Howell et al v. Ector County et al
Texas Western District Court | |
Judge: | David Counts |
Referred: | Ronald C Griffin |
Case #: | 7:22-cv-00141 |
Nature of Suit | 440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights |
Cause | 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights |
Case Filed: | Jun 16, 2022 |
Terminated: | Jan 27, 2023 |
Last checked: Tuesday Dec 13, 2022 3:07 AM CST |
Defendant
Ector County
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Ector County Sheriff's Office
P.O. Box 331
Odessa, TX 79760 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Mary Howell
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Wallace Howell
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Precious Waites
|
Represented By
|
1. | Family of dead inmate files federal lawsuit (oaoa.com) |
Submitted Mon 06/27/2022 | |
Docket last updated: 12 hours ago |
Monday, March 13, 2023 | ||
22 | 22
![]() ORDER DENYING20 Motion for Reconsideration re20 CORRECTED MOTION for Reconsideration re17 Judgment,16 Order Adopting/Rejecting Report and Recommendations,19 Deficiency Notice filed by Wallace Howell, Mary Howell, Precious Waites. Signed by Judge David Counts. (jb3) |
|
Friday, March 10, 2023 | ||
21 | 21
![]() Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by Ector County, Ector County Sheriff's Office, re20 CORRECTED MOTION for Reconsideration re17 Judgment,16 Order Adopting/Rejecting Report and Recommendations,19 Deficiency Notice filed by Plaintiff Wallace Howell, Plaintiff Mary Howell, Plaintiff Precious Waites (Rouse, Richard) |
|
Monday, February 27, 2023 | ||
20 | 20
![]() CORRECTED MOTION for Reconsideration re17 Judgment,16 Order Adopting/Rejecting Report and Recommendations,19 Deficiency Notice by Mary Howell, Wallace Howell, Precious Waites.. Motions referred to Judge Ronald C. Griffin. (Stafford, Paul) |
|
19 | 19
![]() DEFICIENCY NOTICE: re 18 MOTION for Reconsideration re 17 Judgment, 16 Order Adopting/Rejecting Report and Recommendations (jb3) |
|
Friday, February 24, 2023 | ||
18 | 18
![]() MOTION for Reconsideration re17 Judgment,16 Order Adopting/Rejecting Report and Recommendations by Mary Howell, Wallace Howell, Precious Waites.. Motions referred to Judge Ronald C. Griffin. (Stafford, Paul) |
|
Friday, January 27, 2023 | ||
17 | 17
![]() FINAL JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge David Counts. (jb3) |
|
Thursday, January 26, 2023 | ||
16 | 16
![]() ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS for13 Report and Recommendations. Signed by Judge David Counts. (jb3) |
|
Monday, November 28, 2022 | ||
15 | 15
![]() RESPONSE to Plaintiffs' Objections to the Report and Recommendation of the U.S. Magistrate Judge to13 Report and Recommendations by Ector County, Ector County Sheriff's Office. (Rouse, Richard) |
|
Monday, November 21, 2022 | ||
14 | 14
![]() OBJECTION to13 Report and Recommendations by Mary Howell, Wallace Howell, Precious Waites.. (Stafford, Paul) |
|
Friday, November 04, 2022 | ||
13 | 13
![]() REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re10 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Ector County, Ector County Sheriff's Office. Signed by Judge Ronald C. Griffin. (jb3) |
|
Thursday, August 11, 2022 | ||
12 | 12
![]() REPLY to Response to Motion, filed by Ector County, Ector County Sheriff's Office, re10 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Defendant Ector County, Defendant Ector County Sheriff's Office (Rouse, Richard) |
|
Thursday, August 04, 2022 | ||
11 | 11
![]() Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by Mary Howell, Wallace Howell, Precious Waites, re10 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Defendant Ector County, Defendant Ector County Sheriff's Office (Stafford, Paul) |
|
Thursday, July 21, 2022 | ||
10 | 10
![]() Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Ector County, Ector County Sheriff's Office.. Motions referred to Judge Ronald C. Griffin. (Rouse, Richard) |
|
Sunday, July 03, 2022 | ||
9 | 9
![]() SUMMONS Returned Executed by Wallace Howell, Mary Howell, Precious Waites. Ector County served on 6/30/2022, answer due 7/21/2022. (Stafford, Paul) |
|
8 | 8
![]() SUMMONS Returned Executed by Wallace Howell, Mary Howell, Precious Waites. Ector County Sheriff's Office served on 6/30/2022, answer due 7/21/2022. (Stafford, Paul) |
|
Tuesday, June 28, 2022 | ||
7 | 7
![]() Summons Issued as to Ector County. (jb3) |
|
6 | 6
![]() Summons Issued as to Ector County Sheriff's Office. (jb3) |
|
Monday, June 27, 2022 | ||
5 | 5
![]() REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Mary Howell, Wallace Howell, Precious Waites. (Stafford, Paul) |
|
4 | 4
![]() REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Mary Howell, Wallace Howell, Precious Waites. (Stafford, Paul) |
|
Friday, June 17, 2022 | ||
3 | 3
![]() Pro Hac Vice Letter to Attorney Justin A. Moore . (jb3) |
|
2 | 2
![]() JS44 (Civil Cover Sheet) submitted by Mary Howell, Wallace Howell, Precious Waites. (Stafford, Paul) |
|
Thursday, June 16, 2022 | ||
1 | 1
![]() COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0542-16147840), filed by Mary Howell.(Stafford, Paul) |
|
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Fri 06/17 1:19 PM
Case assigned to Judge David Counts and Judge Ronald C. Griffin. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (jb3) |