Michigan Eastern District Court
Judge:Mark A Goldsmith
Referred: Kimberly G Altman
Case #: 2:22-cv-11323
Nature of Suit480 Other Statutes - Consumer Credit
Cause15:1692 Fair Debt Collection Act
Case Filed:Jun 15, 2022
Terminated:Jul 21, 2022
Last checked: Monday Dec 12, 2022 4:56 AM EST
Defendant
Law Office of Barbara Tsatorova PLLC
Represented By
Randall J. Groendyk
Varnum LLP
contact info
Defendant
Anna Tsaturova
Represented By
Randall J. Groendyk
Varnum LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Laurie Elliott
Represented By
Adam G. Taub
Adam Taub Assoc Consumer Law Group
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Thursday, July 21, 2022
10 10 order Dismissing Case Thu 07/21 3:23 PM
ORDER DISMISSING CASE With Prejudice. Signed by District Judge Mark A. Goldsmith. (KWin)
Related: [-]
9 9 notice Notice - Other Thu 07/21 1:16 PM
NOTICE by Laurie Elliott of Settlement (Taub, Adam)
Related: [-]
notice Text-Only Notice of Hearing Cancelled Thu 07/21 3:24 PM
TEXT-ONLY NOTICE: Scheduling Conference on 8/2/2022 is Cancelled. Matter is Resolved. (KWin)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 11, 2022
8 8 notice Appear* Mon 07/11 9:53 AM
ORDER REGARDING TELEPHONE SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: Scheduling Conference set for 8/2/2022 03:30 PM before District Judge Mark A. Goldsmith (WBar)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 07, 2022
7 7 misc Statement of Disclosure of Corporate Affiliations Thu 07/07 5:53 PM
STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by Law Office of Barbara Tsatorova PLLC, Anna Tsaturova (Groendyk, Randall J.)
Related: [-]
6 6 answer Answer to Complaint Thu 07/07 5:51 PM
ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses by Law Office of Barbara Tsatorova PLLC, Anna Tsaturova. (Groendyk, Randall J.)
Related: [-]
5 5 misc Attorney Appearance Thu 07/07 5:50 PM
ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Randall J. Groendyk appearing on behalf of Law Office of Barbara Tsatorova PLLC, Anna Tsaturova (Groendyk, Randall J.)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 20, 2022
4 4 2 pgs order Order Mon 06/20 10:50 AM
ORDER Regarding Filings. Signed by District Judge Mark A. Goldsmith. (KSan)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 15, 2022
3 3 service Summons Issued* Wed 06/15 1:31 PM
SUMMONS Issued for *Anna Tsaturova* (SSch)
Related: [-]
2 2 service Summons Issued* Wed 06/15 1:30 PM
SUMMONS Issued for *Law Office of Barbara Tsatorova PLLC* (SSch)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Civil Case - Complaint Wed 06/15 10:17 AM
COMPLAINT filed by Laurie Elliott against Law Office of Barbara Tsatorova PLLC, Anna Tsaturova with Jury Demand. Plaintiff requests summons issued. Receipt No: AMIEDC-8946796 - Fee: $ 402. County of 1st Plaintiff: Oakland - County Where Action Arose: Oakland - County of 1st Defendant: Ottawa. [ Previously dismissed case: No] [ Possible companion case(s): None ] (Taub, Adam)
Related: [-]
notice Notice to Parties of Consent of a Civil Action before a Magistrate Judge Option Wed 06/15 1:31 PM
A United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at[LINK:http://www.mied.uscourts.gov] (SSch)
Related: [-]