New York Eastern District Court
Judge:Sanket J Bulsara
Referred: Steven Tiscione
Case #: 2:22-cv-03524
Nature of Suit850 Other Statutes - Securities/Commodities/Exchange
Cause15:78m(a) Securities Exchange Act
Case Filed:Jun 15, 2022
Last checked: Monday Dec 12, 2022 4:02 AM EST
Defendant
Daniel Gellman
99 Overlook Road
Pomona, NY 10970
Represented By
Gene W. Rosen
Gene Rosen'S Law Firm
contact info
Defendant
Boruch Greenberg
2060 East 22nd Street
Brooklyn, NY 11229
Represented By
Gene W. Rosen
Gene Rosen'S Law Firm
contact info
Defendant
LG Capital Funding, LLC
LG Capital Funding, LLC 1218 Union Street Suite 2
Brooklyn, NY 11225
Represented By
Gene W. Rosen
Gene Rosen'S Law Firm
contact info
Defendant
Joseph Lerman
1124 East 32nd Street
Brooklyn, NY 11210
Represented By
Gene W. Rosen
Gene Rosen'S Law Firm
contact info
Plaintiff
VNUE, Inc.
VNUE, Inc. 104 W. 29th St. 11th Fl
New York, NY 10001
Represented By
Gustave Paul Passanante
The Basile Law Firm P.C.
contact info
Eric Benzenberg
The Basile Law Firm, P.C.
contact info
Mark R. Basile
The Basile Law Firm P.C.
contact info
Christopher M Basile
The Basile Law Firm P.C.
contact info

GPO Jan 12 2024
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION: For the reasons stated in the attached R&R, the Court respectfully recommends that Defendants motion to dismiss 25 be denied. Any objections to the Report and Recommendation must be filed with the Clerk of Court within 14 days of receipt of this report. Failure to file objections within the specified time may waive the right to appeal any judgment or order entered by the District Court in reliance on this Report and Recommendation. See 28 U.S.C. § 636(b)(1); Fed. R. Civ. P. 72(b)(2); see also Caidor v. Onondaga County, 517 F.3d 601, 604 (2d Cir. 2008) ("[F]ailure to object timely to a magistrate[ ] [judge's] report operates as a waiver of any further judicial review of the magistrate[ ] [judge's] decision." (quotations omitted)). So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Sanket J. Bulsara on 1/12/2024. (MEG)
GPO Mar 30 2024
024.ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS: For the reasons stated in the attached Order, the Court ADOPTS Magistrate Judge Bulsara's 31 R&R in full. Defendants' 25 Motion to Dismiss is DENIED. Ordered by Judge Nina R. Morrison on 3/30/2

Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Tuesday, April 29, 2025
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery Tue 04/29 1:18 PM
ORDER granting71 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery. The time to complete fact discovery is extended to August 20, 2025. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Steven Tiscione on 4/29/2025. (LV)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 24, 2025
71 71 misc Stipulation Thu 04/24 2:41 PM
STIPULATION re Initial Conference Hearing,,,,,, Set Deadlines/Hearings,,,,,70 Order on Motion to Compel,,,, Motion Hearing,,,, Set Hearings,,, to Extend Case Deadlines by VNUE, Inc. (Benzenberg, Eric)
Related: [-]