Original Case: 3:16-cv-00777

Federal Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals
Case #: 0:22-cvpri-01905
Typecivil private
Nature of Suit840 Property Rights - Trademark
Case Filed:Jun 15, 2022
Terminated:Apr 12, 2024
Last checked: Monday Apr 15, 2024 5:52 AM EDT
Counter-Defendant - Appellant
NOURI E. HAKIM
Represented By
Melanie Derefinko
Liskow & Lewis
contact info
Carey Menasco
Liskow & Lewis
contact info
Carol Welborn Reisman
Liskow & Lewis
contact info
George Denegre Jr.
Liskow & Lewis
contact info
Hartwell Powell Morse III
Luv n' Care, Ltd.
contact info
Defendant
LINDSEY LAURAIN
Defendant/Counter-Claimant - Cross-Appellant
EAZY-PZ LLC
Represented By
Jennifer Kroell Fischer
Fischer Law Firm, PC
contact info
Defendant/Counterclaimant - Appellee
EAZY-PZ LLC
Represented By
Jennifer Kroell Fischer
Fischer Law Firm, PC
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellant
LUV N' CARE, LTD.
Represented By
Melanie Derefinko
Liskow & Lewis
contact info
Carey Menasco
Liskow & Lewis
contact info
Carol Welborn Reisman
Liskow & Lewis
contact info
George Denegre Jr.
Liskow & Lewis
contact info
Hartwell Powell Morse III
Luv n' Care, Ltd.
contact info


Docket last updated: 04/15/2024 5:50 AM EDT
Wednesday, June 15, 2022
1 1 Appeal docketed. Received: 06/13/2022. [855764] Entry of Appearance is due on 06/29/2022. Certificate of Interest is due on 06/29/2022. Docketing Statement is due on 06/29/2022. Appellants' brief is due on 08/15/2022. [ALK] [Entered: 06/15/2022 02:30 PM]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 4 pgs Notice of Docketing
Att: 2 553 pgs Civil Case Docketed