O. v. New York City Department of Education
Original Case: 1:20-cv-10277
Second Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals | |
Case #: | 0:22-cv-01312 |
Type | civil / private |
Nature of Suit | 448 Civil Rights - Education |
Case Filed: | Jun 17, 2022 |
Terminated: | Aug 01, 2022 |
Last checked: Tuesday Aug 02, 2022 4:30 AM EDT |
Defendant - Appellee
New York City Department of Education
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
K. O., Individually and on behalf of I.E., a child with a disability
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 08/02/2022 4:29 AM EDT |
Friday, June 17, 2022 | ||
1 | 1 NOTICE OF CIVIL APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellant K. O., FILED. [3334733] 22-1312 [Entered: 06/17/2022 02:11 PM] | |
Att: 1 2 pgs Dkt_Ntc_BK_CV_PR_Tax | ||
Att: 2 13 pgs Case FILED | ||
2 | 2 11 pgs DISTRICT COURT ORDER, entered in the district court as docket entry dated 01/07/2022, RECEIVED.[3334735] 22-1312 [Entered: 06/17/2022 02:14 PM] | |
3 | 3 30+ pgs DISTRICT COURT OPINION AND ORDER, dated 05/26/2022, RECEIVED.[3334737] 22-1312 [Entered: 06/17/2022 02:15 PM] | |
4 | 4 6 pgs DISTRICT COURT JUDGMENT, dated 06/14/2022, RECEIVED.[3334738] 22-1312 [Entered: 06/17/2022 02:16 PM] | |
5 | 5 PAYMENT OF DOCKETING FEE, on behalf of Appellant K. O., district court receipt # ANYSDC-26287762, FILED.[3334740] 22-1312 [Entered: 06/17/2022 02:17 PM] | |
6 | 6 ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[3334742] 22-1312 [Entered: 06/17/2022 02:17 PM] | |
Att: 1 1 pgs Notice_of_Index_or_ROA_Filed | ||
Att: 2 12 pgs Index/FRAP 10(d) in lieu of ROA FILED |