Pennsylvania Eastern District Court
Judge:Pamela A Carlos
Case #: 2:22-cv-02404
Nature of Suit445 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities-Employment
Cause42:12101 The Americans with Disabilities Act of 1990
Case Filed:Jun 17, 2022
Terminated:May 03, 2023
Last checked: Wednesday Dec 14, 2022 3:35 AM EST
Defendant
SCHMIDT BAKING COMPANY, INC
Represented By
TAMARA S. GRIMM
O'Hagan Meyer
contact info
Plaintiff
SOTIRAQ SEMA
Represented By
DAVID M. KOLLER
Koller Law PC
contact info


Docket last updated: 86 minutes ago
Wednesday, May 03, 2023
24 24 1 pgs order Order Dismissing Case - 41(b) Wed 05/03 11:08 AM
ORDER DISMISSING ACTION WITH PREJUDICE PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 41.1(b), ETC. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE PAMELA A. CARLOS ON 5/3/23. 5/3/23 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(er)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 24, 2023
23 23 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery Mon 04/24 9:22 AM
ORDER THAT ALL DISCOVERY IN THIS CASE, INCLUDING THE COMPLETION OF INDEPENDENT MEDICAL EXAMINATIONS, IS TO BE COMPLETED BY JUNE 5, 2023, ETC. MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND/OR DAUBERT MOTIONS, IF ANY, SHALL BE FILED BY JULY 24, 2023. RESPONSES SHALL BE FILED NO LATER THAN AUGUST 21, 2023, ETC. ALL FURTHER DEADLINES SET FORTH IN THE JANUARY 25, 2023 SCHEDULING ORDER (ECF DOC. NO. 17), BEGINNING IN PARAGRAPH 7 ONWARD, WILL REMAIN IN FULL EFFECT, ETC. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE PAMELA A. CARLOS ON 4/24/23.4/24/23 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(er)
Related: [-]
utility Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings Mon 04/24 9:24 AM
Set/Reset Deadlines as to RESPONSES DUE BY 8/21/2023. (er)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 17, 2023
22 22 motion Extension of Time to Complete Discovery Mon 04/17 2:25 PM
Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery filed by SCHMIDT BAKING COMPANY, INC.Memorandum, Certificate of Service, Proposed Order.(GRIMM, TAMARA)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memorandum Memorandum of Law in Support of the Parties' Joint Motion to Extend Discovery Deadlines in Scheduling Order
Monday, February 27, 2023
21 21 discov Disclosure Statement Form 7.1 Mon 02/27 6:33 PM
Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 by SCHMIDT BAKING COMPANY, INC.(GRIMM, TAMARA)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 17, 2023
20 20 2 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Hearings Fri 02/17 10:32 AM
ORDER THAT A SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE HAS BEEN SET FOR 5/3/2023 09:30 AM IN Judge's Chambers, ROOM 3030, BEFORE MAGISTRATE JUDGE DAVID R. STRAWBRIDGE; AS IT IS OUTLINED HEREIN.. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE DAVID R. STRAWBRIDGE ON 2/17/23. 2/17/23 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(bw) Modified on 2/17/2023 (bw)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 26, 2023
19 19 1 pgs order Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge-Settlement Thu 01/26 11:20 AM
AMENDED ORDER THAT THIS CASE IS REFERRED TO UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE DAVID R. STRAWBRIDGE FOR PURPOSES OF CONDUCTING A SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE. THE PARTIES SHALL JOINTLY CONTACT JUDGE STRAWBRIDGE'S CHAMBERS NO LATER THAN FRIDAY, FEBRUARY 17, 2023, TO SCHEDULE THE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE FOR A DATE THAT IS CONVENIENT FOR JUDGE STRAWBRIDGE. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE PAMELA A. CARLOS ON 1/26/23. 1/26/23 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(er)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 25, 2023
18 18 1 pgs order Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge-Settlement Wed 01/25 4:39 PM
ORDER THAT THIS CASE IS REFERRED TO UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE DAVID R. STRAWBRIDGE FOR PURPOSES OF CONDUCTING A SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE. THE PARTIES SHALL JOINTLY CONTACT JUDGE STRAWBRIDGE'S CHAMBERS NO LATER THAN WEDNESDAY, FEBRUARY 8, 2023, TO SCHEDULE THE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE FOR A DATE THAT IS CONVENIENT FOR JUDGE STRAWBRIDGE. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE PAMELA A. CARLOS ON 1/25/23. 1/25/23 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED. (er)
Related: [-]
17 17 order Scheduling Order Wed 01/25 4:35 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER: FINAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE SET FOR 1/3/2024 09:30 AM IN Cahn 4A BEFORE MAGISTRATE JUDGE PAMELA A. CARLOS. DISCOVERY DUE BY 4/17/2023. JURY SELECTION SET FOR 1/5/2024 09:00 AM IN Courtroom TBD BEFORE MAGISTRATE JUDGE PAMELA A. CARLOS. MOTIONS DUE BY 10/25/2023. MOTION IN LIMINE DUE BY 12/4/2023. MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT DUE BY 5/19/2023. PLAINTIFF PRETRIAL MEMO DUE BY 11/20/2023. DEFENDANT PRETRIAL MEMO DUE BY 11/20/2023. TRIAL DATE SET FOR 1/8/2024 09:00 AM IN Cahn 4A BEFORE MAGISTRATE JUDGE PAMELA A. CARLOS. TRIAL DATE SET FOR 1/9/2024 09:00 AM IN Cahn 4A BEFORE MAGISTRATE JUDGE PAMELA A. CARLOS. TRIAL DATE SET FOR 1/10/2024 09:00 AM IN Cahn 4A BEFORE MAGISTRATE JUDGE PAMELA A. CARLOS. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE PAMELA A. CARLOS ON 1/25/23. 1/25/23 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(er)
Related: [-]
16 16 minutes Pretrial Conference - Initial Wed 01/25 2:19 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before MAGISTRATE JUDGE PAMELA A. CARLOS: Rule 16 Conference held on 1/25/23. Court Reporter: None. (er)
Related: [-]
15 15 1 pgs order Order Wed 01/25 2:06 PM
ORDER THAT AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES 1-8 RAISED BY DEFENDANT SCHMIDT BAKING COMPANY, INC. IN ITS ANSWER TO THE COMPLAINT (ECF DOC. NO. 8) ARE HEREBY STRICKEN WITHOUT PREJUDICE. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE PAMELA A. CARLOS ON 1/25/23. 1/25/23 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(er)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 22, 2022
14 14 2 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Hearings Thu 12/22 1:55 PM
ORDER THAT A PRETRIAL CONFERENCE SET FOR 1/25/2023 03:30 PM IN Video Conference BEFORE MAGISTRATE JUDGE PAMELA A. CARLOS; ETC. AS HEREIN. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE PAMELA A. CARLOS ON 12/22/22. 12/22/22 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(mas)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 20, 2022
13 13 order Consent and Order to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge Wed 12/21 4:21 PM
CONSENT AND ORDER TO JURISDICTION BY US MAGISTRATE JUDGE PAMELA A. CARLOS SIGNED BY GEORGE V WYLESOL, CLERK OF COURT ON 12/20/22. 12/21/22 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(bw)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 CLERKS MAGISTRATE ASSIGNMENT SHEET
12 12 1 pgs order Order Wed 12/21 9:04 AM
ORDER THAT THE INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE IN THE ABOVE-CAPTIONED MATTER, SCHEDULED FOR DECEMBER 21, 2022 AT 10:00 A.M. IS CANCELED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOHN M. YOUNGE ON 12/20/22. 12/20/22 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(bw)
Related: [-]
11 11 misc Consent to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge (Not Social Security) Tue 12/20 10:28 AM
CONSENT to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge by SCHMIDT BAKING COMPANY, INC.. (GRIMM, TAMARA)
Related: [-]
10 10 misc Consent to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge (Not Social Security) Tue 12/20 10:11 AM
CONSENT to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge by SOTIRAQ SEMA.. (KOLLER, DAVID)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 14, 2022
9 9 discov Discovery Plan Wed 12/14 4:36 PM
Discovery Plan by SCHMIDT BAKING COMPANY, INC.(GRIMM, TAMARA)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 18, 2022
8 8 answer Answer to Complaint Fri 11/18 7:56 PM
ANSWER to Complaint by SCHMIDT BAKING COMPANY, INC.(GRIMM, TAMARA)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 07, 2022
7 7 1 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Hearings Mon 11/07 10:46 AM
ORDER THAT A RULE 16 CONFERENCE WILL BE HELD ON 12/21/2022 10:00 AM via Video Conference BEFORE HONORABLE JOHN M. YOUNGE; AS OUTLINED HEREIN.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOHN M. YOUNGE ON 11/7/22. 11/7/22 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(bw)
Related: [-]
6 6 1 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Deadlines Mon 11/07 10:44 AM
ORDER THAT THE NOVEMBER 4, 2022 LETTER FORWARDED TO THE COURT IN WHICH COUNSEL REQUESTED AN EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO THE COMPLAINT, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT SAID REQUEST FOR AN EXTENSION OF DEADLINES WILL BE GRANTED AND DEFENDANT MAY FILE ITS ANSWER OR OTHERWISE RESPOND TO THE COMPLAINT ON OR BEFORE FRIDAY, NOVEMBER 18, 2022. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOHN M. YOUNGE ON 11/7/22. 11/7/22 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(bw)
Related: [-]
5 5 misc Letter Mon 11/07 10:42 AM
Letter to Chambers Requesting Extension of Time dated 11/4/22 by SCHMIDT BAKING COMPANY, INC (bw)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 07, 2022
misc Remark Fri 10/07 2:14 PM
PAPER #4 MAILED TO UNREP (JL)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 06, 2022
4 4 1 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Deadlines Thu 10/06 10:35 AM
ORDER THAT THE OCTOBER 3, 2022 LETTER FORWARDED TO THE COURT (AND ATTACHED HERETO) IN WHICH COUNSEL REQUESTED AN EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO THE COMPLAINT, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT SAID REQUEST FOR AN EXTENSION OF DEADLINES WILL BE GRANTED AND DEFENDANT MAY FILE ITS RESPONSIVE PLEADING TO THE COMPLAINT ON OR BEFORE NOVEMBER 4, 2022 SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOHN M. YOUNGE ON 10/6/22. 10/6/22 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED, NOT MAILED TO UNREP.(bw)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 LETTER REQUESTING EXTENSION
Friday, September 23, 2022
3 3 service Summons Returned Executed Fri 09/23 3:59 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by SOTIRAQ SEMA re: B&R Services for Professionals served Summons and Complaint upon SCHMIDT BAKING COMPANY, INC by hand delivery. SCHMIDT BAKING COMPANY, INC served on 9/9/2022, answer due 9/30/2022. (KOLLER, DAVID)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 21, 2022
2 2 service Summons Issued Tue 06/21 11:15 AM
Summons Issued as to SCHMIDT BAKING COMPANY, INC. Forwarded To: COUNSEL on 6/21/22 (bw)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 17, 2022
1 1 cmp Complaint (Attorney) Fri 06/17 5:23 PM
COMPLAINT against SCHMIDT BAKING COMPANY, INC ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number APAEDC-15991588.), filed by SOTIRAQ SEMA.(KOLLER, DAVID)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet