Pennsylvania Eastern District Court
Judge:Juan R Sanchez
Referred: Jose R Arteaga
Case #: 2:22-cv-02362
Nature of Suit530 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - General
Cause28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Case Filed:Jun 13, 2022
Re-opened:Jan 13, 2023
Terminated:Jun 25, 2024

Create an account to get the full party report for this case.



Docket last updated: 3 hours ago
Monday, April 14, 2025
29 29 misc Letter Tue 04/15 11:09 AM
Letter dated 4/14/25 from Chambers of Judge Sanchez to First Judicial District of PA Office of Judicial Records, re: Return of State Court Record. (va) Modified on 4/15/2025 (va)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 24, 2025
28 28 appeal USCA Order Fri 01/24 2:44 PM
ORDER of USCA as to24 Notice of Appeal filed by JAMES BROWN that the appeal is dismissed for lack of jurisdiction because it is untimely filed. (er)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 16, 2024
27 27 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 12/16 11:22 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by DAVID NAPIORSKI on behalf of KEVIN RANSOM, THE DISTRICT ATTORNEY OF THE COUNTY OF PHILADELPHIA, THE ATTORNEY GENERAL OF THE STATE OF PENNSYLVANIA with WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE OF KATHERINE ERNST; Certificate of Service(NAPIORSKI, DAVID)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 02, 2024
26 26 notice Notice of Withdrawal of Motion Thu 10/03 11:30 AM
NOTICE of Withdrawal re24 Notice of Appeal (va)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 07, 2024
25 25 appeal USCA Notice of Docketing ROA Wed 08/07 8:42 AM
NOTICE of Docketing Record on Appeal from USCA re24 Notice of Appeal filed by JAMES BROWN. USCA Case Number 24-2445 (DT)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 26, 2024
24 24 appeal Notice of Appeal Mon 08/05 12:44 PM
NOTICE OF APPEAL as to23 Order on Motion for Summary Judgment,,, Order on Motion for Order,,, Order on Report and Recommendations,, by JAMES BROWN.(mas)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 LETTER
Wednesday, June 26, 2024
misc Remark Wed 06/26 12:11 PM
DOC. NO.23 MAILED TO PRO SE ON 6/26/24. (amas)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 25, 2024
23 23 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Summary Judgment Order on Motion for Order Order on Report and Recommendations Tue 06/25 5:08 PM
ORDER THAT THE REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION (ECF NO. 22) IS APPROVED AND ADOPTED; THE PETITION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS IS DENIED WITH PREJUDICE AND WITHOUT AN EVIDENTIARY HEARING; AND NO CERTIFICATE OF APPEALABILITY SHALL ISSUE, AS PETITIONER HAS NOT SHOWN DENIAL OF A FEDERAL CONSTITUTIONAL RIGHT, NOR ESTABLISHED THAT REASONABLE JURISTS WOULD DISAGREE WITH THIS COURTS PROCEDURAL DISPOSITION OF HIS CLAIMS. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED BROWNS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT (ECF NO.21 ), SEEKING RESOLUTION OF HIS HABEAS PETITION, IS DISMISSED AS MOOT. THE CLERK OF COURT IS DIRECTED TO MARK THIS MATTER AS CLOSED. SIGNED BY DISTRICT JUDGE JUAN R. SANCHEZ ON 6/25/24. 6/25/24 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED. PRO SE PETITIONER NOT MAILED. (va)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 28, 2024
notice Receipt of / Transfer of State Court Record (Internal) Tue 05/28 3:44 PM
State Court Record on 5/28/24, Sent to Judge Sanchez chambers.(dp)
Related: [-]
notice Receipt of / Transfer of State Court Record (Internal) Tue 05/28 3:48 PM
State Court Record on 5/28/2024, RECEIVED FROM Judge Arteaga's Chambers.(stwe)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 24, 2024
22 22 motion Report and Recommendations Fri 05/24 11:15 AM
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION. RE: IT IS RESPECTFULLY RECOMMENDED THAT1 PETITION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS FILED BY JAMES BROWN BE DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOSE R. ARTEAGA ON 5/24/24. 5/24/24 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED.(fdc)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order,
Att: 2 r&r notice
Tuesday, May 14, 2024
21 21 motion Summary Judgment Order Wed 05/15 1:13 PM
MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT RELIEF OR ANY OTHER JUST ORDER UNDER FRCP 56(F), filed by JAMES BROWN..Motions referred to JOSE R. ARTEAGA.(va)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 22, 2023
20 20 misc State Court Record - Attachment Fri 12/22 10:30 AM
State Court record received from Court of Common Pleas of Philadelphia County.(CCP - Philadelphia County cr, )
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Notes of Testimony,
Att: 2 Notes of Testimony,
Att: 3 Notes of Testimony,
Att: 4 Notes of Testimony,
Att: 5 Notes of Testimony,
Att: 6 Notes of Testimony
Thursday, November 30, 2023
misc Remark Thu 11/30 10:45 AM
Order #19 mailed to Brown. (fdc)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 29, 2023
19 19 1 pgs order Order Reassigning Case Thu 11/30 9:06 AM
ORDER THAT THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED FROM HONORABLE EDWARD G. SMITH TO CHIEF JUDGE JUAN R. SANCHEZ FOR ALL FURTHER PROCEEDINGS. SIGNED BY GEORGE V WYLESOL, CLERK OF COURT ON 11/29/23. 11/30/23 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED. PRO SE PETITIONER NOT MAILED. (va)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 26, 2023
notice Receipt of / Transfer of State Court Record (Internal) Tue 09/26 12:22 PM
State Court Record on 9/26/23, Sent to Judge Arteaga's Chambers and received from Judge Strawbridge's Chambers.(dp)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 20, 2023
misc Remark Wed 09/20 8:44 AM
MAILED OUT ORDER ENTRY18 TO PETITIONER ON 9/20/23. (jaa, )
Related: [-]
Monday, September 18, 2023
18 18 1 pgs order Order Reassigning Case Tue 09/19 10:58 AM
ORDER THAT THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED FROM MAGISTRATE JUDGE DAVID R. STRAWBRIDGE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOSE R. ARTEAGA FOR REPORT & RECOMMENDATION.. SIGNED BY GEORGE V WYLESOL, CLERK OF COURT ON 9/18/23. 9/19/23 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED. PRO SE PETITIONER NOT MAILED. (va)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 27, 2023
17 17 misc Letter Tue 06/27 12:41 PM
Letter dated 6/27/23 Re: Status Update(sbt)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Docket Sheet
Wednesday, June 14, 2023
16 16 misc Letter Tue 06/27 12:40 PM
Letter dated 5/25/23 by JAMES BROWN (sbt)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 07, 2023
15 15 respoth Response Fri 04/07 3:47 PM
Reply in Opposition to Respondents Response Seeking Dismissal of Habeas Corpus Petition, by JAMES BROWN. (va)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Envelope
Tuesday, March 14, 2023
misc Remark Tue 03/14 7:56 AM
MAILED OUT ORDER ENTRY14 TO PETITIONER ON 3/14/23. (jaa, )
Related: [-]
misc Remark Tue 03/14 12:30 PM
DOC. NOS. 10 AND 14 MAILED TO PRO SE ON 3/14/2023. (md)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 13, 2023
14 14 1 pgs order Order Mon 03/13 2:53 PM
ORDER THAT THE CLERK OF THIS COURT TO PROVIDE PETITIONER WITH A COPY OF THE 10-PAGE10 RESPONSE FILED ON NOVEMBER 3, 2022. SHOULD PETITIONER WISH TO FILE A REPLY TO THE RESPONDENTS RESPONSE, HE SHALL FILE ANY SUCH REPLY WITHIN THIRTY (30) DAYS AFTER RECEIPT OF THIS ORDER AND THE RESPONSE. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE DAVID R. STRAWBRIDGE ON 3/13/23. 3/13/23 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED. PRO SE PETITIONER NOT MAILED. (va)
Related: [-]
13 13 misc Letter Mon 03/13 11:21 AM
Letter dated 3/13/23 Re: Status Update(sbt)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Docket Sheet
Wednesday, March 08, 2023
12 12 misc Letter Mon 03/13 11:20 AM
Letter dated 3/6/23 by JAMES BROWN (sbt)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 13, 2023
11 11 1 pgs order Order to Remove from Suspense ~Util - Case Reopened ~Util - Set/Clear Flags Fri 01/13 2:28 PM
ORDER THAT THE CLERK OF COURT SHALL REMOVE THIS CASE FROM CIVIL SUSPENSE AND RETURN IT TO THE UNDERSIGNEDS ACTIVE DOCKET. SIGNED BY HONORABLE EDWARD G. SMITH ON 1/13/23. 1/13/23 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO PRO SE AND E-MAILED.(mas)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 03, 2022
10 10 respoth Response Thu 11/03 2:51 PM
Response by KEVIN RANSOM, THE ATTORNEY GENERAL OF THE STATE OF PENNSYLVANIA, THE DISTRICT ATTORNEY OF THE COUNTY OF PHILADELPHIA. (ERNST, KATHERINE)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 09, 2022
misc Remark Tue 08/09 8:10 AM
MAILED OUT ORDER ENTRY9 TO PETITIONER ON 8/9/22. (jaa, )
Related: [-]
Monday, August 08, 2022
9 9 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Mon 08/08 2:26 PM
ORDER GRANTING8 MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE RESPONSD TO PETITION BY 11/3/2022. ANY REPLY PETITIONER WISHES TO FILE TO THE RESPONSE SHALL BE FILED WITHIN THIRTY (30) DAYS AFTER SERVICE OF THE RESPONSE. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE DAVID R. STRAWBRIDGE ON 8/8/22. 8/8/22 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED. ID R. STRAWBRIDGE ON 6/21/22. 6/22/22 ENTERED. PRO SE PETITIONER NOT MAILED. (va)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 05, 2022
8 8 motion Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Fri 08/05 5:17 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply filed by KEVIN RANSOM, THE ATTORNEY GENERAL OF THE STATE OF PENNSYLVANIA, THE DISTRICT ATTORNEY OF THE COUNTY OF PHILADELPHIA.Certificate of Service.Motions referred to DAVID R. STRAWBRIDGE.(ERNST, KATHERINE)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 14, 2022
7 7 misc Letter Fri 07/15 12:03 AM
State Court Record Received by Chambers of Judge Strawbridge on 7/14/22. (va)
Related: [-]
misc State Court Record - Prisoner Thu 07/14 9:21 AM
State Court Record received. (rf, )
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 23, 2022
misc Remark Thu 06/23 7:41 AM
DOC 6 MAILED TO PRO SE (rf, )
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 21, 2022
6 6 1 pgs order Order for Prisoner State Record Wed 06/22 2:29 PM
ORDER THAT THE DISTRICT ATTORNEY OF PHILADELPHIA COUNTY SHALL FILE A RESPONSE AND MEMORANDUM OF LAW WITH SUPPORTING EXHIBITS PURSUANT TO RULE 5 FOL. 28 U.S.C. § 2254 BY AUGUST 5, 2022; SHOULD PETITIONER WISH TO FILE A REPLY TO THE RESPONDENTS RESPONSE, HE MUST DO SO WITHIN THIRTY (30) DAYS AFTER SERVICE OF THE RESPONSE; AND THE OFFICE OF THE PROTHONOTARY OF THE FIRST JUDICIAL DISTRICT OF PENNSYLVANIA SHALL FILE WITH THE CLERK OF THIS COURT ON OR BEFORE AUGUST 5, 2022 COPIES OF ALL RECORDS, INCLUDING TRANSCRIPTS OF NOTES OF TESTIMONY AT ARRAIGNMENT, TRIAL, SENTENCING, SUPPRESSION HEARINGS, POST-CONVICTION HEARINGS, PETITIONS, PLEADINGS, OPINIONS AND BRIEFS OF STATE COURT PROCEEDINGS IN THE MATTER OF COMMONWEALTH V. JAMES BROWN, NO. CP-51-CR-9390-2011 (SENTENCED MAY 11, 2016). SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE DAVID R. STRAWBRIDGE ON 6/21/22. 6/22/22 ENTERED. PRO SE PETITIONER NOT MAILED. (va)
Related: [-]
5 5 2 pgs order Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge Tue 06/21 4:00 PM
ORDER THAT THE APPLICATION FOR LEAVE TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS (DOC. NO. 3) IS DENIED AS MOOT. THIS MATTER IS REFERRED TO THE HONORABLE DAVID R. STRAWBRIDGE, UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE, FOR A REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION, ETC. SIGNED BY HONORABLE EDWARD G. SMITH ON 6/21/22. 6/21/22 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO PRO SE.(er)
Related: [-]
misc Remark Tue 06/21 8:33 AM
MAILED OUT PRO SE GUIDELINES TO PETITIONER ON 6/21/22. (jaa, )
Related: [-]
misc Remark Wed 06/22 1:56 PM
E-mailed Petition and Order to Attorney General of PA and DA of Philadelphia. (er)
Related: [-]
misc Remark Wed 06/22 3:22 PM
Copy of6 Faxed to CCP Philadelphia on 6/22/22. (va)
Related: [-]
misc Remark Wed 06/22 3:33 PM
Copy of6 Order &1 Petition e-mailed to PA Atty Gen & Philadelphia DA on 6/22/22. (va)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 13, 2022
4 4 notice Notice re: Pro Se Guidelines Fri 06/17 1:19 PM
PRO SE NOTICE RE: GUIDELINES. PRO SE PETITIONER NOT MAILED. (va)
Related: [-]
3 3 motion Proceed In Forma Pauperis Fri 06/17 1:08 PM
MOTION FOR LEAVE TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS, filed by JAMES BROWN. Envelope. (va)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Filing Fee Received Fri 06/17 12:56 PM
Filing fee: $ 5, receipt number PPE240965 SCI-DALLAS (va)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus Fri 06/17 12:34 PM
PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus ( Filing fee $ 5 receipt number PPE240965.), filed by JAMES BROWN. Envelope.(va)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memorandum,
Att: 2 Exhibits