Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 3:22-bk-30128

California Northern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Hannah L Blumenstiel
Case #: 3:22-ap-03027
Nature of Suit67 Bankruptcy - Dischargeability - §523(a)(4), fraud as fiduciary, embezzlement, larceny
68 Bankruptcy - Dischargeability - §523(a)(6), willful and malicious injury
62 Bankruptcy - Dischargeability - §523(a)(2), false pretenses, false representation, actual fraud
Case Filed:Jun 13, 2022
Terminated:Sep 21, 2023
Last checked: never
Defendant
Regina M. Peralta
388 Beale Street, Apt. 804
San Francisco, CA 94105
Represented By
Regina M. Peralta
contact info
Plaintiff
Anamaria Martinez
236 West Portal Ave., #185
San Francisco, CA 94127
Represented By
Ruth Elin Auerbach
Law Offices Of Ruth Elin Auerbach
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/20/2025 1:05 PM PDT
Tuesday, May 21, 2024
36 36 misc Document Tue 05/21 4:25 PM
Copy Request Form Related [+]. NOTE: Completed by Oakland Intake. BNC Notice for order was not requested/printed. (rs)
Related: [-] 30 Tentative Ruling
court Receipt Number and Filing Fee - Generic Tue 05/21 4:36 PM
Receipt Number 27EK5568, Fee Amount $2.20 Related [+]. (bg)
Related: [-] 36 Document
Thursday, September 21, 2023
court Close Adversary Case Thu 09/21 2:59 PM
Adversary Case Closed 3:22-ap-3027. (ckk)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 08, 2023
35 35 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - Electronic Order Fri 09/08 9:15 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Electronic Order Related [+]. Notice Date 09/08/2023. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 34 Default Judgment
Wednesday, September 06, 2023
34 34 order Default Judgment Wed 09/06 1:53 PM
Judgment By Default By Court (ds)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 01, 2023
misc Document Fri 09/01 10:30 PM
Returned Mail: Mail originally sent on 08/18/2023 returned as undeliverable. Returned Mail: The following order sent to Regina M. Peralta 388 Beale Street, Apt. 804 San Francisco, CA 94105-4418 on 08/18/2023 was returned as undeliverable: Order on Motion for Default Judgment (ADI Administrator court)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 31, 2023
misc Document Thu 08/31 10:30 PM
Returned Mail: Mail originally sent on 08/16/2023 returned as undeliverable. Returned Mail: The following order sent to Regina M. Peralta 388 Beale Street, Apt. 804 San Francisco, CA 94105-4418 on 08/16/2023 was returned as undeliverable: Tentative Ruling (ADI Administrator court)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 18, 2023
33 33 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - Electronic Order Fri 08/18 9:13 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Electronic Order Related [+]. Notice Date 08/18/2023. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 31 Order on Motion for Default Judgment
Wednesday, August 16, 2023
32 32 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - Electronic Order Wed 08/16 9:13 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Electronic Order Related [+]. Notice Date 08/16/2023. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 30 Tentative Ruling
31 31 order Default Judgment Wed 08/16 12:17 PM
Order Granting in Part and Denying in Part Plaintiff's Motion For Default Judgment Related [+] (ds)
Related: [-] 25 Motion for Default Judgment Filed by Plaintiff Anamaria Martinez.
Monday, August 14, 2023
30 30 order Tentative Ruling Mon 08/14 6:10 PM
Tentative Ruling on Plaintiff's Motion for Default Judgment Related [+]. (ds)
Related: [-] 25 Motion for Default Judgment filed by Counter-Defendant Anamaria Martinez, Plaintiff Anamaria Martinez
Friday, July 14, 2023
29 29 misc Certificate of Service Fri 07/14 10:11 AM
Certificate of Service Related [+]. Filed by Plaintiff Anamaria Martinez (Auerbach, Ruth). Related document(s)26 Declaration filed by Counter-Defendant Anamaria Martinez, Plaintiff Anamaria Martinez,27 Declaration filed by Counter-Defendant Anamaria Martinez, Plaintiff Anamaria Martinez,28 Notice of Hearing filed by Counter-Defendant Anamaria Martinez, Plaintiff Anamaria Martinez. Modified on 7/14/2023 (ckk)
Related: [-] 25 Motion for Default Judgment
28 28 notice Notice of Hearing Fri 07/14 9:24 AM
Notice of Hearing Related [+]. Hearing scheduled for 8/17/2023 at 02:00 PM in/via Tele/Videoconference - www.canb.uscourts.gov/calendars. Filed by Plaintiff Anamaria Martinez. (Auerbach, Ruth)
Related: [-] 25 Motion for Default Judgment filed by Counter-Defendant Anamaria Martinez, Plaintiff Anamaria Martinez
27 27 misc Declaration Fri 07/14 9:22 AM
Declaration of Ruth Elin Auerbach in Support of Related [+]. Filed by Plaintiff Anamaria Martinez (Auerbach, Ruth)
Related: [-] 25 Motion for Default Judgment
26 26 misc Declaration Fri 07/14 9:20 AM
Declaration of Anamaria Martinez in Support of Related [+]. Filed by Plaintiff Anamaria Martinez (Auerbach, Ruth)
Related: [-] 25 Motion for Default Judgment
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit 1
Att: 2 Exhibit Exhibit 2
Att: 3 Exhibit Exhibit 3
25 25 motion Default Judgment Fri 07/14 9:16 AM
Motion for Default Judgment ; Memorandum of Points & Authorities Filed by Plaintiff Anamaria Martinez. (Auerbach, Ruth)
Related: [-]
Sunday, June 04, 2023
24 24 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - Electronic Order Sun 06/04 9:12 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Electronic Order Related [+]. Notice Date 06/04/2023. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 21 Order
23 23 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - Clerk's Entry of Default Sun 06/04 9:12 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Clerk's Entry of Default Related [+]. Notice Date 06/04/2023. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 22 Clerk's Entry of Default
Friday, June 02, 2023
22 22 court Clerk's Entry of Default Fri 06/02 11:39 AM
Clerk's Entry of Default as to Defendant Regina M. Peralta . (ds)
Related: [-]
21 21 4 pgs order Order Fri 06/02 11:30 AM
Order Imposing Sanctions Related [+]. (Hearings for 6/15/23 are vacated.) (ds)
Related: [-] 17 Order to Show Cause
court Hearing Dropped Fri 06/02 11:32 AM
Hearing Dropped Related [+] (Hearing of 6/15/23 vacated per the order issued on 6/2/23.) (ds)
Related: [-] 17 Order to Show Cause
court Hearing Dropped Fri 06/02 11:33 AM
Hearing Dropped Related [+] (Pre-Trial Conference of 6/15/23 vacated per the order issued on 6/2/23.) (ds)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Anamaria Martinez
Saturday, May 13, 2023
20 20 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Sat 05/13 9:09 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+]. Notice Date 05/13/2023. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 17 Order to Show Cause
19 19 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - Electronic Order Sat 05/13 9:09 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Electronic Order Related [+]. Notice Date 05/13/2023. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 16 Order
Thursday, May 11, 2023
18 18 audio audio Thu 05/11 10:30 PM
PDF with attached Audio File. Court Date & Time [ 5/11/2023 2:00:00 PM ]. File Size [ 6999 KB ]. Run Time [ 00:07:17 ]. (admin)
Related: [-]
17 17 order Show Cause Thu 05/11 3:34 PM
Order to Show Cause Related [+]. Show Cause hearing scheduled for 6/15/2023 at 02:00 PM in/via Tele/Videoconference - www.canb.uscourts.gov/calendars. (ds)
Related: [-] 8 Scheduling Order
16 16 3 pgs order Order Thu 05/11 3:24 PM
Order Continuing Final Pre-Trial Conference Related [+]. (Pre-trial conference continued to 6/15/23 at 2:00 p.m.) (ds)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Anamaria Martinez
court Hearing Continued/Rescheduled Thu 05/11 2:20 PM
Hearing Continued Related [+] Pre-Trial Conference scheduled for 06/15/2023 at 02:00 PM in/via Tele/Videoconference - www.canb.uscourts.gov/calendars. (After hearing, the Court will issue an OSC for hearing on 6/15/23. If no response by defendant, the Court will strike the answer and counterclaim and enter the default of the defendant. The Court will issue an order. Appearance: Ruth Auerbach for plaintiff) (ds)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Anamaria Martinez
Thursday, May 04, 2023
15 15 misc Pre-Trial Statement Thu 05/04 3:47 PM
Pre-Trial Statement ; Declaration of Ruth Auerbach, Certificate of Service . Filed by Plaintiff Anamaria Martinez, Counter-Defendant Anamaria Martinez (Auerbach, Ruth)
Related: [-]
Sunday, February 05, 2023
14 14 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - Electronic Order Sun 02/05 9:13 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Electronic Order Related [+]. Notice Date 02/05/2023. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 13 Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney
Friday, February 03, 2023
13 13 order Withdraw As Attorney Fri 02/03 12:48 PM
Order Granting Motion To Withdraw Related [+] (ds)
Related: [-] 10 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney for Defendant Filed by Attorney Lawrence L. Szabo
court Hearing Dropped Fri 02/03 12:53 PM
Hearing Dropped Related [+] (Hearing of 2/16/23 vacated per order issued on 2/3/23.) (ds)
Related: [-] 10 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney filed by Lawrence L. Szabo
Friday, January 13, 2023
12 12 misc Certificate of Service Fri 01/13 4:52 PM
Certificate of Service Related [+]. Filed by Attorney Lawrence L. Szabo (Szabo, Lawrence)
Related: [-] 10 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney,11 Notice of Hearing
11 11 notice Notice of Hearing Fri 01/13 4:50 PM
Notice of Hearing Related [+]. Hearing scheduled for 2/16/2023 at 02:00 PM in/via Tele/Videoconference - www.canb.uscourts.gov/calendars. Filed by Attorney Lawrence L. Szabo. (Szabo, Lawrence)
Related: [-] 10 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney filed by Attorney Lawrence L. Szabo
10 10 motion Withdraw As Attorney Fri 01/13 4:47 PM
Motion to Withdraw as Attorney for Defendant Filed by Attorney Lawrence L. Szabo. (Szabo, Lawrence)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration of Lawrence L. Szabo
Friday, October 14, 2022
9 9 audio audio Fri 10/14 10:30 PM
The Audio File attached to the PDF includes several hearings. Court Date & Time [ 10/13/2022 2:00:00 PM ]. File Size [ 74502 KB ]. Run Time [ 01:17:36 ]. (admin)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 13, 2022
8 8 order Scheduling Order Thu 10/13 4:21 PM
Scheduling Order Pre-Trial Hearing scheduled for 5/11/2023 at 02:00 PM in/via Tele/Videoconference - www.canb.uscourts.gov/calendars. Discovery due by 1/31/2023. (The parties shall complete some form of ADR prior to 3/17/23.) (ds)
Related: [-]
court Hearing Continued/Rescheduled Thu 10/13 3:56 PM
Hearing Continued Related [+] Pre-Trial Conference scheduled for 05/11/2023 at 02:00 PM in/via Tele/Videoconference - www.canb.uscourts.gov/calendars. (After hearing, the Court set deadlines for discovery and expert disclosure and will issue an order detailing the deadlines and other trial related procedures. Appearances: Ruth Auerbach for plaintiff and Lawrence Szabo for defendant.) (ds)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Anamaria Martinez
Tuesday, September 13, 2022
7 7 misc Case Management Conference Statement Tue 09/13 2:48 PM
Joint Case Management Conference Statement /Discovery Plan Related [+]. Filed by Plaintiff Anamaria Martinez (Auerbach, Ruth)
Related: [-] Judge Docket Order
Thursday, July 28, 2022
6 6 answer Answer to Counterclaim Thu 07/28 12:52 PM
Answer to Counterclaim Filed by Regina M. Peralta. (Auerbach, Ruth)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 20, 2022
order Judge Docket Order Wed 07/20 2:13 PM
DOCKET TEXT ORDER (no separate order issued:) This proceeding is scheduled to come before the court on August 18, 2022 for a scheduling conference. The court has reviewed the record of this action and notes that, on July 14, 2022, Defendant Regina Peralta filed an Answer and Counterclaim (Dkt. 5). Pursuant to Fed. R. Bankr. P. 7012(a), Plaintiff Anamaria Martinez must respond to Ms. Peralta's counterclaim on or before August 4, 2022. In order to allow time for the filing of such response and any motion practice that might follow, the court orders as follows: (1) The scheduling conference is hereby continued to October 13, 2022 at 2:00 p.m. (2) The continued scheduling conference will convene via Zoom. The court encourages all interested parties to consult the court's website for information concerning the status of court operations during the COVID-19 pandemic. The court's website also offers information explaining how to arrange an appearance at a video hearing. If you have questions about court operations or how to participate in a video hearing, you may contact the court by calling 888-821-7606 or by using the Live Chat feature on the court's website. (3) The parties shall calculate the deadlines set forth in Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a)(1)(C), 26(f)(1), and 26(f)(2), which apply in this proceeding pursuant to Fed. R. Bankr. P. 7026, from October 13, 2022. Related [+]. (Jamieson, Joshua)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Counter-Defendant Anamaria Martinez, Plaintiff Anamaria Martinez
court Hearing Continued/Rescheduled Wed 07/20 2:17 PM
Hearing Continued Related [+] Hearing scheduled for 10/13/2022 at 02:00 PM in/via Tele/Videoconference - www.canb.uscourts.gov/calendars. (Hearing of 8/18/22 continued per order issued on 7/20/22.) (ds)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Anamaria Martinez
Thursday, July 14, 2022
5 5 answer|cmp Answer to Complaint|Counterclaim Thu 07/14 7:05 PM
Answer to Complaint , Counterclaim by Regina M. Peralta against Anamaria Martinez Filed by Regina M. Peralta. (Szabo, Lawrence)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 15, 2022
4 4 court Summons Issued Wed 06/15 12:12 PM
Corrected Summons Issued on Regina M. Peralta Answer Due 7/15/2022 Related [+]. Scheduling Conference scheduled for 8/18/2022 at 02:00 PM in/via Tele/Videoconference - www.canb.uscourts.gov/calendars. (lj)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Anamaria Martinez
Tuesday, June 14, 2022
3 3 order Discovery Tue 06/14 2:19 PM
Order Regarding Initial Disclosures and Discovery Conference (lj)
Related: [-]
2 2 court Summons Issued Tue 06/14 2:18 PM
Summons Issued on Regina M. Peralta Answer Due 7/14/2022 Related [+]. Scheduling Conference scheduled for 8/18/2022 at 02:00 PM in/via Tele/Videoconference - www.canb.uscourts.gov/calendars. (lj)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Anamaria Martinez
Monday, June 13, 2022
1 1 cmp Complaint Mon 06/13 2:56 PM
Adversary case 22-03027 62 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(2), false pretenses, false representation, actual fraud), 67 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(4), fraud as fiduciary, embezzlement, larceny), 68 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(6), willful and malicious injury) Complaint by Anamaria Martinez against Regina M. Peralta. Fee Amount $350. (Auerbach, Ruth)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit 1
Att: 2 Exhibit Exhibit 2
Att: 3 Exhibit Exhibit 3
Att: 4 AP Cover Sheet