Illinois Northern District Court
Case #: 1:22-cr-00154
Case Filed:Mar 18, 2022
Terminated:Mar 18, 2022
Last checked: Thursday Jun 16, 2022 2:39 AM CDT
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Probation Department
contact info
AUSA - Chicago
United States Attorney'S Office (ndil - Chicago)
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
Magnus Daniel Humphrey (1)
Terminated: 03/18/2022


Docket last updated: 06/16/2022 3:48 AM CDT
Friday, March 18, 2022
1 1 PROBATION 22 Form as to Magnus Daniel Humphrey accepting jurisdiction from Minnesota, Case number 0864 0:16CR00157-001. Mailed certified copy of transfer form with letter requesting file to Minnesota. (ph, )
Related: [-]