YANG v 3M COMPANY et al
Consolidated
Lead case: 3:19-md-02885
Lead case: 3:19-md-02885
Florida Northern District Court | |
Judge: | M Casey Rodgers |
Referred: | Gary R Jones |
Case #: | 3:22-cv-08182 |
Nature of Suit | 365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability |
Case Filed: | Jun 15, 2022 |
Case in other court: | Minnesota, 0:22-cv-01460 |
Last checked: Monday Dec 12, 2022 4:20 AM EST |
Defendant
3M COMPANY
|
|
Defendant
3M OCCUPATIONAL SAFETY LLC
|
|
Defendant
AEARO HOLDING LLC
|
|
Defendant
AEARO INTERMEDIATE LLC
|
|
Defendant
AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC
|
|
Plaintiff
PHIA NENG YANG
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 5 hours ago |
Wednesday, June 15, 2022 | ||
9 | 9
![]() Short Form Complaint AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants All Defendants., filed by PHIA NENG YANG. (HAUER, STACY) |
|
8 | 8
![]() PRETRIAL ORDER NO. 17 ORDER GOVERNING ADOPTION OF MASTER COMPLAINT AND SHORT FORM COMPLAINT FOR FILED CASES. Any Plaintiff whose case becomes part of this MDL after the date of this Order, either by a direct filing and assignment to this Court (if permitted by subsequent order of the Court) or by transfer from another district or from another judge in this district, must file a Short Form Complaint within 20 days from the date of transfer or, if originally filed in this district, assignment to this Court. Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 10/16/2019. (Amended (Short Form) Complaint due by 7/5/2022 .) (djb) |
|
7 | 7
![]() Case transferred in from District of Minnesota; Case Number 0:22-cv-01460. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. |
|
Tuesday, June 14, 2022 | ||
6 | 6
![]() |
|
Tuesday, May 31, 2022 | ||
5 | 5 Clerk's Notice to JPML regarding case potentially related to MDL #2885 re:1 Notice of Removal. (MKB) [Transferred from Minnesota on 6/15/2022.] | |
4 | 4 (Text-Only) CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge John R. Tunheim per Civil (MDL Direct Assign) list, referred to Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung. Please use case number 22-cv-1460 (JRT/TNL). Notice: All Nongovernmental Corporate Parties must file a Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement. (MKB) [Transferred from Minnesota on 6/15/2022.] | |
3 | 3
![]() |
|
2 | 2
![]() |
|
1 | 1
![]() |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Att: 3
![]() |