California Northern District Court
Judge:William H Orrick
Referred: Virginia K Demarchi
Case #: 3:22-cv-03580
Nature of Suit380 Torts - Personal Property - Other Personal Property Damage
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Personal Property
Case Filed:Jun 17, 2022
Last checked: Wednesday Dec 14, 2022 1:02 AM PST
Defendant
Meta Platforms, Inc.
Represented By
Trenton James Van Oss
Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher LLP
contact info
Cameron James Clark
Cooley LLP
contact info
Elizabeth Katharine McCloskey
Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher
contact info
Kyle C. Wong
Cooley LLP
contact info
Caroline A. Lebel
Cooley LLP
contact info
Caroline Lebel
Cooley LLP
contact info
Michael Graham Rhodes
Cooley LLP
contact info
Lauren R Goldman
Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher LLP
contact info
Abigail Augus Barrera
Gibson, Dunn And Crutcher LLP
contact info
Defendant
The Regents of the University of California
Represented By
Teresa Carey Chow
Baker & Hostetler LLP
contact info
Intervenor Dft
Dignity Health Medical Foundation
Represented By
Ashley Lynn Shively
Holland & Knight LLP
contact info
Movant
JANE DOE
Shea Law Offices 1814 Franklin Street, Ste 800
Oakland, CA 94612
Represented By
Jennie Lee Anderson
Andrus Anderson LLP
contact info
James Matthew Wagstaffe
Wagstaffe, Von Loewenfeldt, Busch & Radwick LLP
contact info
Margaret C. MacLean
Lowey Dannenberg, P.C.
contact info
Amanda Grace Fiorilla
Lowey Dannenberg, P.C.
contact info
Movant
Doe
Represented By
Geoffrey Aaron Graber
Cohen Milstein Sellers & Toll PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
John Doe
Represented By
Jennie Lee Anderson
Andrus Anderson LLP
contact info
Amanda M Steiner
Terrell Marshall Law Group PLLC
contact info
Nicole Ramirez
Kiesel Law LLP
contact info
Paul R. Kiesel
Kiesel Law LLP
contact info
Elizabeth S. Lenivy
The Simon Law Firm, P. C.
contact info
Geoffrey Aaron Graber
Cohen Milstein Sellers & Toll PLLC
contact info
Jeffrey Alan Koncius
Kiesel Law LLP
contact info
Jay Barnes
Simmons Hanly Conroy LLC
contact info
An V. Truong
Simmons Hanly Conroy LLC
contact info
Jennifer M Paulson
Simmons Hanly Conroy
contact info
Beth E. Terrell
Terrell Marshall Law Group PLLC
contact info
Amy Collignon Gunn
The Simon Law Firm, P. C.
contact info
Eric Steven Johnson
Simmons Hanly Conroy LLC
contact info
Stephen M. Gorny
Gorny Dandurand, Lc
contact info
Plaintiff
Doe
Represented By
Andre Michel Mura
Gibbs Law Group LLP
contact info
Hanne Jensen
Gibbs Law Group LLP
contact info
Eric Alfred Kafka
Cohen Milstein Sellers & Toll PLLC
contact info
Ryan McGee
Morgan And Morgan Complex Litigation Group
contact info
John A. Yanchunis
Morgan And Morgan, P.A.
contact info
Geoffrey Aaron Graber
Cohen Milstein Sellers & Toll PLLC
contact info
Rosemary M. Rivas
Gibbs Law Group LLP
contact info
Joseph P. Brent
Brent & Fiol, LLP
contact info
Claire L Torchiana
Cohen Milstein Sellers & Toll PLLC
contact info
Michael Kipp Mueller
Brent & Fiol, LLP
contact info
Michael Francis Ram
Morgan & Morgan
contact info
Plaintiff
John Doe 1
Represented By
Alison D Hawthorne
Beasley Allen Crow Methvin Portis & Miles, P.C.
contact info
Jennie Lee Anderson
Andrus Anderson LLP
contact info
Lori Erin Andrus
Andrus Anderson LLP
contact info
Rachel Nichole Minder
Beasley Allen Crow Methvin Portis & Miles, P.C.
contact info
Rebecca Diane Gilliland
Beasley Allen Crow Methvin Portis & Miles, P.C.
contact info
W. Daniel Miles, III
Beasley, Allen, Crow, Methvin, Portis & Miles, P.C.
contact info
Plaintiff
John Doe 2
Represented By
Alison D Hawthorne
Beasley Allen Crow Methvin Portis & Miles, P.C.
contact info
Jennie Lee Anderson
Andrus Anderson LLP
contact info
Lori Erin Andrus
Andrus Anderson LLP
contact info
Rachel Nichole Minder
Beasley Allen Crow Methvin Portis & Miles, P.C.
contact info
Rebecca Diane Gilliland
Beasley Allen Crow Methvin Portis & Miles, P.C.
contact info
W. Daniel Miles, III
Beasley, Allen, Crow, Methvin, Portis & Miles, P.C.
contact info
Plaintiff
Jane Doe I
Represented By
Nicole Ramirez
Kiesel Law LLP
contact info
Geoffrey Aaron Graber
Cohen Milstein Sellers & Toll PLLC
contact info
Jeffrey Alan Koncius
Kiesel Law LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Jane Doe II
Represented By
Nicole Ramirez
Kiesel Law LLP
contact info
Geoffrey Aaron Graber
Cohen Milstein Sellers & Toll PLLC
contact info
Jeffrey Alan Koncius
Kiesel Law LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
John Doe II
Represented By
Jennie Lee Anderson
Andrus Anderson LLP
contact info
Nicole Ramirez
Kiesel Law LLP
contact info
Geoffrey Aaron Graber
Cohen Milstein Sellers & Toll PLLC
contact info
Jeffrey Alan Koncius
Kiesel Law LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Michael Krackenberger
individually and on behalf of all others similarly situated c/o Nick Wooten DC Law 510 West Anderson Lane
Austin, TX 78757
Represented By
Gayle Meryl Blatt
Casey Gerry Schenk Francavilla Blatt & Penfield LLP
contact info
David S. Casey, Jr.
Casey Gerry Schenk Francavilla Blatt And Penfield LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Malinda Smidga
Represented By
Jae K. Kim
Lynch Carpenter, LLP
contact info
Hannah N Barnett
Lynch Carpenter, LLP
contact info

GPO Dec 21 2022
ORDER APPOINTING INTERIM CLASS COUNSEL - Case Management Conference set for 1/17/2023 02:00 PM via Videoconference. Case Management Statement due by 1/10/2023. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 12/21/2022. (jmd, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/21/2022)
GPO Dec 22 2022
Order by Judge William H. Orrick denying 46 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. (jmd, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/22/2022)
GPO Mar 01 2023
Judicial Referral for Purpose of Determining Relationship of Case C-23-0899 to C-22-3580 JCS. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on March 1, 2023. (jcslc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/1/2023)
GPO Apr 20 2023
ORDER Following April 20, 2023 Discovery Conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Virginia K. DeMarchi on 4/20/2023. (vkdlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/20/2023)
GPO May 02 2023
ORDER re 218 Dispute re Rule 502(d) Clawback Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Virginia K. DeMarchi on 5/2/2023. (vkdlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/2/2023)
GPO May 02 2023
Federal Rule of Evidence 502(d) Clawback Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Virginia K. DeMarchi on 5/2/2023. (vkdlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/2/2023)
GPO May 16 2023
ORDER re 231 Dispute re Protective Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Virginia K. DeMarchi on 5/16/2023. (vkdlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/16/2023)
GPO May 18 2023
ORDER re 235 Dispute re ESI Protocol. Signed by Magistrate Judge Virginia K. DeMarchi on 5/18/2023. (vkdlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/18/2023)
GPO May 24 2023
SECOND ORDER re 235, 253 Dispute re ESI Protocol. Signed by Magistrate Judge Virginia K. DeMarchi on 5/24/2023. (vkdlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/24/2023)
GPO May 24 2023
ORDER re Preservation of Evidence; Requesting Parties' Views. Parties' joint response to order due by 6/1/2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge Virginia K. DeMarchi on 5/24/2023. (vkdlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/24/2023)
GPO May 25 2023
DISCOVERY SCHEDULING ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Virginia K. DeMarchi on 5/25/2023. (vkdlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/25/2023)
GPO Jun 02 2023
THIRD ORDER re Dispute re ESI Protocol. Parties' proposed protocol due by 6/5/2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge Virginia K. DeMarchi on 6/2/2023. (vkdlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/2/2023)
GPO Jun 13 2023
ORDER by Magistrate Judge Virginia K. DeMarchi re 246 May 17, 2023 Discovery Dispute re Organizational Charts. (vkdlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/13/2023)
GPO Jun 16 2023
ORDER by Magistrate Judge Virginia K. DeMarchi re 221 May 1, 2023 Discovery Dispute re Time Period for Discovery. (vkdlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/16/2023)
GPO Jun 16 2023
ORDER by Magistrate Judge Virginia K. DeMarchi re 222 Discovery Dispute re "Web-Property." (vkdlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/16/2023)
GPO Jun 16 2023
ORDER by Magistrate Judge Virginia K. DeMarchi re 223 Discovery Dispute re Plaintiffs' Interrogatories Nos. 1 and 3. (vkdlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/16/2023)
GPO Jul 18 2023
Judicial Referral for Purpose of Determining Relationship of Cases re C-23-3483. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on July 18, 2023. (jcslc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/18/2023)
GPO Aug 22 2023
INTERIM ORDER re 293 August 11, 2023 Discovery Dispute. Meta supplemental statement due by 8/25/2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge Virginia K. DeMarchi on 8/22/2023. (vkdlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/22/2023)
GPO Sep 06 2023
ORDER by Magistrate Judge Virginia K. DeMarchi re 293 August 11, 2023 Discovery Dispute. (vkdlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/6/2023)
GPO Sep 07 2023
ORDER ON 222 MOTION TO DISMISS by Judge William H. Orrick. Plaintiffs shall file their amended complaint within twenty (20) days of the date of this Order. (jmd, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/7/2023)
GPO Oct 12 2023
Judicial Referral for Purpose of Determining Relationship of Cases re 22-cv-3580-WHO. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on October 11, 2023. (mll, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/12/2023)
GPO Oct 12 2023
Judicial Referral for Purpose of Determining Relationship of Cases re 22-cv-3580-WHO. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on October 12, 2023. (mll, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/12/2023)
GPO Oct 26 2023
Referral for Purpose of Determining Relationship of Cases re 22-cv-5500-SI. Signed by Judge Susan Illston on 10/26/2023. (ec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/26/2023)
GPO Nov 13 2023
REDACTED ORDER by Magistrate Judge Virginia K. DeMarchi re 323 Plaintiffs' Rule 37 Motion for Sanctions. (vkdlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/13/2023)
GPO Jan 29 2024
ORDER ON 387 MOTION TO DISMISS AND STRIKE by Judge William H. Orrick and granting 388 Administrative Motion to Consider Whether Another Party's Material Should Be Sealed. (jmd, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/29/2024)
GPO Apr 10 2024
(Filed on 4/10/2024)ORDER by Magistrate Judge Virginia K. DeMarchi re 428 March 15, 2024 Discovery Dispute re Meta's Privilege Log; ORDER granting 429 Plaintiffs' Motion to Seal. Parties' status report due by 4/17/2024. (vkdlc2, COURT STAFF)
GPO Apr 25 2024
REDACTED ORDER re Discovery Disputes re Data Sources and Sampling. Signed by Magistrate Judge Virginia K. DeMarchi on 4/10/2024. (vkdlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/25/2024)
GPO Jun 26 2024
REDACTED Further Order re May 29, 2024 Discovery Dispute. Signed by Magistrate Judge Virginia K. DeMarchi. (vkdlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/26/2024)
GPO Jul 10 2024
REDACTED ORDER by Magistrate Judge Virginia K. DeMarchi re 428, 457, 475, 476 May 8, 2024 Discovery Dispute re Privilege Claims. (vkdlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/10/2024)
GPO Jul 24 2024
REDACTED ORDER re 545 for Further Discovery Status Report re Data Sources. Status Report due by 8/9/2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge Virginia K. DeMarchi on 7/24/2024. (vkdlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/24/2024)
GPO Jul 24 2024
FURTHER ORDER re 475 May 8, 2024 Discovery Dispute re Privilege Claims and Document Submitted for In Camera Review. Signed by Magistrate Judge Virginia K. DeMarchi on 7/24/2024. (vkdlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/24/2024)
GPO Aug 12 2024
ORDER re 575 August 9, 2024 Joint Status Report. Further status report or discovery dispute letter due by 8/29/2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge Virginia K. DeMarchi on 8/12/2024. (vkdlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/12/2024)
GPO Aug 26 2024
STIPULATION AND ORDER TO CONTINUE HEARING RE: DEFENDANT META PLATFORMS, INC.'S MOTION TO CERTIFY ORDER ON MOTION TO DISMISS FOR INTERLOCUTORY APPEALAND SETTING BRIEFING SCHEDULE re 584 MOTION to Certify Order on Motion to Dismiss for Interlocutory Appeal. Response due by 9/18/2024. Reply due by 9/25/2024. Motion Hearing set for 10/9/2024 02:00 PM via Videoconference. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 08/26/2024. (jmd, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/26/2024)
GPO Oct 02 2024
ORDER DENYING 584 MOTION TO CERTIFY ORDER FOR INTERLOCUTORY APPEAL by Judge William H. Orrick. (jmd, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/2/2024)
GPO Dec 20 2024
ORDER by Magistrate Judge Virginia K. DeMarchi re 688 November 12, 2024 Discovery Dispute re Plaintiffs' Communications. (vkdlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/20/2024)
GPO Dec 20 2024
REDACTED ORDER by Magistrate Judge Virginia K. DeMarchi re 694 November 19, 2024 Discovery Dispute; 695 Motion to Seal. (vkdlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/20/2024)
GPO Dec 20 2024
ORDER by Magistrate Judge Virginia K. DeMarchi re 725 December 13, 2024 Discovery Dispute re Plaintiffs' Interrogatories Nos. 1 and 3. (vkdlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/20/2024)
GPO Jan 06 2025
ORDER granting 741 STIPULATION to reset deadlines as to 740 MOTION for Sanctions. Response due by 1/27/2025. Reply due by 2/7/2025. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 01/06/2025. (jmd, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/6/2025)
GPO Jan 06 2025
ORDER granting 742 STIPULATION to Extend Deadline to File Meta's Response to Plaintiffs' 739 Administrative Motion to Consider Whether Another Party's Materials Should Be Filed Under Seal. Response due by 1/13/2025. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 01/06/2025. (jmd, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/6/2025)
GPO Jan 08 2025
STIPULATION AND ORDER re 745 Extending Time to File Joint Discovery Dispute Letter. Deadline extended to 1/10/2025. Signed by Magistrate Judge Virginia K. DeMarchi on 1/8/2025. (vkdlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/8/2025)
GPO Jan 15 2025
ORDER Following Discovery Status Conference; Requesting Status Report. Status report due by 2/14/2025. Signed by Magistrate Judge Virginia K. DeMarchi on 1/15/2025. (vkdlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/15/2025)
GPO Jan 15 2025
ORDER by Magistrate Judge Virginia K. DeMarchi re 708 November 26, 2024 Discovery Dispute re Redactions of Named Plaintiffs' Data. (vkdlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/15/2025)
GPO Jan 16 2025
REDACTED ORDER re 698 November 22, 2024 Discovery Dispute re Certain Named Plaintiffs Data. Signed by Magistrate Judge Virginia K. DeMarchi on 1/16/2025. (vkdlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/16/2025)
GPO Jan 17 2025
REDACTED ORDER by Magistrate Judge Virginia K. DeMarchi re 726 December 13, 2024 Discovery Dispute re Data Lineage Information. (vkdlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/17/2025)
GPO Jan 31 2025
REDACTED ORDER re 751, [784-2] January 10, 2025 Dispute re Discovery from Two Data Sources. Signed by Magistrate Judge Virginia K. DeMarchi on 1/31/2025. (vkdlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/31/2025)
GPO Feb 10 2025
ORDER by Magistrate Judge Virginia K. DeMarchi re 770-3, 771, 789-2 January 14, 2025 Discovery Dispute re Additional Custodians. (vkdlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/10/2025)
GPO Feb 18 2025
ORDER re 845 Fact Depositions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Virginia K. DeMarchi on 2/18/2025. (vkdlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/18/2025)
GPO Feb 18 2025
REDACTED ORDER Following 837 February 12, 2025 Joint Status Report re Named Plaintiffs Data. Signed by Magistrate Judge Virginia K. DeMarchi on 2/18/2025. (vkdlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/18/2025) Modified on 2/18/2025 (vkdlc2, COURT STAFF).
GPO Mar 12 2025
STIPULATION AND ORDER re 897 for Relief from Deadline in Order, Dkt. No. 850. Signed by Magistrate Judge Virginia K. DeMarchi on 3/12/2025. (vkdlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/12/2025)
GPO Mar 12 2025
Order by Judge William H. Orrick denying Defendant's 812 Motion to Compel. (jmd, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/12/2025)
GPO Apr 09 2025
INTERIM ORDER re 909 Discovery Dispute re Mark Zuckerberg Deposition. Meta to file additional materials by noon, 4/10/2025. Signed by Magistrate Judge Virginia K. DeMarchi on 4/9/2025. (vkdlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/9/2025)
GPO Apr 09 2025
REDACTED ORDER by Magistrate Judge Virginia K. DeMarchi re 915 March 19, 2025 Discovery Dispute re Singhal Custodial Files. (vkdlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/9/2025)
GPO Apr 10 2025
REDACTED ORDER by Magistrate Judge Virginia K. DeMarchi re 909 March 14, 2025 Discovery Dispute re Zuckerberg Deposition. (vkdlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/10/2025)
GPO Apr 24 2025
ORDER by Magistrate Judge Virginia K. DeMarchi re 930 March 25, 2025 Discovery Dispute re Meta's RFP 74. (vkdlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/24/2025)
GPO Apr 24 2025
ORDER by Magistrate Judge Virginia K. DeMarchi re 976 April 15, 2025 Discovery Dispute re Payments for Consumer Data. (vkdlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/24/2025)

Docket last updated: 05/07/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Wednesday, May 07, 2025
1020 1020 motion Administrative Motion to Consider Whether Another Partys Material Should Be Sealed Wed 05/07 8:49 PM
Administrative Motion to Consider Whether Another Party's Material Should Be Sealed Response re Meta's Motion for Reconsideration of the Court's April 10, 2025 Discovery Order filed by John Doe II, Jane Doe I, John Doe IV, Jane Doe II, Jane Doe III.(Torchiana, Claire)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration,
Att: 2 Proposed Order,
Att: 3 Response to Meta's Motion for Reconsideration,
Att: 4 Declaration,
Att: 5 Exhibit,
Att: 6 Exhibit,
Att: 7 Exhibit,
Att: 8 Exhibit
1019 1019 respm Opposition/Response to Motion Wed 05/07 8:36 PM
OPPOSITION/RESPONSE Related [+] filed byJohn Doe II, Jane Doe I, John Doe IV, Jane Doe II, Jane Doe III.(Torchiana, Claire)
Related: [-] 1005 MOTION for Reconsideration of the Court's April 10, 2025 Discovery Order 967
Att: 1 Declaration,
Att: 2 Exhibit,
Att: 3 Exhibit,
Att: 4 Exhibit,
Att: 5 Exhibit
1018 1018 motion Ex Parte Application Discovery Wed 05/07 4:49 PM
Ex Parte Application , MOTION for Discovery FOR AN ORDER MODIFYING THIRD-PARTY SUBPOENA filed by Southern Illinois Healthcare Enterprises, Inc. d/b/a Southern Illinois Healthcare. Motion Hearing set for 5/13/2025 10:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 2, 5th Floor before Magistrate Judge Virginia K. DeMarchi. Responses due by 5/21/2025. Replies due by 5/28/2025.(Robinson, Alexander)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration of John K. Daly,
Att: 2 Declaration of Alexander E. Robinson,
Att: 3 Proposed Order,
Att: 4 Certificate/Proof of Service
1017 1017 order Order on Discovery Letter Brief Wed 05/07 11:38 AM
ORDER by Magistrate Judge Virginia K. DeMarchi re 1016 Deposition of Jane Doe VI. (vkdlc2, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 06, 2025
1016 1016 motion Discovery Letter Brief Tue 05/06 8:37 PM
Joint Discovery Letter Brief Regarding Jane Doe VI's Deposition filed by Meta Platforms, Inc.. (Goldman, Lauren)
Related: [-]
1015 1015 misc Document E-Filed Under Seal (Internal Use Only) Tue 05/06 12:31 PM
DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL by Court Staff: Amended Sealed Order re 991 April 25, 2025 Discovery Dispute re Revenue from Non-Healthcare Providers. Signed by Magistrate Judge Virginia K. DeMarchi on 5/6/2025. (vkdlc2, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
1014 1014 order Discovery Order Tue 05/06 12:28 PM
Amended Redacted Order re 991 April 25, 2025 Discovery Dispute re Revenue from Non-Healthcare Providers. Signed by Magistrate Judge Virginia K. DeMarchi on 5/6/2025. (vkdlc2, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 05, 2025
1013 1013 misc Document E-Filed Under Seal (Internal Use Only) Mon 05/05 8:06 PM
DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL by Court Staff: ORDER re 991 April 25, 2025 Discovery Dispute re Revenue from Non-Healthcare Providers. Signed by Magistrate Judge Virginia K. DeMarchi. (vkdlc2, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
1012 1012 6 pgs order Order on Discovery Letter Brief Mon 05/05 8:00 PM
REDACTED ORDER re 991 April 25, 2025 Discovery Dispute re Revenue from Non-Healthcare Providers. Signed by Magistrate Judge Virginia K. DeMarchi. (vkdlc2, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 02, 2025
1011 1011 misc Transcript Order Fri 05/02 1:21 PM
TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 04/29/2025 before Judge William H. Orrick by John Doe II, Jane Doe I, John Doe IV, Jane Doe II, Jane Doe III, for Court Reporter Cathy Jill Taylor. (Graber, Geoffrey)
Related: [-]
1010 1010 oth_sup Declaration in Support Fri 05/02 12:34 PM
Declaration of Lauren R. Goldman in Support of992 Administrative Motion to Consider Whether Another Party's Material Should Be Sealed filed byMeta Platforms, Inc.. Related [+] (Goldman, Lauren)
Related: [-] 992
Att: 1 Proposed Order,
Att: 2 Proposed Redactions of Dkt. 992-3
1009 1009 oth_sup Attachments to an Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Fri 05/02 12:18 PM
EXHIBITS re992 Administrative Motion to Consider Whether Another Party's Material Should Be Sealed Proposed Revised Sealed Version of Dkt. 992-3 filed byMeta Platforms, Inc.. Related [+] (Goldman, Lauren)
Related: [-] 992
1008 1008 misc Transcript Fri 05/02 10:43 AM
Transcript of Proceedings held on 04/29/2025, before Judge William H. Orrick. Court Reporter Cathy J. Taylor, RMR, CRR, CRC, telephone number 602-322-7249. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Related [+] Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/31/2025. (Taylor, Catherine)
Related: [-] 1007 Transcript Order (s)1007
Thursday, May 01, 2025
1007 1007 misc Transcript Order Thu 05/01 9:07 AM
TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 04/29/25 before Judge William H. Orrick by Meta Platforms, Inc., for Court Reporter Cathy Jill Taylor. (McCloskey, Elizabeth)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 30, 2025
1006 1006 motion Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Wed 04/30 11:08 PM
Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Parts of the Motion for Reconsideration of the Court's April 10, 2025 Discovery Order filed by Meta Platforms, Inc..(Goldman, Lauren)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration of Lauren R. Goldman in Support,
Att: 2 Proposed Order,
Att: 3 Unredacted Version of Motion for Reconsideration,
Att: 4 Unredacted Version of Declaration of Kory Hines,
Att: 5 Unredacted Version of Declaration of Robert Sherman,
Att: 6 Unredacted Version of Declaration of Michel Protti
1005 1005 motion Reconsideration Wed 04/30 11:03 PM
MOTION for Reconsideration of the Court's April 10, 2025 Discovery Order 967 filed by Meta Platforms, Inc..(Goldman, Lauren)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration of Kory Hines,
Att: 2 Declaration of Robert Sherman,
Att: 3 Declaration of Michel Protti,
Att: 4 Declaration of Nathan Davis,
Att: 5 Proposed Order
1004 1004 minutes Case Management Conference - Further Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief Order on Administrative Motion to Consider Whether Another Partys Material Should Be Sealed Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Wed 04/30 3:43 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge William H. Orrick: Case Management Conference held on 4/29/2025 and motions considered. 979 Motion is granted; 980 Administrative Motion to Consider Whether Another Party's Material Should Be Sealed is denied; 985 Administrative Motion to Consider Whether Another Party's Material Should Be Sealed is granted in part and denied in part; 994 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal is denied. Total Time in Court: 20 minutes. Court Reporter: Cathy Taylor. (jmd, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 4/30/2025)
Related: [-]