Texas Southern District Court
Case #: 7:22-mj-01019
Case Filed:May 21, 2022
Terminated:May 27, 2022
Last checked: Monday Jun 20, 2022 2:17 AM CDT
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Theodore Vandoren Parran, III
U.S. Attorney'S Office
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
Jonathan Moises Aguilar-Acevedo (1)
Terminated: 05/27/2022
Represented By
Federal Public Defender - McAllen
contact info


Docket last updated: 06/20/2022 2:23 AM CDT
Friday, May 20, 2022
Arrest of Jonathan Moises Aguilar-Acevedo, filed. (klopez, 7) Modified on 5/23/2022 (jhacker, ).
Related: [-]
Saturday, May 21, 2022
1 1 COMPLAINT as to Jonathan Moises Aguilar-Acevedo (1), filed. (Hidalgo) Initial Appearance set for 5/23/2022 at 09:00 AM before Magistrate Judge J Scott Hacker (klopez, 7) (AmySanchez, 7). Modified on 5/23/2022 (jhacker, ).
Related: [-]