GRAY v. 3M COMPANY et al
Consolidated
Lead case: 3:19-md-02885
Lead case: 3:19-md-02885
Florida Northern District Court | |
Judge: | M Casey Rodgers |
Referred: | Gary R Jones |
Case #: | 3:22-cv-08386 |
Nature of Suit | 365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability |
Case Filed: | Jun 16, 2022 |
Last checked: Tuesday Dec 13, 2022 3:45 AM EST |
Defendant
3M COMPANY
|
|
Defendant
3M OCCUPATIONAL SAFETY LLC
|
|
Defendant
AEARO HOLDING LLC
|
|
Defendant
AEARO INTERMEDIATE LLC
|
|
Defendant
AEARO LLC
|
|
Defendant
AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC
|
|
Plaintiff
JUSTIN GRAY
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 05/02/2025 11:59 PM EDT |
Thursday, June 23, 2022 | ||
6 | 6
![]() NOTICE OF DESIGNATED FORUM - WDNC by JUSTIN GRAY (FERRARO, JAMES) |
|
Friday, June 17, 2022 | ||
4 | 4
![]() FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against 3M COMPANY, 3M OCCUPATIONAL SAFETY LLC, AEARO HOLDING LLC, AEARO INTERMEDIATE LLC, AEARO LLC, AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC, filed by JUSTIN GRAY. (FERRARO, JAMES) |
|
misc
Docket Annotation
Fri 06/17 7:58 AM
DOCKET ANNOTATION BY COURT: Notice to Filer - Please file an amended notice of designated forum for ALL of the cases you did not include the district, example: District of Nevada or WDTX. This information has to be included in your final text so it'll show on the docket entries for reporting purposes. (djb) |
||
Thursday, June 16, 2022 | ||
3 | 3 DOCKET ANNOTATION BY COURT: The wrong pdf is attached to this entry. Please re-file (Amended) with correct document. Re1 Complaint, filed by JUSTIN GRAY (djb) | |
2 | 2
![]() NOTICE OF DESIGNATED FORUM by JUSTIN GRAY (FERRARO, JAMES) |
|
1 | 1
![]() COMPLAINT against 3M COMPANY, 3M OCCUPATIONAL SAFETY LLC, AEARO HOLDING LLC, AEARO INTERMEDIATE LLC, AEARO LLC, AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AFLNDC-7200441.), filed by JUSTIN GRAY. (FERRARO, JAMES) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
misc
Docket Annotation
Thu 06/16 3:52 PM
DOCKET ANNOTATION BY COURT: The wrong pdf is attached to this entry. Please re-file (Amended) with correct document. Re1 Complaint, filed by JUSTIN GRAY (djb) |