Andrews v. Vatti
Original Case: 3:22-cv-00335
Second Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals | |
Case #: | 0:22-cv-01308 |
Type | civil / united states |
Nature of Suit | 440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights |
Case Filed: | Jun 16, 2022 |
Terminated: | Aug 08, 2022 |
Last checked: Tuesday Aug 09, 2022 4:31 AM EDT |
Defendant - Appellee
Magistrate Judge S. Dave Vatti
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
Jeffrey Andrews
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 08/09/2022 4:28 AM EDT |
Thursday, June 16, 2022 | ||
1 | 1 NOTICE OF CIVIL APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellant Jeffrey Andrews, FILED. [3334520] 22-1308 [Entered: 06/17/2022 11:53 AM] | |
Att: 1 2 pgs Dkt_Ntc_BK_CV_PR_Tax | ||
Att: 2 5 pgs Case FILED | ||
2 | 2 3 pgs DISTRICT COURT ORDER, entered in the district court as docket entry #9, dated 03/28/2022, RECEIVED.[3334525] 22-1308 [Entered: 06/17/2022 11:56 AM] | |
3 | 3 ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[3334526] 22-1308 [Entered: 06/17/2022 11:56 AM] | |
Att: 1 1 pgs Notice_of_Index_or_ROA_Filed | ||
Att: 2 8 pgs Index/FRAP 10(d) in lieu of ROA FILED |