Washington Eastern District Court
Judge:Robert H Whaley
Case #: 4:22-cv-05074
Nature of Suit863 Social Security - DIWC/DIWW (405(g))
Cause42:205 Appointment of Surgeon General
Case Filed:Jun 17, 2022
Terminated:Jul 05, 2024
Defendant
Party Name in Social Security Case - Unavailable
Interested Party
Party Name in Social Security Case - Unavailable
Plaintiff
Party Name in Social Security Case - Unavailable

GPO Jul 05 2024
ORDER ADOPTING 18 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION TO GRANT 12 PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND DENY 13 DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT. This file is closed. Signed by Senior Judge Robert H. Whaley. (REM, Case Administrator) Modified on 7/8/2024 to add correct link to R & R (CLP, Case Administrator Team Lead).
GPO Jul 05 2024
JUDGMENT in favor of Melanie Stickley against Martin O'Malley. (REM, Case Administrator)

Docket last updated: 05/16/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Friday, October 18, 2024
25 25 4 pgs order Order on Motion for Attorney Fees Fri 10/18 4:47 PM
ORDER GRANTING21 PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR ATTORNEY FEES. File is CLOSED. Signed by Senior Judge Robert H. Whaley. (SG, Case Administrator)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 16, 2024
24 24 respm Response to Motion Wed 10/16 10:33 AM
RESPONSE to Motion re21 MOTION for Attorney Fees for EAJA noting no opposition filed by Martin O'Malley. (Edwards, L)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 03, 2024
23 23 respm Declaration in Support of Motion Thu 10/03 6:02 PM
DECLARATION by Melanie Stickley in Support re21 MOTION for Attorney Fees for EAJA filed by Melanie Stickley.(Hatfield, Chad)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Certificate of Service
22 22 respm Declaration in Support of Motion Thu 10/03 6:01 PM
DECLARATION by Chad Hatfield in Support re21 MOTION for Attorney Fees for EAJA filed by Melanie Stickley. (Hatfield, Chad)
Related: [-]
21 21 motion Attorney Fees Thu 10/03 6:00 PM
MOTION for Attorney Fees for EAJA by Melanie Stickley. Motion Hearing set for 11/4/2024 Without Oral Argument before Senior Judge Robert H. Whaley.(Hatfield, Chad)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Fee Agreement,
Att: 2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order
Friday, July 05, 2024
20 20 order Judgment - Clerk Fri 07/05 11:42 AM
JUDGMENT in favor of Melanie Stickley against Martin O'Malley. (REM, Case Administrator)
Related: [-]
19 19 2 pgs order Order Adopting Report and Recommendations Fri 07/05 11:39 AM
ORDER ADOPTING19 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION TO GRANT12 PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND DENY13 DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT. This file is closed. Signed by Senior Judge Robert H. Whaley. (REM, Case Administrator)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 13, 2024
18 18 motion Report and Recommendations Thu 06/13 3:22 PM
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION; re12 Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment and13 Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment. Objections to R&R due by 6/27/2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alexander C Ekstrom. (REM, Case Administrator)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 21, 2024
17 17 order Order Referring Motion Tue 05/21 11:57 AM
TEXT ORDER REFERRING MOTIONS to Magistrate Judge Alexander C. Ekstrom re13 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Kilolo Kijakazi and12 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Melanie Stickley. TEXT ORDER ONLY. NO PDF ATTACHED. Signed by Senior Judge Robert H. Whaley. (RG, Chief Deputy)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 26, 2023
16 16 order Order Referring Motion Wed 07/26 8:08 AM
TEXT ORDER REFERRING MOTION to Magistrate Judge James A. Goeke re13 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Kilolo Kijakazi and12 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Melanie Stickley. TEXT ORDER ONLY. NO PDF ATTACHED. Signed by Senior Judge Robert H. Whaley. (RG, Chief Deputy)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 17, 2023
order Order Reassigning Case Tue 01/17 4:14 PM
ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Senior Judge Robert H. Whaley for all further proceedings. Judge Mary K. Dimke no longer assigned to case. TEXT ORDER ONLY. NO PDF ATTACHED. Signed by Chief Judge Stanley A Bastian. (RG, Chief Deputy)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 01, 2022
14 14 respm Reply Memorandum Thu 12/01 5:16 PM
REPLY MEMORANDUM re13 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Melanie Stickley. (Hatfield, Chad)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 17, 2022
13 13 motion Summary Judgment Thu 11/17 3:15 PM
MOTION for Summary Judgment by Kilolo Kijakazi. Motion Hearing set for 1/4/2023 Without Oral Argument before Judge Mary K. Dimke. (Edwards, L)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 06, 2022
12 12 motion Summary Judgment Thu 10/06 1:14 PM
MOTION for Summary Judgment by Melanie Stickley. Motion Hearing set for 1/4/2023 Without Oral Argument before Judge Mary K. Dimke. (Hatfield, Chad)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 03, 2022
order Order Reassigning Case ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings Mon 10/03 9:34 AM
ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Mary K. Dimke for all further proceedings. Circuit Judge Salvador Mendoza no longer assigned to case. Signed by Chief Judge Stanley A Bastian. TEXT ORDER ONLY. NO PDF ATTACHED.(RG, Chief Deputy)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 31, 2022
10 10 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Stipulated Scheduling Order Wed 08/31 2:36 PM
ORDER GRANTING9 STIPULATED SCHEDULING ORDER. Plaintiff will serve and file a summary judgment motion by no later than 10/6/2022 . Defendant will serve and file any responsive motion and memorandum by no later than 11/17/2022 . Plaintiff will serve and file any reply to Defendant's memorandum by no later than 12/1/2022 . The parties' motions shall be noted for hearing on 1/4/2023 at 6:30 PM Without Oral Argument. Signed by Judge Salvador Mendoza, Jr. (LTR, Case Administrator)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 29, 2022
9 9 motion Stipulated Scheduling Order - Social Security Cases Only Mon 08/29 3:27 PM
Unopposed MOTION for Stipulated Scheduling Order by Melanie Stickley. (Hatfield, Chad)
Related: [-]
8 8 misc Administrative Record - Social Security Cases Only Mon 08/29 5:53 AM
Administrative Record by Defendant Kilolo Kijakazi.(Edwards, L)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Court Transcript Index,
Att: 2 Documents Related to Administrative Process Including Transcript of Oral Hearing, if applicable,
Att: 3 Payment Documents and Decisions,
Att: 4 Jurisdictional Documents and Notices,
Att: 5 Non Disability Related Development,
Att: 6 Disability Related Development,
Att: 7 Medical Records Part 1,
Att: 8 Medical Records Part 2. Due to the COVID-19 crisis, the transcript filed on CM/ECF is the only transcript copy available at this time.
Tuesday, August 09, 2022
7 7 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 08/09 6:13 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by L Jamala Edwards on behalf of Kilolo Kijakazi (Attorney L Jamala Edwards added to party Kilolo Kijakazi(pty:dft))(Edwards, L)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 22, 2022
6 6 service Summons Returned Executed Fri 07/22 11:05 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Melanie Stickley re Kilolo Kijakazi. (Hatfield, Chad)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 30, 2022
5 5 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 06/30 10:58 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Brian M Donovan on behalf of Kilolo Kijakazi (Attorney Brian M Donovan added to party Kilolo Kijakazi(pty:dft))(Donovan, Brian)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 21, 2022
3 3 service Summons Issued Tue 06/21 8:46 AM
Summons Issued as to Kilolo Kijakazi.(MRJ, Case Administrator)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Summons- USA,
Att: 2 Summons- USAG
notice Notice of Judge Assignment Tue 06/21 8:40 AM
Notice of Judge Assignment. Judge Salvador Mendoza, Jr assigned to case. (MRJ, Case Administrator)
Related: [-]
order Order IFP - non-prisoner Tue 06/21 8:49 AM
ORDER TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS . Plaintiff is granted in forma pauperis status. IT IS SO ORDERED. TEXT ONLY entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the court order or notice on the matter. Signed by Magistrate Judge James A. Goeke. (HF)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 17, 2022
1 1 cmp Complaint Fri 06/17 8:10 PM
COMPLAINT against Kilolo Kijakazi IFP Pending Filed by Melanie Stickley.(Hatfield, Chad)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Summons,
Att: 3 Summons,
Att: 4 Summons