Gray v. Amazon
Original Case: 1:20-cv-00715
Second Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals | |
Case #: | 0:22-cv-01304 |
Type | civil / private |
Nature of Suit | 367 Torts - Personal Injury - Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury/Product Liability |
Case Filed: | Jun 16, 2022 |
Terminated: | Dec 01, 2022 |
Last checked: Friday Dec 02, 2022 3:37 AM EST |
Defendant - Appellee
Amazon.com
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
Michele Gray, and on behalf of M.G., minor
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 12/02/2022 3:34 AM EST |
Thursday, June 16, 2022 | ||
1 | 1 NOTICE OF CIVIL APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellant Michele Gray, FILED. [3334204] 22-1304 [Entered: 06/17/2022 08:53 AM] | |
Att: 1 2 pgs Dkt_Ntc_BK_CV_PR_Tax | ||
Att: 2 7 pgs Case FILED | ||
2 | 2 9 pgs DISTRICT COURT MEMORANDUM-DECISION AND ORDER, dated 05/23/2022, RECEIVED.[3334229] 22-1304 [Entered: 06/17/2022 09:07 AM] | |
3 | 3 ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[3334230] 22-1304 [Entered: 06/17/2022 09:10 AM] | |
Att: 1 1 pgs Notice_of_Index_or_ROA_Filed | ||
Att: 2 5 pgs Index/FRAP 10(d) in lieu of ROA FILED |