Ohio Northern District Court
Judge:Pamela A Barker
Case #: 1:22-cv-01079
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Case Filed:Jun 21, 2022
Terminated:Dec 02, 2022
Case in other court:Cuyahoga County Court of Common Pleas, CV 22 964075
Last checked: Sunday Dec 18, 2022 3:49 AM EST
Defendant
Armond Budish
Cuyahoga County Executive c/o Department of Law 2079 E. 9th Street
Cleveland, OH 44115
Represented By
Michael J. Stewart
Office Of The Prosecuting Attorney - Cuyahoga County
contact info
Matthew P. Convery
Office Of The Prosecuting Attorney - Cuyahoga County
contact info
Defendant
Cuyahoga County
County Administrative Headquarters 2079 East 9th Street
Cleveland, OH 44115
Represented By
Michael J. Stewart
Office Of The Prosecuting Attorney - Cuyahoga County
contact info
Matthew P. Convery
Office Of The Prosecuting Attorney - Cuyahoga County
contact info
Defendant
John Doe
Defendant
Bruce Lourie
2079 East Ninth Street
Cleveland, OH 44115
Represented By
Michael J. Stewart
Office Of The Prosecuting Attorney - Cuyahoga County
contact info
Matthew P. Convery
Office Of The Prosecuting Attorney - Cuyahoga County
contact info
Defendant
Shane Alex Pellom
2079 East Ninth Street
Cleveland, OH 44115
Represented By
Michael J. Stewart
Office Of The Prosecuting Attorney - Cuyahoga County
contact info
Matthew P. Convery
Office Of The Prosecuting Attorney - Cuyahoga County
contact info
Defendant
David G Schilling
Cuyahoga County Sheriff 1215 West 3rd St.
Cleveland, OH 44113
Represented By
Michael J. Stewart
Office Of The Prosecuting Attorney - Cuyahoga County
contact info
Matthew P. Convery
Office Of The Prosecuting Attorney - Cuyahoga County
contact info
Plaintiff
Conor O'Boyle
2201 West 93rd Street Apt. 27
Cleveland, OH 44107
Represented By
Daniel E. Shields
contact info


Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Friday, December 02, 2022
10 10 1 pgs order Order Dismissing Case Fri 12/02 9:32 AM
Order of Case Dismissal, with prejudice. Judge Pamela A. Barker on 12/2/2022. (P,K)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 28, 2022
minutes 1 - Terminate Hearings ~Util - Terminate Referral Order Fri 10/28 11:42 AM
Order [non-document] The Court has been advised by the parties that this case has been resolved. The parties are to file a dismissal with prejudice by 12/01/22 (5:00pm). Magistrate Judge Jonathan D. Greenberg on 10/28/22. (D,Ky)
Related: [-]
order Order on Motion to dismiss for failure to state a claim Order on Motion to consolidate cases Fri 10/28 12:54 PM
Order [non-document] In light of the parties' resolution, the Court hereby terminates the pending motion to dismiss (doc.4 ) and motion to consolidate (doc.5 ) as moot. Judge Pamela A. Barker on 10/28/2022.(P,K)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 30, 2022
9 9 6 pgs order Order Tue 08/30 3:50 PM
Order scheduling zoom mediation conference to be held on 10/31/2022 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Jonathan D. Greenberg. Confidential mediation statements are due to chambers by 10/24/22. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jonathan D. Greenberg on 8/30/22. (D,Ky)
Related: [-]
8 8 1 pgs order Order of Referral to Judicial Officer for Mediation or Settlement Tue 08/30 10:50 AM
Order referring case to Magistrate Judge Jonathan D. Greenberg for mediation to be conducted by October 31, 2022. Judge Pamela A. Barker on 8/30/2022. (P,K)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 29, 2022
7 7 motion Conference/Hearing Mon 08/29 3:30 PM
Joint Motion for conference/hearing Mediation Before United States Magistrate Judge filed by Armond Budish, Cuyahoga County, John Doe, Bruce Lourie, Shane Alex Pellom, David G Schilling. (Stewart, Michael)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 01, 2022
6 6 2 pgs motion Order Mon 08/01 12:35 PM
Consent Motion TO HOLD FILINGS filed by Plaintiff Conor O'Boyle. (Shields, Daniel)
Related: [-]
order Order on Motion for order Mon 08/01 2:13 PM
Order [non-document] granting Plaintiff's Agreed Motion to Continue Case for One Month. The Court will stay consideration of all pending motions in this case until September 1, 2022. The parties are ordered to file a joint status report no later than September 1, 2022 apprising the Court of the status of this case and proposing an updated briefing schedule for the pending motions. Judge Pamela A. Barker on 8/1/2022.(P,K)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 22, 2022
5 5 motion Consolidate Cases Fri 07/22 9:23 AM
Motion to consolidate cases filed by Plaintiff Conor O'Boyle. (Shields, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 11, 2022
4 4 motion Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Mon 07/11 4:03 PM
Motion to dismiss for failure to state a claim filed by Armond Budish, Cuyahoga County, Bruce Lourie, Shane Alex Pellom, David G Schilling. (Stewart, Michael)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 27, 2022
3 3 motion Extension (answer complaint) Mon 06/27 1:22 PM
Unopposed Motion for extension of time until 07/12/2022 to answer filed by Armond Budish, Cuyahoga County, Bruce Lourie, Shane Alex Pellom, David G Schilling. (Stewart, Michael)
Related: [-]
order Order on Motion for extension of time to answer Mon 06/27 2:39 PM
Order [non-document]granting3 Defendant's Motion for Extension of Time to Answer until Armond Budish, Cuyahoga County, Bruce Lourie, Shane Alex Pellom, and David G Schilling answer due 7/12/2022. Judge Pamela A. Barker on 6/27/2022.(S,KM)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 21, 2022
2 2 oth_evt Magistrate Consent Form Issued by Intake Tue 06/21 10:07 AM
Magistrate Consent Form issued. (L,MI)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Notice of Removal Tue 06/21 9:45 AM
Notice of Removal from Cuyahoga County Common Pleas Court, case number CV 22 964075 with jury demand, Filing fee paid $ 402, receipt number AOHNDC-11479519. Filed by Bruce Lourie, David G. Schilling, Armond Budish, Cuyahoga County, Shane Alex Pellom.. (Stewart, Michael)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Exhibit A - Complaint,
Att: 3 Exhibit B - Summons - Cuyahoga County,
Att: 4 Exhibit C - Return of Service of Cuyahoga County,
Att: 5 Exhibit D - Summons - Budish,
Att: 6 Exhibit E - Return of Service of Budish,
Att: 7 Exhibit F - Summons Shane Alex Pellom,
Att: 8 Exhibit G - Purported Return of Service of Pellom,
Att: 9 Exhibit H Summons - Bruce Lourie,
Att: 10 Exhibit EX. I Purported Return of Service of Lourie,
Att: 11 Exhibit J - Summons - John Doe,
Att: 12 Exhibit K - Refused Return of Service of John Doe,
Att: 13 Exhibit L - Summons - David Schilling, Jr.,
Att: 14 Exhibit M - Purported Return of Service to Schilling,
Att: 15 Exhibit N - Cuyahoga County Docket
utility Add and Terminate Judge Tue 06/21 10:05 AM
Judge Pamela A. Barker assigned to case. (L,MI)
Related: [-]
oth_evt Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge Tue 06/21 10:06 AM
Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Jonathan D. Greenberg. (L,MI)
Related: [-]
order Order Tue 06/21 11:39 AM
Order [non-document] This matter was removed to this Court on 6/21/2022. For the convenience of the Court, and by no later than 7/5/2022, the parties are directed to refile herein any motions that were previously filed in state court and which remained pending at the time of removal. Judge Pamela A. Barker on 6/21/2022. (M,CE)
Related: [-]