Pennsylvania Eastern District Court
Judge:Gerald A Mchugh
Case #: 2:22-cv-02345
Nature of Suit485 Other Statutes - Telephone Consumer Protection Act
Cause47:227 Restrictions of Use of Telephone Equipment
Case Filed:Jun 14, 2022
Terminated:Nov 11, 2022
Last checked: Friday Mar 15, 2024 8:22 PM EDT
Defendant
AMERICAN INCOME LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By
ANDREA MERYL KIRSHENBAUM
Littler Mendelson, P.C.
contact info
Defendant
ARIAS-DLABIK AGENCY LLC
Represented By
Anthony Judice
Strassburger Mckenna Gutnick & Gefsky
contact info
Defendant
DOES 1 THROUGH 10
Plaintiff
STEWART SMITH
Represented By
TODD M. FRIEDMAN
Law Offices Of Todd M. Friedman
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/15/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Friday, November 11, 2022
10 10 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Fri 11/11 6:36 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal With Prejudice Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) by AMERICAN INCOME LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY. (KIRSHENBAUM, ANDREA)
Related: [-]
Sunday, October 02, 2022
9 9 cmp Amended Complaint Sun 10/02 11:49 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against AMERICAN INCOME LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY, ARIAS-DLABIK AGENCY LLC, DOES 1 THROUGH 10, filed by STEWART SMITH.(FRIEDMAN, TODD)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 14, 2022
8 8 order Stipulation and Order ~Util - Set Scheduling Order Deadlines Wed 09/14 9:47 AM
STIPULATION AND ORDER THAT PLAINTIFF SHALL HAVE UP TO MONDAY, 9/26/22 TO FILE AN AMENDED COMPLAINT AND ARIAS AND AIL SHALL HAVE UP TO 11/11/22, TO ANSWER, MOVE, OR OTHERWISE RESPOND TO PLAINTIFF'S FORTHCOMING AMENDED PLEADING. SIGNED BY HONORABLE GERALD A. MCHUGH ON 9/14/22. 9/14/22 ENTERED & E-MAILED.(fdc)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 12, 2022
7 7 1 pgs order Order Setting Answer Deadline Fri 08/12 3:46 PM
STIPULATION AND ORDER THAT AMERICAN INCOME LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY answer due 9/19/2022; ARIAS-DLABIK AGENCY LLC SHALL HAVE AN ADDITIONAL THIRTY (30) DAY EXTENSION OF TIME, UNTIL 9/19/22, WITHIN WHICH TO ANSWER, MOVE, OR OTHERWISE RESPOND TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT. SIGNED BY HONORABLE GERALD A. MCHUGH ON 8/12/22. 8/12/22 ENTERED & E-MAILED.(fdc)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 18, 2022
6 6 1 pgs order Order Setting Answer Deadline Mon 07/18 8:56 AM
STIPULATION AND ORDER THAT DEFENDANTS AMERICAN INCOME LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY AND ARIAS-DLABIK AGENCY LLC SHALL HAVE A THIRTY (30) DAY EXTENSTION OF TIME, UNTIL 8/19/22, WITHIN WHICH TO ANSWER, MOVE, OR OTHERWISE RESPOND TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT. SIGNED BY HONORABLE GERALD A. MCHUGH ON 7/18/22. 7/18/22 ENTERED & E-MAILED.(fdc)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 15, 2022
5 5 discov Disclosure Statement Form 7.1 Fri 07/15 3:10 PM
Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 including Globe Life Inc. with Certificate of Service by AMERICAN INCOME LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY.(KIRSHENBAUM, ANDREA)
Related: [-]
4 4 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 07/15 3:07 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by ANDREA MERYL KIRSHENBAUM on behalf of AMERICAN INCOME LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY with Certificate of Service(KIRSHENBAUM, ANDREA)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 08, 2022
3 3 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 07/08 2:46 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Anthony Judice on behalf of ARIAS-DLABIK AGENCY LLC (Judice, Anthony)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 16, 2022
2 2 service Summons Issued Thu 06/16 9:38 AM
Summons Issued as to AMERICAN INCOME LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY, ARIAS-DLABIK AGENCY LLC. E-mailed to: Todd M. Friedman on 6/16/22 (fdc)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 14, 2022
1 1 cmp Complaint (Attorney) Tue 06/14 5:49 PM
COMPLAINT against AMERICAN INCOME LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY, ARIAS-DLABIK AGENCY LLC, DOES 1 THROUGH 10 ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number APAEDC-15983339.), filed by STEWART SMITH.(FRIEDMAN, TODD)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Designation Form