Kansas District Court
Judge:John W Broomes
Referred: Rachel E Schwartz
Case #: 2:22-cv-02236
Nature of Suit445 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities-Employment
Cause42:2000e Job Discrimination (Employment)
Case Filed:Jun 17, 2022
Terminated:Jan 30, 2023
Last checked: Wednesday Dec 14, 2022 2:36 AM CST
Defendant
USD 250 Pittsburg Community Schools
Represented By
Terelle A. Mock
Fisher, Patterson, Sayler & Smith, Llp - Topeka
contact info
Crystal B. Moe
Fisher, Patterson, Sayler & Smith, Llp - Topeka
contact info
Plaintiff
Jessica Lake
109 S. Jefferson St.
Frontenac, KS 66763
Represented By
Martin M. Meyers
The Meyers Law Firm, Lc
contact info
EmmaLee Wilson
The Meyers Law Firm, Lc
contact info


Docket last updated: 4 hours ago
Monday, January 30, 2023
29 29 2 pgs misc Stipulation of Dismissal Mon 01/30 3:16 PM
STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL by USD 250 Pittsburg Community Schools. (Moe, Crystal)
Related: [-]
utility Terminate Civil Case Tue 01/31 12:58 PM
***Civil Case Terminated per 29 Stipulation of Dismissal.(heo)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 03, 2023
28 28 2 pgs discov Notice to Take Deposition Tue 01/03 5:54 PM
NOTICE by Plaintiff Jessica Lake of taking deposition of Kelsey Boulware, Kelly Staley on 01/11/2023 (Wilson, EmmaLee)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 15, 2022
27 27 2 pgs discov Notice to Take Deposition Thu 12/15 12:09 PM
NOTICE by Plaintiff Jessica Lake of taking deposition of Kelsey Boulware and Kelly Staley on January 11, 2023 (Meyers, Martin)
Related: [-]
order Order on Motion to Modify Thu 12/15 11:30 AM
ORDER granting25 Joint Motion to Modify Scheduling Order. For good cause shown, the Court extends the deadline for the parties to mediate up to and including February 28, 2023. To ensure that mediation is completed before the pretrial conference, which is currently scheduled for February 22, 2023, the Court also modifies the Scheduling Order15 as follows: Proposed Pretrial Order due by March 14, 2023; Final Pretrial Conference set for March 28, 2023, at 10:00 AM by telephone (CONFERENCE LINE 1-888-363-4749; ACCESS CODE 5705809); and Dispositive motion deadline is moved to April 21, 2023. All other provisions of the Scheduling Order remain unchanged. Signed by Magistrate Judge Rachel E. Schwartz on 12/15/2022. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (jrh)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 14, 2022
25 25 2 pgs motion Modify Wed 12/14 11:52 AM
Joint MOTION to Modify Scheduling Order by Defendant USD 250 Pittsburg Community Schools Related [+] (Moe, Crystal)
Related: [-] ferred to Magistrate Judge Rachel E. Schwartz
Monday, December 12, 2022
24 24 2 pgs discov Notice to Take Deposition Mon 12/12 11:42 AM
NOTICE by Defendant USD 250 Pittsburg Community Schools of taking deposition of Jessica Lake on January 9, 2023 (Mock, Terelle)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 08, 2022
23 23 notice Notice of Service Tue 11/08 3:42 PM
NOTICE OF SERVICE by USD 250 Pittsburg Community Schools of Discovery Responses (Moe, Crystal)
Related: [-]
22 22 service Certificate of Service Tue 11/08 2:12 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Plaintiff's First Supplemental Responses to Defendant's Requests for Production of Documents by Jessica Lake (Wilson, EmmaLee)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 04, 2022
21 21 service Certificate of Service Fri 11/04 7:22 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Interrogatory Answers and Requests for Production of Documents Responses by Jessica Lake (Wilson, EmmaLee)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 25, 2022
20 20 notice Joint Mediation Notice Tue 10/25 1:54 PM
JOINT MEDIATION NOTICE - Mediation to be held December 14, 2022 by USD 250 Pittsburg Community Schools (Moe, Crystal)
Related: [-]
19 19 misc Entry of Appearance Tue 10/25 1:53 PM
ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by Crystal B. Moe on behalf of USD 250 Pittsburg Community Schools. (Moe, Crystal)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 11, 2022
18 18 misc Certificate of Service Tue 10/11 4:12 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Plaintiff's First Discovery Requests to Defendant by Jessica Lake. (Wilson, EmmaLee)
Related: [-]
17 17 misc Entry of Appearance Tue 10/11 4:09 PM
ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by EmmaLee Wilson on behalf of Jessica Lake. (Wilson, EmmaLee)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 27, 2022
16 16 notice Notice of Service Tue 09/27 3:17 PM
NOTICE OF SERVICE by USD 250 Pittsburg Community Schools of Discovery Requests to Plaintiff (Mock, Terelle)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 22, 2022
15 15 order Scheduling Order Thu 09/22 9:31 AM
SCHEDULING ORDER: Mediation Notice or Confidential Settlement Report Due to Magistrate Judge on 10/28/2022. Mediation deadline 12/16/2022. Discovery deadline 1/31/2023. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 2/7/2023. Final Pretrial Conference set for 2/22/2023 at 10:00 AM by telephone (CONFERENCE LINE 1-888-363-4749; ACCESS CODE 5705809) before Magistrate Judge Rachel E. Schwartz. Dispositive motion deadline 3/24/2023.The Court will subsequently set this case for trial. Estimated trial time 4-5 days. Signed by Magistrate Judge Rachel E. Schwartz on 09/22/2022. (drk)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 21, 2022
14 14 notice Notice of Service Wed 09/21 11:15 AM
NOTICE OF SERVICE by USD 250 Pittsburg Community Schools of Defendant's Rule 26 Documents (Mock, Terelle)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 20, 2022
13 13 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Order Tue 09/20 3:55 PM
ORDER granting 12 Motion Requesting Entry of an Order Directing Release of KHRC Records. The parties shall serve a copy of this order on the KHRC within seven (7) days of the date of this order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Rachel E. Schwartz on 9/20/2022. (kas)
Related: [-]
10 10 12 pgs order Order on Motion for Protective Order Tue 09/20 2:11 PM
ORDER granting Parties' Joint Motion for a Protective Order (ECF No. 9). The Court grants the motion and enters the parties' proposed protective order with minor modifications, which the Court communicated to the parties at the September 20, 2022 Scheduling Conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Rachel E. Schwartz on 9/20/2022. (jrh)
Related: [-]
motion Protective Order Tue 09/20 2:05 PM
Joint Motion Requesting Entry of a Protective Order. In accordance with the Guidelines for Agreed Protective Orders, the parties jointly moved for the entry of a protective order by emailing a copy of their proposed order to the Magistrate Judge's chambers on September 9, 2022. Related [+] (jrh)
Related: [-] ferred to Magistrate Judge Rachel E. Schwartz
minutes Scheduling Conference Tue 09/20 2:12 PM
MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Rachel E. Schwartz: SCHEDULING CONFERENCE held on 9/20/2022. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (drk)
Related: [-]
motion Order Tue 09/20 2:28 PM
Motion Requesting Entry of an Order Directing Release of KHRC Records. By way of email dated September 9, 2022, the parties have jointly moved for the entry of an order directing the release of KHRC records. Related [+] (jrh)
Related: [-] ferred to Magistrate Judge Rachel E. Schwartz
Monday, September 19, 2022
8 8 notice Notice of Service Mon 09/19 12:35 PM
NOTICE OF SERVICE by USD 250 Pittsburg Community Schools of Defendant's Initial Rule 26 Disclosures (Mock, Terelle)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 16, 2022
7 7 misc Certificate of Service Fri 09/16 4:56 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Documents to Defendant by Jessica Lake. (Meyers, Martin)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 25, 2022
6 6 5 pgs answer Answer to Complaint Thu 08/25 4:53 PM
ANSWER to Complaint by USD 250 Pittsburg Community Schools.(Mock, Terelle)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 10, 2022
5 5 order Initial Order Regarding Planning and Scheduling Wed 08/10 9:23 AM
INITIAL ORDER REGARDING PLANNING AND SCHEDULING: Scheduling Conference set for September 20, 2022, at 1:30 p.m. by telephone (CONFERENCE LINE 1-888-363-4749; ACCESS CODE 5705809) before Magistrate Judge Rachel E. Schwartz. Rule 26 Planning Conference Deadline: 8/26/2022. Rule 26 Initial Disclosures Deadline: 9/9/2022. Proposed Scheduling Order Deadline: 9/9/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Rachel E. Schwartz on 08/10/2022. (drk)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 09, 2022
4 4 order Clerks Order Extending Time to Answer Tue 08/09 1:54 PM
CLERKS ORDER EXTENDING TIME until 8/25/2022 for Defendant USD 250 Pittsburg Community Schools to answer or otherwise plead. Signed by deputy clerk on 8/09/2022. (jk)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 21, 2022
3 3 service Return of Service of Summons EXECUTED Thu 07/21 3:11 PM
SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- Personal by Jessica Lake upon USD 250 Pittsburg Community Schools served on 7/21/2022, answer due 8/11/2022 (Meyers, Martin)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 21, 2022
notice Notice of Judge Assignment Tue 06/21 9:29 AM
NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Case assigned to District Judge John W. Broomes and Magistrate Judge Rachel E. Schwartz for all proceedings. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (lb)
Related: [-]
notice Notice of Deficiency Tue 06/21 9:30 AM
NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY - Designation of place of trial is missing. The filing party/attorney is directed to correct the deficiency immediately.(This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (lb)
Related: [-]
service Summons Issued Tue 06/21 9:31 AM
SUMMONS ISSUED as to USD 250 Pittsburg Community Schools. (issued to Attorney for service) (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry) (lb)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 17, 2022
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet Fri 06/17 4:16 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET by Plaintiff Jessica Lake. (Meyers, Martin)
Related: [-]
1 1 9 pgs cmp Complaint (attorney) Fri 06/17 4:14 PM
COMPLAINT with trial location of Kansas City ( Filing fee $402, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-5804582.), filed by Jessica Lake.(Meyers, Martin)
Related: [-]