California Central District Court
Judge:Fred W Slaughter
Referred: Autumn D Spaeth
Case #: 8:22-cv-01187
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Other Contract
Case Filed:Jun 19, 2022
Re-opened:Sep 13, 2024
Terminated:Dec 02, 2024
Last checked: Sunday Nov 24, 2024 1:51 AM PST
Defendant
Southern Glazers Wine and Spirits, LLC
Represented By
Ashok Ramani
Davis Polk And Wardwell LLP
contact info
Tammy Ann Tsoumas
Kirkland And Ellis LLP
contact info
Serge A. Voronov
Davis Polk And Warwell LLP
contact info
Jan Nielsen Little
Keker Van Nest And Peters LLP
contact info
Neal Alan Potischman
Davis Polk And Wardwell LLP
contact info
Cody Shawn Harris
Keker Van Nest And Peters LLP
contact info
Terence J McCarrick
Kirkland And Ellis LLP
contact info
Matthew Brent Summers
Kirkland And Ellis LLP
contact info
Jacquie P. Andreano
Keker Van Nest And Peters LLP
contact info
Philip T Sheng
Davis Polk And Wardwell LLP
contact info
Elizabeth K McCloskey
Gibson, Dunn And Crutcher LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Roma Mikha, Inc.
Represented By
Victor Meng
Gaw Poe LLP
contact info
Randolph Gaw
Gaw Poe LLP
contact info
Mark W Poe
Gaw Poe LLP
contact info
Seth T. Cohen
Cohen Law Firm, LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
F and D Santee Market, Inc
Represented By
Victor Meng
Gaw Poe LLP
contact info
Randolph Gaw
Gaw Poe LLP
contact info
Mark W Poe
Gaw Poe LLP
contact info
Seth T. Cohen
Cohen Law Firm, LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
M and Y Family, Inc
Represented By
Victor Meng
Gaw Poe LLP
contact info
Randolph Gaw
Gaw Poe LLP
contact info
Mark W Poe
Gaw Poe LLP
contact info
Seth T. Cohen
Cohen Law Firm, LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Times Market and Liquor, Inc
Represented By
Victor Meng
Gaw Poe LLP
contact info
Randolph Gaw
Gaw Poe LLP
contact info
Mark W Poe
Gaw Poe LLP
contact info
Seth T. Cohen
Cohen Law Firm, LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
NMRM, Inc.
Represented By
Mark W Poe
Gaw Poe LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/13/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Monday, March 03, 2025
98 98 misc Status Report Mon 03/03 3:46 PM
STATUS REPORT JOINT STATUS REPORT filed by Defendant Southern Glazers Wine and Spirits, LLC. (Tsoumas, Tammy)
Related: [-]