Florida Northern District Court
Judge:M Casey Rodgers
Referred: Hope T Cannon
Case #: 3:22-cv-08320
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause29:2601 Family and Medical Leave Act
Case Filed:Jun 15, 2022
Last checked: Monday Dec 12, 2022 4:59 AM EST
Defendant
CAREERSOURCE ESCAROSA INC
Represented By
JENNIFER SHOAF RICHARDSON
Emmanuel Sheppard & Condon - Pensacola Fl
contact info
ERICK M DRLICKA
Emmanuel Sheppard & Condon - Pensacola Fl
contact info
Plaintiff
BRICQUEL CLARK
Represented By
CLAYTON MORRIS CONNORS
Westberry & Connors - Pensacola Fl
contact info


Docket last updated: 6 hours ago
Tuesday, November 08, 2022
9 9 order Scheduling Order ~Util - Case Referred to Mediation Tue 11/08 1:31 PM
FINAL SCHEDULING ORDER AND MEDIATION REFERRAL Re: 8 Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting: (Discovery due by 6/16/2023 ., Dispositive/Daubert Motions to be filed by 7/21/2023 ., Mediation Report due by 7/28/2023 .), Case referred to mediation. Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 11/8/2022. (jcw)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 01, 2022
utility Action Required by District Judge - No NEFs in SEALED Cases Tue 11/01 9:14 AM
ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re:8 Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting (jcw)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 31, 2022
8 8 misc Report of Rule 26f Planning Meeting Mon 10/31 1:53 PM
REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (CONNORS, CLAYTON)
Related: [-]
utility Action Required by District Judge - No NEFs in SEALED Cases Mon 10/31 11:25 AM
ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re:6 Initial Scheduling Order - Rule 26 Meeting Report has not been filed. (jcw)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 21, 2022
7 7 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement/Certificate of Interested Persons Wed 09/21 9:57 AM
Corporate Disclosure Statement/Certificate of Interested Persons by CAREERSOURCE ESCAROSA INC identifying Corporate Parent WorkForce ESCAROSA, Inc. for CAREERSOURCE ESCAROSA INC.. (RICHARDSON, JENNIFER)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 07, 2022
6 6 order Scheduling Order Thu 09/08 8:17 AM
INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Fed.R.Civ.P. 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement Deadline set for 9/21/2022 . Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 10/21/2022 . Discovery due by 3/13/2023 . Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 9/7/2022. (jcw)
Related: [-]
utility Action Required by District Judge - No NEFs in SEALED Cases Wed 09/07 8:51 AM
ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re:1 Complaint (See proposed ISO.) (jcw)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 06, 2022
5 5 answer Answer to Complaint Tue 09/06 9:27 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint by CAREERSOURCE ESCAROSA INC. (RICHARDSON, JENNIFER)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 06, 2022
4 4 service Waiver of Service Executed Wed 07/06 2:03 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by BRICQUEL CLARK. CAREERSOURCE ESCAROSA INC waiver sent on 7/6/2022, answer due 9/6/2022. (CONNORS, CLAYTON)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 16, 2022
3 3 service Summons Issued Thu 06/16 8:02 AM
Summons Issued as to CAREERSOURCE ESCAROSA INC. (jcw)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 15, 2022
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet Wed 06/15 4:01 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET. (CONNORS, CLAYTON)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Wed 06/15 4:00 PM
COMPLAINT against CAREERSOURCE ESCAROSA, INC. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AFLNDC-7196501.), filed by BRICQUEL CLARK. (CONNORS, CLAYTON)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Summons