Florida Southern District Court
Judge:Kathleen M Williams
Referred: Alicia O Valle
Case #: 0:22-cv-61156
Nature of Suit820 Property Rights - Copyrights
Cause28:1338 Copyright Infringement
Case Filed:Jun 17, 2022
Terminated:Jul 21, 2023
Last checked: Friday Dec 16, 2022 3:47 AM EST
Defendant
Frank J. Mari
209 SE 25th Avenue Apartment 3
Pompano Beach, FL 33062
Plaintiff
Blaine Harrington , III
Represented By
Daniel DeSouza
Desouza Law, PA
contact info
James D'Loughy
Advisorlaw PLLC
contact info

GPO Jun 29 2023
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION that 16 Plaintiff's Motion for Default Judgment be granted in part. Objections to R&R due by 7/13/2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alicia O. Valle on 6/29/2023. See attached document for full details. (sd01)
GPO Jul 21 2023
Order granting 16 MOTION for Default Judgment ; Adopting 23 Report and Recommendations. This case is CLOSED. Signed by Judge Kathleen M. Williams on 7/21/2023. See attached document for full details. (rbe)
GPO Mar 22 2024
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION that 30 Plaintiff's Motion for Contempt be granted. Objections to R&R due by 4/5/2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alicia O. Valle on 3/22/2024. See attached document for full details. (sd01)
GPO Aug 05 2024
ORDER: Judge Valle's Report (DE 37) is AFFIRMED IN PART AND REJECTED IN PART. Certificate of Appealability: No Ruling. Signed by Judge Kathleen M. Williams on 8/5/2024. See attached document for full details. (scn)

Docket last updated: 5 hours ago
Wednesday, September 11, 2024
45 45 service Certificate of Service Wed 09/11 9:20 AM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Maureen Harrington(DeSouza, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit FedEx Label,
Att: 2 Exhibit Proof of First Class Mailing
Monday, August 26, 2024
42 42 service Certificate of Service Mon 08/26 9:57 AM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Maureen Harrington re41 Order Adopting Report and Recommendations, Order on Report and Recommendations(DeSouza, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Proof of Service
Monday, August 05, 2024
41 41 2 pgs order Order Adopting Report and Recommendations Order on Report and Recommendations Mon 08/05 11:33 AM
ORDER: Judge Valle's Report (DE37 ) is AFFIRMED IN PART AND REJECTED IN PART. Certificate of Appealability: No Ruling. Signed by Judge Kathleen M. Williams on 8/5/2024. See attached document for full details. (scn)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 25, 2024
40 40 respoth Answer to Writ of Garnishment Thu 07/25 1:49 PM
ANSWER to Writ of Garnishment Garnishee Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.'s Answer to Writ of Garnishment and Demand for Payment of Attorney's Fees by c/o Miguel Cordano, Esq. Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. Reply/Objections to Writ Answer due by 8/14/2024. (Cordano, Miguel)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 22, 2024
37 37 motion Report and Recommendations Fri 03/22 4:49 PM
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION that30 Plaintiff's Motion for Contempt be granted. Objections to R&R due by 4/5/2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alicia O. Valle on 3/22/2024. See attached document for full details. (sd01)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 08, 2024
36 36 notice Notice (Other) Fri 03/08 9:32 AM
NOTICE of Filing by Maureen Harrington (Hausman, Lauren)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Thursday, March 07, 2024
35 35 minutes Show Cause Hearing Thu 03/07 2:23 PM
PAPERLESS Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Alicia O. Valle: Show Cause Hearing held on 3/7/2024. Order to follow. Total time in court: 15 minutes. Attorney Appearance(s): Lauren Michelle Hausman, Jonathan Alejandreno. Defendant not present. (Digital 14:07:36) (tpl)
Related: [-]
34 34 notice Notice (Other) Thu 03/07 10:36 AM
PAPERLESS COURTROOM DESIGNATION FOR SHOW CAUSE HEARING. The show cause hearing previously scheduled for today, March 7, 2024 at 2:00 p.m. will be held in Courtroom 310 at the Federal Courthouse in Fort Lauderdale, Florida. (sd01)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 06, 2024
33 33 notice Notice of Attorney Appearance Wed 03/06 2:09 PM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Lauren Michelle Hausman on behalf of Maureen Harrington. Attorney Lauren Michelle Hausman added to party Maureen Harrington (pty:pla). (Hausman, Lauren)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 08, 2024
32 32 notice Notice of Compliance Thu 02/08 3:11 PM
NOTICE of Compliance by Maureen Harrington re 31 Order on Motion for Order to Show Cause,,,,,,,, (DeSouza, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 05, 2024
31 31 order Order on Motion to Show Cause Mon 02/05 3:43 PM
PAPERLESS ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. This cause comes before the Court upon30 Plaintiff's Motion for Order to Show Cause Why Defendant Should Not be Held in Contempt (the "Motion"). In relevant part, on July 21, 2023, the Court entered a Default Judgment in favor of Plaintiff and against Defendant in the amount of $26,104.15 . ECF Nos.24 ,25 . On October 23. 2023, the undersigned granted a Motion to Compel discovery in aid of execution. ECF No.28 . The instant Motion followed. Having reviewed the Motion, and being otherwise duly advised on the matter, it is hereby ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that the Motion is GRANTED . Defendant Frank J. Mari, d/b/a State of Florida Property Management Association, must physically appear before the Court on March 7, 2024 at 2:00 p.m. to show cause why additional sanctions should not be imposed upon him (the "Show Cause Hearing"). A courtroom designation will be provided by separate Order. Defendant's failure to appear at the Show Cause Hearing may result in a recommendation that the Court impose sanctions upon Defendant, including per-day fines, and possible arrest and incarceration until Defendant complies with the Court's Orders . The Show Cause Hearing may be canceled upon Plaintiff's Notice to the Court that Defendant has complied with post-judgment discovery in aid of execution, which must take place by March 1, 2024 . Plaintiff must serve Defendant with the Motion, all filings in these proceedings, and this Order to Show cause by: (i) certified and regular U.S. mail to Defendant's last known address at 209 SE 25th Avenue, Apartment 3, Pompano Beach, FL 33062; and (ii) email to Membership@sfpma.com, nationalevictions@yahoo.com, and any additional email address that Plaintiff reasonably believes is used by Defendant. Upon service, Plaintiff must file a Notice of Compliance regarding the same. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alicia O. Valle on 2/5/2024. (sd01)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 13, 2023
30 30 motion Show Cause Wed 12/13 12:35 PM
Plaintiff's MOTION for Order to Show Cause Plaintiff's Motion for Order to Show Cause Why Defendant Should Not Be Held in Contempt by Maureen Harrington.(DeSouza, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit "A" TO Motion
Wednesday, October 25, 2023
29 29 notice Notice of Compliance Wed 10/25 4:37 PM
NOTICE of Compliance by Maureen Harrington re28 Order on Motion to Compel (DeSouza, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 23, 2023
28 28 2 pgs order Order on Motion to Compel Mon 10/23 6:48 PM
ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART27 Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Post-Judgment Discovery Responses. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alicia O. Valle on 10/23/2023. See attached document for full details. (sd01)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 21, 2023
27 27 motion Compel Thu 09/21 10:38 AM
Plaintiff's MOTION to Compel Post-Judgment Discovery Responses by Maureen Harrington. Responses due by 10/5/2023(DeSouza, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Text of Proposed Order
Wednesday, February 01, 2023
notice Clerk's Notice of Undeliverable Mail Wed 02/01 2:13 PM
FIRST Clerk's Notice of Undeliverable Mail re 17 Order Referring Motion,,. US Mail returned for: Frank J. Mari. The Court has not located an updated address for this party. After two undeliverable notices from the Court, notices will no longer be sent to this party in this case until a correct address is provided. (mp)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 09, 2023
order Order Referring Motion Mon 01/09 5:20 PM
PAPERLESS ORDER REFERRING MOTION TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE VALLE. THIS MATTER is before the Court sua sponte . Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 636 and the Magistrate Rules of the Local Rules for the Southern District of Florida, it is ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that the following matters are REFERRED to U.S. Magistrate Judge Alicia O. Valle for a report and recommendation: (1) The issue of whether Plaintiff properly effectuated service on Defendant by the Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(m) deadline; and (2) 16 Plaintiff's Motion for Default Judgment. Signed by Judge Kathleen M. Williams on 1/9/2023. (sgm)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 03, 2023
16 16 motion Default Judgment Tue 01/03 12:53 PM
MOTION for Default Judgment by Blaine Harrington, III.(DeSouza, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit Exhibit B,
Att: 3 Text of Proposed Order Text of Proposed Order,
Att: 4 Clerk's Default,
Att: 5 Unanswered Pleading (First Amended Complaint),
Att: 6 Bill of Costs
Monday, November 14, 2022
15 15 order Clerk's Entry/Non-Entry of Default - FORM Mon 11/14 10:35 AM
Clerk's Entry of Default as to Frank J Mari; Granting14 Motion for Clerk's Entry of Default. Signed by DEPUTY CLERK on 11/14/2022. (scn)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 11, 2022
14 14 motion Clerk's Entry of Default Fri 11/11 2:00 PM
MOTION for Clerk's Entry of Default as to Frank J. Mari by Blaine Harrington, III.(DeSouza, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit
Monday, October 17, 2022
13 13 misc Affidavit Mon 10/17 3:58 PM
AFFIDAVIT signed by: Daniel DeSouza re12 Summons Issued by Blaine Harrington, III(DeSouza, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit
Friday, September 02, 2022
12 12 service Summons Issued Fri 09/02 4:53 PM
Summons Issued as to Frank J. Mari. (jas)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 01, 2022
11 11 notice Notice of Filing Proposed Summons(es) Thu 09/01 4:08 PM
NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summons(es) by Blaine Harrington, III re1 Complaint, filed by Blaine Harrington, III (DeSouza, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 29, 2022
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time Mon 08/29 4:34 PM
PAPERLESS ORDER. THIS MATTER is before the Court on9 Plaintiff's Motion for Extension of the Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(m) Deadline to Serve Defendant. It is ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that9 Plaintiff's Motion for Extension is GRANTED . On or before October 17, 2022 , Plaintiff shall effectuate service of process and file proof of service of the Complaint on Defendant. If Plaintiff fails to serve Defendant with notice of this action by that day (evidenced by valid proof of service filed on the docket), any and all claims against Defendant will be dismissed without prejudice pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(m). Given the length of this extension, no further extensions will be granted absent emergency circumstances . Signed by Judge Kathleen M. Williams on 8/29/2022. (sgm)
Related: [-]
Sunday, August 28, 2022
9 9 motion Extension of Time Sun 08/28 1:49 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to serve defendant re 6 Order,,, by Blaine Harrington, III. Responses due by 9/12/2022 (DeSouza, Daniel)
Related: [-]
8 8 cmp Amended Complaint/Amended Notice of Removal Sun 08/28 1:45 PM
First AMENDED COMPLAINT against Frank J. Mari, filed by Blaine Harrington, III.(DeSouza, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit,
Att: 2 Exhibit
7 7 service Summons (Affidavit) Returned Unexecuted Sun 08/28 1:26 PM
Summons (Affidavit) Returned Unexecuted by Blaine Harrington, III as to Frank J. Mari. (DeSouza, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 03, 2022
order - Order (PAPERLESS or pdf attached) Wed 08/03 11:01 AM
PAPERLESS ORDER. THIS MATTER is before the Court sua sponte . Rule 4(m) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure requires Plaintiff to effectuate service of process and file proof of service of the Complaint on Defendant in this case no later than September 15, 2022. Accordingly, it is ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that on or before September 15, 2022, Plaintiff shall effectuate service of process and file proof of service of the Complaint on Defendant. If Plaintiff fails to serve Defendant with notice of this action by that day (evidenced by valid proof of service filed on the docket), any and all claims against Defendant will be dismissed without prejudice pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(m). Signed by Judge Kathleen M. Williams on 8/3/2022. (sgm)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 14, 2022
5 5 order Notice of Court Practice/to Appear/Other Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge Thu 07/14 9:31 AM
ORDER OF REFERRAL AND NOTICE OF COURT PRACTICE AND PROCEDURES: ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Alicia O. Valle for Pretrial Non-Dispositive Matters. Signed by Judge Kathleen M. Williams on 7/14/2022. See attached document for full details. (scn)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 17, 2022
4 4 service Summons Issued Fri 06/17 10:52 AM
Summons Issued as to Frank J. Mari. (mab)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Form AO 120/121 Fri 06/17 10:46 AM
FORM AO 121 SENT TO DIRECTOR OF U.S. COPYRIGHT OFFICE (mab)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Complaint
2 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Kathleen M. Williams. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Alicia O. Valle is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. (mab)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Fri 06/17 10:03 AM
COMPLAINT Original against Frank J Mari d/b/a SFPMA (South Florida Property Management Association). Filing fees $ 402.00 receipt number AFLSDC-15724703, filed by Blaine Harrington, III.(DeSouza, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Summon(s) Summons
order Clerk's Notice of Judge Assignment and Optional Consent Fri 06/17 10:28 AM
Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Kathleen M. Williams. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Alicia O. Valle is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. (mab)
Related: [-]