizenship Thu 06/16 10:03 AM
Order in all cases in which the basis of jurisdiction is 28 U.S.C. 1332, Diversity of Citizenship: Whether or not the Court issues an Order to Show Cause or other Order directing the filing of an amended pleading or removal petition on the issue of jurisdiction, the parties in all diversity cases are required to complete and file a Joint Certification of the Citizenship of the Parties,[LINK:click here] , within 30 days of the filing of a Notice of Removal, or where the Complaint is initially filed in this Court, 30 days after an answer, other responsive pleading, or motion has been filed. Signed by Judge Karen M. Williams on 6/16/2022. (jab)
Related: [-]
utility Case Referred to Arbitration Thu 06/16 10:06 AM
CASE REFERRED to Arbitration. (jab)
Related: [-]
utility Update Answer Due Deadline Thu 06/16 10:23 AM
Clerk`s Text Order - The document4 Application for Clerk's Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order submitted by PORCH.COM, INC. has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 7/5/2022. (jab)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 14, 2022
4 4 misc Application for Clerk Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order Tue 06/14 3:41 PM
Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer as to Defendant Porch.Com, Inc.. Attorney MICHAEL A. SPIZZUCO, JR for PORCH.COM, INC. added. (SPIZZUCO, MICHAEL)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 06/14 3:22 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by ANTHONY M. RAINONE on behalf of PORCH.COM, INC. (RAINONE, ANTHONY)
Related: [-]
2 2 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 06/14 3:17 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by MICHAEL A. SPIZZUCO, JR on behalf of PORCH.COM, INC. (SPIZZUCO, MICHAEL)
Related: [-]
1 1 notice Notice of Removal Tue 06/14 3:11 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL by PORCH.COM, INC. from Burlington County Superior Court, case number BUR-L-000865-22. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 402 receipt number ANJDC-13484112), filed by PORCH.COM, INC..(SPIZZUCO, MICHAEL)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 to Notice of Removal,
Att: 2 Exhibit Exhibit 2 to Notice of Removal,
Att: 3 Civil Cover Sheet
utility Add and Terminate Judges Tue 06/14 5:19 PM
Judge Karen M. Williams and Magistrate Judge Elizabeth A. Pascal added. (dmw)
Related: [-]