Wisconsin Eastern District Court
Judge:William C Griesbach
Case #: 1:22-cv-00696
Nature of Suit840 Property Rights - Trademark
Cause15:1121 Trademark Infringement
Case Filed:Jun 16, 2022
Terminated:Nov 02, 2023
Last checked: Tuesday Dec 13, 2022 2:39 AM CST
Defendant
Freedom Metals Inc
Represented By
Ryann H Beck
Andrus Intellectual Property Law LLP
contact info
Christopher R Liro
Andrus Intellectual Property Law LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Freedom Metals LLC
Represented By
Mark R Osherow
Osherow PLLC
contact info
Kenyetta N Alexander
Osherow PLLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/02/2025 11:59 PM CDT
Thursday, November 02, 2023
37 37 misc Patent/Trademark/Copyright Report Thu 11/02 1:10 PM
Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks. (jmk)
Related: [-]
utility Terminate Case - Notice Attorneys Thu 11/02 12:56 PM
Case dismissed pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a)(1) upon the36 Stipulation of the parties. The Parties stipulate and agree that all claims and counterclaims filed in this action, i.e., consolidated case numbers 1:22-cv-00696-WCG and 1:22-cv-01183-WCG, are dismissed without prejudice. Each Party shall bear its own costs and attorney fees. (jmk)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 01, 2023
36 36 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Wed 11/01 11:14 AM
STIPULATION of Dismissal by Freedom Metals Inc. (Liro, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 25, 2023
35 35 1 pgs order Order ~Util - Terminate Motions 1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings Fri 08/25 1:49 PM
ORDER signed by Judge William C. Griesbach on 8/25/23. All previously ordered dates relating to discovery, filings, schedules, conferences, and trial, if any, are VACATED. Within 70 days from the date of this order, counsel shall file a motion to dismiss this cause or a stipulation of dismissal. (cc: all counsel)(Griesbach, William)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 23, 2023
34 34 motion Stay Wed 08/23 10:52 AM
Joint MOTION to Stay and Notice of Settlement by Freedom Metals Inc.(Liro, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
Thursday, May 04, 2023
33 33 order Text Only Order ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines Thu 05/04 1:59 PM
TEXT ONLY ORDER GRANTING32 Stipulated MOTION to amend scheduling order, filed by Freedom Metals Inc., signed by Judge William C Griesbach on 05/04/2023. Fact discovery is due by August 25, 2023. All discovery will close on August 25, 2023. (cc: all counsel)(Griesbach, William)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 03, 2023
32 32 motion Amend/Correct Wed 05/03 2:24 PM
Stipulated MOTION to Amend/Correct Scheduling Order (Dkt. 27) by Freedom Metals Inc.(Liro, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
Tuesday, March 14, 2023
31 31 order Protective Order Tue 03/14 7:10 PM
PROTECTIVE ORDER GRANTING30 Stipulated Motion for a Protective Order, signed by Judge William C Griesbach on 03/14/2023. (cc: all counsel)(Griesbach, William)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 24, 2023
30 30 motion Protective Order Fri 02/24 2:50 PM
Stipulated MOTION for Protective Order by Freedom Metals Inc.(Liro, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
Wednesday, December 28, 2022
29 29 answer Answer to Amended Complaint Wed 12/28 10:02 AM
ANSWER to6 Amended Complaint,,, with Jury Demand by Freedom Metals Inc.(Liro, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 14, 2022
28 28 10 pgs order Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Wed 12/14 2:25 PM
DECISION AND ORDER signed by Judge William C Griesbach on 12/14/2022 GRANTING FM Wisconsin's15 Partial Motion to Dismiss FM Florida's Amended Complaint as to Counts II and III. Both Counts II and III are dismissed without prejudice. (cc: all counsel) (Griesbach, William)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 08, 2022
27 27 order Scheduling Order Thu 12/08 12:49 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER: signed by Judge William C Griesbach on 12/8/2022. (cc: all counsel)(Griesbach, William) (Main Document 27 replaced on 12/8/2022 to correct date typo) (lh)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 07, 2022
26 26 minutes Scheduling Conference ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings Thu 12/08 12:46 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge William C Griesbach: Rule 16 Telephone Scheduling Conference held on 12/7/2022, Initial Disclosures are due 14 days after the Ruling on the15 Motion for partial dismissal, Amended Pleadings due by 2/1/2023, Fact Discovery is due 6/1/2023, Close of Discovery is 8/25/2023, Parties' Expert Witness List due by 6/30/2023, Rebuttal Expert Witness List due by 7/28/2023, Dispositive Motions due by 9/25/2023. Motions in Limine/Daubert Motions/Motions to strike expert reports and other pretrial reports due 1/8/2024. Pretrial reports due by 1/12/2024. Final Pretrial Conference set for 1/19/2024 01:30 PM before Judge William C Griesbach. Jury Trial set for 2/5/2024 08:30 AM before Judge William C Griesbach. (Tape #120722) (lh) Modified text to correct typos on 12/8/2022 (lh)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 30, 2022
25 25 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 11/30 2:52 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Ryann H Beck on behalf of Freedom Metals Inc. Attorney(s) appearing: Ryann H. Beck (Beck, Ryann)
Related: [-]
24 24 misc Report of Rule 26(f) Plan Wed 11/30 10:21 AM
Joint Scheduling REPORT of Rule 26(f) Plan and Proposed Schedule by Freedom Metals LLC. (Osherow, Mark)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 28, 2022
23 23 respm Reply Brief in Support of Motion Mon 11/28 10:04 AM
REPLY BRIEF in Support filed by Freedom Metals Inc re15 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM (Partial Dismissal of Counts II and III of Amended Complaint (Dkt. 6)) . (Liro, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 14, 2022
22 22 respm Response to Motion Mon 11/14 12:54 PM
RESPONSE to Motion filed by Freedom Metals LLC re15 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM (Partial Dismissal of Counts II and III of Amended Complaint (Dkt. 6)) . (Osherow, Mark)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 08, 2022
21 21 notice Notice of Hearing Tue 11/08 9:28 AM
NOTICE of Hearing: Rule 16 Telephone Scheduling Conference set for 12/7/2022 at 09:00 AM before Judge William C Griesbach. The Court will initiate the call. Counsel are to provide the telephone number at which they can be reached (direct dial preferred) at least two days prior to the telephone conference. In the event counsel are unavailable at the scheduled time of the telephone conference, the conference may be rescheduled and counsel may be required to appear in person. Please provide your telephone number to the Office of the Clerk at wied_clerks_gb@wied.uscourts.gov. (cc: all counsel) (mac)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 04, 2022
20 20 answer Answer to Complaint Fri 11/04 3:32 PM
Defendant, Freedom Metals LLC's ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand to Plaintiff, Freedom Metals, Inc.'s Complaint by Freedom Metals LLC.(Osherow, Mark)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 28, 2022
19 19 order Text Only Order ~Util - Terminate Motions Fri 10/28 12:16 PM
TEXT ONLY ORDER GRANTING18 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to November 14, 2022 to file a response to Defendant Freedom Metals, Inc.'s Motion for Partial Dismissal,15 , signed by Judge William C Griesbach on 10/28/2022. (cc: all counsel)(Griesbach, William)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 27, 2022
18 18 motion Extension of Time Thu 10/27 9:00 AM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to Defendant, Freedom Metals, Inc.'s Motion for Partial Dismissal by Freedom Metals LLC. (Osherow, Mark)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 24, 2022
17 17 misc Consent/Refusal to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge Mon 10/24 9:25 AM
Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Freedom Metals Inc. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Liro, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 17, 2022
16 16 respm Brief in Support of Motion Mon 10/17 3:14 PM
BRIEF in Support filed by Freedom Metals Inc re15 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM (Partial Dismissal of Counts II and III of Amended Complaint (Dkt. 6)) . (Liro, Christopher)
Related: [-]
15 15 motion Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Mon 10/17 3:13 PM
MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM (Partial Dismissal of Counts II and III of Amended Complaint (Dkt. 6)) by Freedom Metals Inc. (Liro, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 14, 2022
14 14 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Consolidate Cases Fri 10/14 9:05 AM
ORDER signed by Judge William C Griesbach on 10/13/2022 Granting13 Motion to Consolidate Cases. All future filings are to be filed in the lower case number, 22-C-696. (cc: all counsel)(Griesbach, William)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 06, 2022
13 13 motion Consolidate Cases Thu 10/06 2:36 PM
Joint MOTION to Consolidate Cases (1:22-cv-00696-WCG and 1:22-cv-01183-WCG) by Freedom Metals Inc. (Liro, Christopher)
Related: [-]
order Text Only Order ~Util - Terminate Motions ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings Thu 10/06 11:02 AM
TEXT ONLY ORDER GRANTING10 Stipulated Motion for Extension of Time to 11/08/2022 to Answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint, filed by Freedom Metals Inc., signed by Judge William C Griesbach on 10/06/2022. (cc: all counsel)(Griesbach, William)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 05, 2022
11 11 misc Disclosure Statement Wed 10/05 9:50 AM
DISCLOSURE Statement by Freedom Metals LLC. (Osherow, Mark)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 04, 2022
10 10 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Tue 10/04 8:48 AM
Stipulated MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Freedom Metals Inc.(Liro, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
9 9 misc Disclosure Statement Tue 10/04 8:44 AM
DISCLOSURE Statement by Freedom Metals Inc. (Liro, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 26, 2022
8 8 service Summons Returned Executed Mon 09/26 10:46 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Freedom Metals LLC. Freedom Metals Inc served on 9/20/2022. (Osherow, Mark)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 09, 2022
service Summons Reissued Fri 09/09 10:47 AM
Summons Reissued as to Freedom Metals Inc. (mac)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 08, 2022
7 7 misc Request for Issuance of Summons Thu 09/08 11:28 AM
REQUEST for Issuance of Summons by Freedom Metals LLC (Osherow, Mark)
Related: [-]
misc Notice of Electronic Filing Error Thu 09/08 11:01 AM
NOTICE of Electronic Filing Error re6 Amended Complaint. The attached summons was not prepared using the version found on our website and the description of the attachment contains duplicate text. Most documents on the drop-down list do not need further description. If you want to add a description, do not retype the same words into the description box. If you choose Summons from the drop-down list, then you may use the description box to the type in the name of the party to whom the summons is directed but you do not need to type the word summons. Please follow the instructions and resubmit the summons using the event Request for Issuance of Summons which is found under the heading other documents. Please refer to the policies and procedures for electronic case filing and the user manual found at www.wied.uscourts.gov. (kwf)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 07, 2022
6 6 cmp Amended Complaint Wed 09/07 1:27 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against Freedom Metals Inc filed by Freedom Metals LLC.(Osherow, Mark)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A-Freedom Metals, LLC (Florida),
Att: 2 Exhibit B-Freedom Metals, LLC (Florida internet),
Att: 3 Exhibit C-Freedom Metals, Inc. (Wisconsin),
Att: 4 Exhibit D-Freedom Metals, Inc. (Wisconsin internet2),
Att: 5 Exhibit E-Composite,
Att: 6 Exhibit F-Infringement Letter 1.18.22,
Att: 7 Exhibit G-Trademark Electronic Search System (TESS),
Att: 8 Exhibit H-Freedom Metals, Inc. (North Carolina),
Att: 9 Exhibit I-Composite,
Att: 10 Exhibit J-Composite,
Att: 11 Exhibit K-Freedom Metals, LLC (Colorado),
Att: 12 Exhibit L- Composite,
Att: 13 Exhibit M-Freedom Metals, LLC (New Jersey),
Att: 14 Exhibit N-Freedom Metals, LLC (New Jersey internet),
Att: 15 Exhibit O-CRCH Freedom Metals, LLC (Delaware),
Att: 16 Exhibit P-Freedom Metals, LLC (Florida),
Att: 17 Exhibit Q-Freedom Metals, LLC (Florida internet),
Att: 18 Summons Summons for Freedom Metals, Inc. -Amended Complaint
Tuesday, June 21, 2022
service Summons Issued Tue 06/21 10:27 AM
Summons Issued as to Freedom Metals Inc. (tlf)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 20, 2022
5 5 misc Statement Mon 06/20 10:51 AM
STATEMENT by Freedom Metals LLC Plaintiff's Corporate Disclosure Statement . (Osherow, Mark)
Related: [-]
4 4 misc Request for Issuance of Summons Mon 06/20 10:32 AM
REQUEST for Issuance of Summons by Freedom Metals LLC (Osherow, Mark)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 17, 2022
3 3 misc Patent/Trademark Report to Commissioner of Patents Fri 06/17 10:08 AM
Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks. (tlf)
Related: [-]
misc Case Opening Modification Fri 06/17 9:58 AM
Case Opening Modification(s). The following modification(s) have been made to your case entry: The county code has been modified - please remember to choose the county for the first named plaintiff. One or more party names have been modified to remove punctuation and addresses - please remember to follow the Party Name Guidelines found on our website. The attached summons was not prepared using the version found on our website - please follow the instructions and resubmit the summons using the event Request for Issuance of Summons which is found under the heading other documents. Please refer to the[LINK:attorney case opening instructions] , the[LINK:summons instructions] and the[LINK:party name guidelines found in the user manual] for further guidance (tlf)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 16, 2022
2 2 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 06/16 2:01 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Mark R Osherow on behalf of Freedom Metals, LLC. Attorney(s) appearing: Kenyetta N. Alexander (Osherow, Mark)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Thu 06/16 1:37 PM
COMPLAINT against Freedom Metals, Inc. by Freedom Metals, LLC. ( Filing Fee PAID $402 receipt number AWIEDC-4142048)(Osherow, Mark) Modified on 6/16/2022 (rcm)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Summons,
Att: 3 Ex A - Freedom Metals, LLC (Florida),
Att: 4 Ex B - Freedom Metals, LLC (Florida Internet),
Att: 5 Ex C - Freedom Metals, Inc. (Wisconsin),
Att: 6 Ex D - Freedom Metals, Inc. (Wisconsin internet2),
Att: 7 Ex E Composite - Freedom Metals, Inc. (Wisconsin internet3 &4),
Att: 8 EX F - Infringement Letter 1.18.22,
Att: 9 EX G - Trademark Electronic Search System (TESS),
Att: 10 EX H Composite - Freedom Metals (Pennsylvania) & Freedom Metals Manufacturing, Inc. (Pennsylvania),
Att: 11 EX I Part 1 - Freedom Metals Manufacturing, Inc. (Pennsylvania internet),
Att: 12 EX I Part 2 - Freedom Metals Manufacturing, Inc. (Pennsylvania internet2),
Att: 13 EX J - Freedom Metals, Inc. (North Carolina),
Att: 14 EX K - Freedom Metals, LLC (Colorado),
Att: 15 EX L Part 1 - Freedom Metals, LLC (Colorado internet),
Att: 16 EX L Part 1 - Freedom Metals, LLC (Colorado internet2),
Att: 17 EX M -Freedom Metals, LLC (New Jersey internet) Freedom Metals, LLC (New Jersey internet),
Att: 18 EX N - Freedom Metals, LLC (New Jersey),
Att: 19 EX O - Freedom Metals, LLC (Florida internet),
Att: 20 EX P - Freedom Metals, LLC (Florida)
notice Notice of Judge Assignment Thu 06/16 1:49 PM
NOTICE Regarding assignment of this matter to Judge William C Griesbach; Consent/refusal forms for Magistrate Judge Joseph to be filed within 21 days; the consent/refusal form is available[LINK:here.] Pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7.1 a disclosure statement is to be filed upon the first filing of any paper and should be filed now if not already filed. (jcl)
Related: [-]