Member Case
Lead case is: 1:22-bk-41392

New York Eastern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Elizabeth S Stong
Case #: 1:22-bk-41393
Case Filed:Jun 16, 2022
Terminated:Aug 17, 2023

TypeOther Entity Type
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors100-199
Est. Assets$0 to $50,000
Est. Liabilities $1,000,001 to $10 million
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
Neighborhood Radiology Management Services, LLC
11320 Queens Blvd
Forest Hills, NY 11375-6468
Represented By
Dawn Kirby
Kirby Aisner & Curley LLP
contact info
Erica Feynman Aisner
Kirby Aisner & Curley LLP
contact info
Last checked: never
U.S. Trustee
Office of the United States Trustee
Eastern District of NY (Brooklyn Office) U.S. Federal Office Building 201 Varick Street, Suite 1006
New York, NY 10014


Docket last updated: 11 hours ago
Thursday, August 17, 2023
court Close Bankruptcy Case Thu 08/17 4:01 PM
Bankruptcy Case Closed (ssw)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 28, 2023
38 38 court BNC Certificate of Mailing with Notice/Order Sat 07/29 12:13 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing with Notice/Order Notice Date 07/28/2023. (Admin.)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 21, 2023
37 37 order Dismissing Case and Barring Debtor(s) with Notice Wed 07/26 2:39 PM
Order Dismissing Chapter 11 Cases With Prejudice Effective Immediately. CDP Holdings Group, LLC , Neighborhood Radiology Management Services, LLC , and Neighborhood Radiology Services, P.C. are precluded from refiling bankruptcy for a period of one year from the entry of this Order starting 7/21/2023 to 7/20/2024. Signed on 7/21/2023 (drk)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 16, 2022
36 36 misc Letter Wed 11/16 3:28 PM
Letter Requesting Assistance to File Response Filed by Tess Mittman ( Forwarded to Pro Se Clerk) (mem)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 08, 2022
35 35 misc Amended Schedule(s), Statement(s) and Affidavit Pursuant to E.D.N.Y. LBR 1009-1(a) (Fee Due) Mon 08/08 12:34 PM
Amended Schedule(s), Required Statement(s) and Affidavit Pursuant to E.D.N.Y. LBR 1009-1(a) Schedule E/F, Fee Amount $32 Filed by Erica Feynman Aisner on behalf of Neighborhood Radiology Management Services, LLC (Aisner, Erica)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Verification of Amendment to Schedule F
34 34 misc Amended List of Creditors Mon 08/08 11:35 AM
Amended List of Creditors / Verification of Amendments to Creditor Matrix . Filed by Erica Feynman Aisner on behalf of Neighborhood Radiology Management Services, LLC (Aisner, Erica)
Related: [-]
crditcrd Automatic docket of credit card/debit card Mon 08/08 12:35 PM
Receipt of Amended Schedule(s), Required Statement(s) and Affidavit Pursuant to E.D.N.Y. LBR 1009-1(a) (Fee Due)([LINK:1 22-41393 ess] ) [misc,aschsfa] ( 32.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A20978992. Fee amount 32.00. Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#35
Friday, August 05, 2022
33 33 notice Notice of Change of Address Fri 08/05 10:10 AM
Notice of Change of Address of Northpoint Commercial Credit, LLC from 6465 Wayzata Blvd, Suite 760, Minneapolis, MN 55426 to 100 S. Washington Ave, Ste. 1530, Minneapolis, MN 55401. Filed by Jessica M. Hill on behalf of Neighborhood Radiology Management Services, LLC (Hill, Jessica)
Related: [-]
32 32 notice Notice of Change of Address Fri 08/05 10:09 AM
Notice of Change of Address of Integrated Document Solutions from 3511 West Commercial Blvd, Fort Lauderdale, FL 33309 to 20803 Biscayne Blvd, Ste. 320, Miami, FL 33180-1431. Filed by Jessica M. Hill on behalf of Neighborhood Radiology Management Services, LLC (Hill, Jessica)
Related: [-]
31 31 notice Notice of Change of Address Fri 08/05 10:07 AM
Notice of Change of Address of Empire Water from 46 Cain Drive, Plainview, NY 11803 to 3175 Bass Pro Drive, Grapevine, TX 76051-1987. Filed by Jessica M. Hill on behalf of Neighborhood Radiology Management Services, LLC (Hill, Jessica)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 18, 2022
court zMinute Entry - Hearing Held - Text Orders (Document BK & AP) Thu 07/21 8:31 AM
Hearing Held; Related [+] Appearances: Debtor, Office of the United States Trustee, Luminate Bank, A.J. Richard & Son, Inc., Ms. Mittman. MARKED OFF, IT IS SO ORDERED BY s/Elizabeth S. Stong. Endorsed on Calendar dated 7/18/2022 (This is a text Order, no document is attached) (sej)
Related: [-] 12 Motion to Authorize/Direct Filed by Debtor Neighborhood Radiology Management Services, LLC
court zMinute Entry - Hearing Held - Text Orders (Document BK & AP) Thu 07/21 8:31 AM
Hearing Held; Related [+] Appearances: Debtor, Office of the United States Trustee, Luminate Bank, A.J. Richard & Son, Inc., Ms. Mittman. MARKED OFF, IT IS SO ORDERED BY s/Elizabeth S. Stong. Endorsed on Calendar dated 7/18/2022 (This is a text Order, no document is attached) (sej)
Related: [-] 11 Motion to Use Cash Collateral Filed by Debtor Neighborhood Radiology Management Services, LLC
court zMinute Entry - Hearing Held - Text Orders (Document BK & AP) Thu 07/21 8:31 AM
Hearing Held; Related [+] Appearances: Debtor, Office of the United States Trustee, Luminate Bank, A.J. Richard & Son, Inc., Ms. Mittman. MARKED OFF, IT IS SO ORDERED BY s/Elizabeth S. Stong. Endorsed on Calendar dated 7/18/2022 (This is a text Order, no document is attached) (sej)
Related: [-] 10 Motion to Authorize/Direct Filed by Debtor Neighborhood Radiology Management Services, LLC
Friday, July 15, 2022
30 30 notice Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Fri 07/15 2:06 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by H. Peter Haveles Jr. on behalf of Luminate Bank (Haveles, H.)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 14, 2022
29 29 misc Letter Thu 07/14 9:52 PM
Letter \ Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor Filed by Erica Feynman Aisner on behalf of Neighborhood Radiology Management Services, LLC (Aisner, Erica)
Related: [-]
28 28 misc Declaration Under Penalty of Perjury for Non-Individual Debtors (Form 202) Thu 07/14 9:50 PM
Summary of Assets and Liabilities for Non-Individuals (Form 206Sum) for Non-Individuals , Schedule(s), Statement(s) and Affidavit Pursuant to E.D.N.Y. LBR 1007-1(b) Schedule A/B, Schedule C, Schedule D, Schedule E/F, Schedule G, Schedule H, : Statement of Financial Affairs Fee Amount $32, Declaration Under Penalty of Perjury for Non-Individual Debtors (Form 202), Statement of Financial Affairs for Non-Individuals (Form 207) Filed by Erica Feynman Aisner on behalf of Neighborhood Radiology Management Services, LLC Related [+] (Aisner, Erica)
Related: [-] 17 Deficient Filing Chapter 11
crditcrd Automatic docket of credit card/debit card Thu 07/14 10:00 PM
Receipt of Schedule(s), Statement(s) and Affidavit Pursuant to E.D.N.Y. LBR 1007-1(b) (Fee Due)([LINK:1 22-41393 ess] ) [misc,schsfa] ( 32.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A20923184. Fee amount 32.00. Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#28
Tuesday, June 28, 2022
27 27 notice Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Tue 06/28 11:23 AM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by J. Logan Rappaport on behalf of Signature Financial LLC (Rappaport, J.)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 24, 2022
26 26 court BNC Certificate of Mailing with Notice of Consolidation and Amend Caption Sat 06/25 12:08 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing with Notice of Consolidation and Amend Caption Notice Date 06/24/2022. (Admin.)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 23, 2022
25 25 court BNC Certificate of Mailing with Notice of Deficient Filing Fri 06/24 12:11 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing with Notice of Deficient Filing Notice Date 06/23/2022. (Admin.)
Related: [-]
24 24 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors Fri 06/24 12:11 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors Notice Date 06/23/2022. (Admin.)
Related: [-]
23 23 court BNC Certificate of Mailing with Notice of Electronic Filing Fri 06/24 12:11 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing with Notice of Electronic Filing Notice Date 06/23/2022. (Admin.)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 22, 2022
22 22 order Joint Administration Wed 06/22 4:43 PM
Order Granting Motion For Joint Administration on Lead Case: 22-41392 ess with Member Cases: 22-41393 ess and 22-41394 ess Related [+] Signed on 6/22/2022. (rjl)
Related: [-] 8
court Entry Wed 06/22 5:05 PM
An Order has been entered in this case directing the procedural consolidation and joint administration of the Chapter 11 cases commenced by CDP Holdings Group, LLC, Neighborhood Radiology Management Services, LLC, and Neighborhood Radiology Services, P.C. The docket in Case No. 22-41392 ess should be consulted for all matters affecting the above listed cases Related [+] (rjl)
Related: [-] .22
court zMinute Entry - Hearing Held (Document BK & AP) Mon 06/27 8:11 AM
Hearing Held; Related [+] Appearances: Debtor, Office of the United States Trustee, Alpha Medical, Signature Financial LLC, United States Small Business Administration - No opposition - Granted - Submit order. (sej)
Related: [-] 8 Motion for Joint Administration Filed by Debtor Neighborhood Radiology Management Services, LLC
court zMinute Entry - Hearing Held (Document BK & AP) Mon 06/27 8:11 AM
Hearing Held; Related [+] Appearances: Debtor, Office of the United States Trustee, Alpha Medical, Signature Financial LLC, United States Small Business Administration - No opposition - Granted - Submit order. (sej)
Related: [-] 9 Motion to Extend Deadline to File Schedules Filed by Debtor Neighborhood Radiology Management Services, LLC
court zMinute Entry - Hearing Held and Adjourned (Document BK & AP) Mon 06/27 8:18 AM
Hearing Held and Adjourned; Appearances: Debtor, Office of the United States Trustee, Alpha Medical, Signature Financial LLC, United States Small Business Administration - No opposition - Granted on interim basis as reflected in the record. Submit interim order on consent as to form of UST. 'Hearing scheduled for 07/18/2022 at 01:30 PM at Courtroom 3585 (Judge Stong), Brooklyn, NY Related [+] (sej)
Related: [-] 12 Motion to Authorize/Direct Filed by Debtor Neighborhood Radiology Management Services, LLC
court zMinute Entry - Hearing Held and Adjourned (Document BK & AP) Mon 06/27 8:19 AM
Hearing Held and Adjourned; Appearances: Debtor, Office of the United States Trustee, Alpha Medical, Signature Financial LLC, United States Small Business Administration - No opposition - Granted on interim basis as reflected in the record. Submit interim order on consent as to form of UST. 'Hearing scheduled for 07/18/2022 at 01:30 PM at Courtroom 3585 (Judge Stong), Brooklyn, NY Related [+] (sej)
Related: [-] 11 Motion to Use Cash Collateral Filed by Debtor Neighborhood Radiology Management Services, LLC
court zMinute Entry - Hearing Held and Adjourned (Document BK & AP) Mon 06/27 8:19 AM
Hearing Held and Adjourned; Appearances: Debtor, Office of the United States Trustee, Alpha Medical, Signature Financial LLC, United States Small Business Administration - No opposition - Granted on interim basis as reflected in the record. Submit interim order on consent as to form of UST. 'Hearing scheduled for 07/18/2022 at 01:30 PM at Courtroom 3585 (Judge Stong), Brooklyn, NY Related [+] (sej)
Related: [-] 10 Motion to Authorize/Direct Filed by Debtor Neighborhood Radiology Management Services, LLC
Tuesday, June 21, 2022
21 21 notice Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Tue 06/21 5:08 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by J. Logan Rappaport on behalf of Signature Financial LLC (Rappaport, J.)
Related: [-]
20 20 motion Employ (Application) Tue 06/21 4:54 PM
Amended Application to Employ Kirby Aisner & Curley LLP as Attorney for the Debtor to reflect correct Court District Filed by Erica Feynman Aisner on behalf of Neighborhood Radiology Management Services, LLC Related [+]. (Aisner, Erica)
Related: [-] 5 Application to Employ filed by Debtor Neighborhood Radiology Management Services, LLC
19 19 misc Affidavit/Certificate of Service Tue 06/21 3:23 PM
Affidavit/Certificate of Service Filed by Erica Feynman Aisner on behalf of Neighborhood Radiology Management Services, LLC Related [+] (Aisner, Erica)
Related: [-] 8 Motion for Joint Administration filed by Debtor Neighborhood Radiology Management Services, LLC,9 Motion to Extend Deadline to File Schedules filed by Debtor Neighborhood Radiology Management Services, LLC,10 Motion to Authorize/Direct filed by Debtor Neighborhood Radiology Management Services, LLC,11 Motion to Use Cash Collateral filed by Debtor Neighborhood Radiology Management Services, LLC,12 Motion to Authorize/Direct filed by Debtor Neighborhood Radiology Management Services, LLC,13 Letter filed by Debtor Neighborhood Radiology Management Services, LLC,14 Letter Providing Notice of Court Hearing filed by Debtor Neighborhood Radiology Management Services, LLC
18 18 court Meeting of Creditors Chapter 11 Tue 06/21 10:49 AM
Meeting of Creditors 341(a) meeting to be held on 7/25/2022 at 12:45 PM at Teleconference - Brooklyn. (rjl)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 20, 2022
16 16 misc Letter Mon 06/20 4:19 PM
Letter / Supplement to Debtors' Motion For An Order (A) Authorizing Of Neighborhood Radiology Services P.C. To (1) Pay And Honor Certain Prepetition Claims For (I) Wages, Salaries, Employee Benefits And Other Compensation, And (Ii) Withholdings And Deductions; (2) Continue To Provide Employee Benefits In The Ordinary Course Of Business; (3) Pay All Related Costs And Expenses; And (B) Directing Banks To Receive, Process, Honor And Pay All Checks And Electronic Payment Requests Relating To The Foregoing Filed by Erica Feynman Aisner on behalf of Neighborhood Radiology Management Services, LLC Related [+] (Aisner, Erica)
Related: [-] 10 Motion to Authorize/Direct filed by Debtor Neighborhood Radiology Management Services, LLC
Att: 1 Proposed Order (clean version)
Att: 2 Proposed Order (redlined version)
15 15 misc Letter Mon 06/20 4:04 PM
Letter / Supplement to Debtor's Motion for Joint Administration Filed by Erica Feynman Aisner on behalf of Neighborhood Radiology Management Services, LLC Related [+] (Aisner, Erica)
Related: [-] 8 Motion for Joint Administration filed by Debtor Neighborhood Radiology Management Services, LLC
Att: 1 Proposed Order (clean version)
Att: 2 Proposed Order (redlined version)
Friday, June 17, 2022
14 14 misc Letter Providing Notice of Court Hearing (Only to be Used When Directed by Chambers) Fri 06/17 5:28 PM
Letter Providing Notice of Court Hearing Filed by Erica Feynman Aisner on behalf of Neighborhood Radiology Management Services, LLC Related [+] Hearing scheduled for 6/22/2022 at 02:00 PM (check with court for location). (Aisner, Erica)
Related: [-] 8 Motion for Joint Administration filed by Debtor Neighborhood Radiology Management Services, LLC,9 Motion to Extend Deadline to File Schedules filed by Debtor Neighborhood Radiology Management Services, LLC,10 Motion to Authorize/Direct filed by Debtor Neighborhood Radiology Management Services, LLC,11 Motion to Use Cash Collateral filed by Debtor Neighborhood Radiology Management Services, LLC,12 Motion to Authorize/Direct filed by Debtor Neighborhood Radiology Management Services, LLC
13 13 misc Letter Fri 06/17 5:14 PM
Letter / Declaration of Daniel DiPietro on Behalf of the Debtors Pursuant to Local Rule 1007-4 and 9077-1 Filed by Erica Feynman Aisner on behalf of Neighborhood Radiology Management Services, LLC (Aisner, Erica)
Related: [-]
12 12 motion Authorize/Direct Fri 06/17 5:08 PM
Motion to Authorize/Direct Debtors to Continue Use of Pre-Petition Cash Management Practices and Bank Accounts Filed by Erica Feynman Aisner on behalf of Neighborhood Radiology Management Services, LLC. (Aisner, Erica)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Bank Account Schedule
11 11 14 pgs motion Use Cash Collateral Fri 06/17 4:26 PM
Motion to Use Cash Collateral Interim Basis and Providing Adequate Protection therefor Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. Sections 361 and 362 and (II) Scheduling Final Hearing Filed by Erica Feynman Aisner on behalf of Neighborhood Radiology Management Services, LLC. (Aisner, Erica)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - F
Att: 2 Exhibit G - H
Att: 3 Exhibit I - L
10 10 motion Authorize/Direct Fri 06/17 2:35 PM
Motion to Authorize/Direct / Motion For An Order (A) Authorizing Of Neighborhood Radiology Services P.C. To (1) Pay And Honor Certain Prepetition Claims For (I) Wages, Salaries, Employee Benefits And Other Compensation, And (Ii) Withholdings And Deductions; (2) Continue To Provide Employee Benefits In The Ordinary Course Of Business; (3) Pay All Related Costs And Expenses; And (B) Directing Banks To Receive, Process, Honor And Pay All Checks And Electronic Payment Requests Relating To The Foregoing Filed by Erica Feynman Aisner on behalf of Neighborhood Radiology Management Services, LLC. Hearing scheduled for 6/22/2022 at 02:00 PM (check with court for location). (Aisner, Erica)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit "A" - NRS Payroll
Att: 2 Exhibit "B" - CRS Payroll
Att: 3 Exhibit "C" - Proposed Order
9 9 motion Extend Deadline to File Schedules Fri 06/17 1:34 PM
Motion to Extend Deadline to File Schedules or Provide Required Information Filed by Erica Feynman Aisner on behalf of Neighborhood Radiology Management Services, LLC. (Aisner, Erica)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
8 8 motion Joint Administration Fri 06/17 1:31 PM
Motion for Joint Administration of Case 22-41392 with Case(s) 22-41393 22-41394 Filed by Erica Feynman Aisner on behalf of Neighborhood Radiology Management Services, LLC. (Aisner, Erica)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
7 7 notice Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Fri 06/17 1:08 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Paul A Levine on behalf of Alpha Medical Equipment of New York, Inc. (Levine, Paul)
Related: [-]
6 6 notice Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Fri 06/17 1:06 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Javier J Mendez Rodriguez on behalf of Alpha Medical Equipment of New York, Inc. (Mendez Rodriguez, Javier)
Related: [-]
5 5 motion Employ (Application) Fri 06/17 11:54 AM
Application to Employ Kirby Aisner & Curley LLP as Attorneys for the Debtor as of June 16, 2022 Filed by Erica Feynman Aisner on behalf of Neighborhood Radiology Management Services, LLC. (Aisner, Erica)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration of Erica R. Aisner
court Case Related to a Chapter 11 Fri 06/17 8:21 AM
The above case is related to Case Number(s) 22-41392 ess CDP Holdings Group, LLC; 22-41394 ess Neighborhood Radiology Services, P.C. (drk)
Related: [-]
utility Judge Reassignment Utility Fri 06/17 8:22 AM
Judge Nancy Hershey Lord removed from the case due to Related Case, Judge Reassigned. Judge Elizabeth S. Stong added to the case. (drk)
Related: [-]
court Hearing Sched/Resched (Document) Tue 06/21 9:13 AM
Hearing scheduled for 6/22/2022 at 02:00 PM at Courtroom 3585 (Judge Stong), Brooklyn, NY. Related [+] (sej)
Related: [-] 8 Motion for Joint Administration filed by Debtor Neighborhood Radiology Management Services, LLC,9 Motion to Extend Deadline to File Schedules filed by Debtor Neighborhood Radiology Management Services, LLC,11 Motion to Use Cash Collateral filed by Debtor Neighborhood Radiology Management Services, LLC,12 Motion to Authorize/Direct filed by Debtor Neighborhood Radiology Management Services, LLC
Thursday, June 16, 2022
17 17 court Deficient Filing Chapter 11 Tue 06/21 10:26 AM
Deficient Filing Chapter 11 Statement Pursuant to E.D.N.Y. LBR 1073-2b due by 6/16/2022. Affidavit Pursuant to E.D.N.Y. LBR 1007-4 due 6/16/2022. 20 Largest Unsecured Creditors due 6/16/2022. Corporate Disclosure Statement Pursuant to FBR 1073-3 due 6/16/2022. Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor. 11 U.S.C. § 329 and Fed. R. Bankr. P. 2016(b) (Official Form 2030) due 6/30/2022. Summary of Assets and Liabilities for Non-Individuals Official Form 206Sum due by 6/30/2022. Schedules A/B, D, E/F, G, H due 6/30/2022. Declaration Under Penalty of Perjury for Non Individual Debtors Official Form 202 due 6/30/2022. List of Equity Security Holders due 6/30/2022. Statement of Financial Affairs Non-Ind Form 207 due 6/30/2022. Incomplete Filings due by 6/30/2022. (rjl)
Related: [-]
4 4 misc Letter Thu 06/16 9:24 PM
Letter / Statement Pursuant to Local Bankruptcy Rule 1073-2(b) Filed by Erica Feynman Aisner on behalf of Neighborhood Radiology Management Services, LLC (Aisner, Erica)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Letter Thu 06/16 5:51 PM
Letter / Statement Regarding Authority to Sign and File Petition Filed by Erica Feynman Aisner on behalf of Neighborhood Radiology Management Services, LLC (Aisner, Erica)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Statement of Corporate Ownership Thu 06/16 5:48 PM
Statement of Corporate Ownership filed. Filed by Dawn Kirby on behalf of Neighborhood Radiology Management Services, LLC (Kirby, Dawn)
Related: [-]
1 1 13 pgs misc Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) Thu 06/16 5:33 PM
Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition for Non-Individuals. Fee Amount $ 1738. Filed by Dawn Kirby on behalf of Neighborhood Radiology Management Services, LLC Chapter 11 Plan due by 10/14/2022. Disclosure Statement due by 10/14/2022. (Kirby, Dawn)
Related: [-]
crditcrd Automatic docket of credit card/debit card Thu 06/16 5:41 PM
Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)([LINK:1 22-41393 ) [misc,volp11a] (1738.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A20860112. Fee amount 1738.00. Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#1