Florida Middle District Court
Judge:Wendy W Berger
Referred: Embry J Kidd
Case #: 6:22-cv-01078
Nature of Suit485 Other Statutes - Telephone Consumer Protection Act
Cause47:227 Restrictions of Use of Telephone Equipment
Case Filed:Jun 21, 2022
Terminated:Oct 18, 2022
Last checked: Friday Mar 15, 2024 8:48 PM EDT
Defendant
Renee Skinner
Plaintiff
Michael Kapinos
Represented By
Avi Robert Kaufman
Kaufman P.A.
contact info
Stefan Coleman
Law Offices Of Stefan Coleman
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/15/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Tuesday, October 18, 2022
9 9 1 pgs order Order dismissing case Tue 10/18 12:59 PM
ORDER dismissing case re 8 Plaintiff's Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Without Prejudice. Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(i), the Clerk of Court is directed to terminate all pending motions and close this case. Signed by Judge Wendy W. Berger on 10/18/2022. (RMF)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 12, 2022
8 8 notice Notice of voluntary dismissal Wed 10/12 2:22 PM
NOTICE of voluntary dismissal by Michael Kapinos (Kaufman, Avi)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 29, 2022
order *Order no pdf Wed 06/29 3:41 PM
NOTICE TO COUNSEL AND PARTIES: The Middle District of Florida's revised Local Rules become effective February 1, 2021 and can be found on the Court's public website https://www.flmd.uscourts.gov/local-rules. For a just and efficient resolution of this case, the parties are DIRECTED to read and comply with the Middle District of Florida's Local Rules. See Local Rule 1.01(a). Failure to comply with ANY Local Rules or Court Orders may result in the imposition of sanctions including, but not limited to, the dismissal of this action or entry of default without further notice. Signed by Judge Wendy W. Berger on 6/29/2022. (RMF)
Related: [-]
notice Notice to Counsel of Local Rule Wed 06/29 3:41 PM
NOTICE of Local Rule 3.02(a)(2), which requires the parties in every civil proceeding, except those described in subsection (d), to file a case management report (CMR) using the uniform form at www.flmd.uscourts.gov. The CMR must be filed (1) within forty days after any defendant appears in an action originating in this court, (2) within forty days after the docketing of an action removed or transferred to this court, or (3) within seventy days after service on the United States attorney in an action against the United States, its agencies or employees. Judges may have a special CMR form for certain types of cases. These forms can be found at www.flmd.uscourts.gov under the Forms tab for each judge. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (RMF)
Related: [-]
Sunday, June 26, 2022
5 5 service Summons returned executed Sun 06/26 3:13 PM
RETURN of service executed on 6/22/2022 by Michael Kapinos as to Renee Skinner. (Coleman, Stefan)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 22, 2022
4 4 order *Order pdf Wed 06/22 9:41 AM
ORDER ON DISCOVERY MOTIONS. Signed by Magistrate Judge Embry J. Kidd on 6/22/2022. (PML)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 21, 2022
3 3 service Summons issued Tue 06/21 2:51 PM
SUMMONS issued as to Renee Skinner. (KNC)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Tue 06/21 10:58 AM
COMPLAINT against Renee Skinner with Jury Demand (Filing fee $402 receipt number AFLMDC-19691175) filed by Michael Kapinos.(Coleman, Stefan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Proposed Summons
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Tue 06/21 12:10 PM
NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Wendy W. Berger and Magistrate Judge Embry J. Kidd. New case number: 6:22-cv-1078-WWB-EJK. (SJB)
Related: [-]