Minnesota District Court
Judge:Katherine M Menendez
Referred: Douglas L Micko
Case #: 0:22-cv-01622
Nature of Suit710 Labor - Fair Labor Standards Act
Cause29:201 Fair Labor Standards Act
Case Filed:Jun 21, 2022
Last checked: Sunday Dec 18, 2022 4:03 AM CST
Defendant
Ayvaz Pizza, LLC
Represented By
Joel W Rice
Fisher & Phillips
contact info
Franklin Z. Wolf
Fisher & Phillips
contact info
Barbara Jean D'Aquila
Fisher & Phillips LLP
contact info
Defendant
Shoukat Dhanani
Represented By
Joel W Rice
Fisher & Phillips
contact info
Franklin Z. Wolf
Fisher & Phillips
contact info
Barbara Jean D'Aquila
Fisher & Phillips LLP
contact info
Defendant
John Doe
Defendant
Doe Corporation
Defendant
Muy Pizza-Tejas, LLC
Represented By
William A McNab
Winthrop & Weinstine, PA
contact info
Laura A Pfeiffer
Winthrop & Weinstine, PA
contact info
Quin C. Seiler
Winthrop & Weinstine, PA
contact info
Plaintiff
John Stotesbery
Represented By
Andy Biller
contact info
Andrew Kimble
Biller & Kimble, LLC
contact info
Corey Kobbervig
Kobbervig Law LLC
contact info
Samuel David Elswick, Jr
Biller & Kimble, LLC
contact info

GPO May 21 2024
ORDER granting 236 Unopposed Motion for Preliminary Approval of Settlement. Signed by Judge Katherine M. Menendez on 5/21/2024. (SDV)
GPO Oct 24 2024
ORDER on 249 Plaintiff's Motion to Amend. (Written Opinion) Signed by Judge Katherine M. Menendez on 10/24/2024. (SDV)
GPO Feb 26 2025
ORDER granting 301 Motion for Approval of Settlement(Written Opinion) Signed by Judge Katherine M. Menendez on 2/26/2025. (SDV)

Docket last updated: 03/18/2025 11:59 PM CDT
Wednesday, March 12, 2025
322 322 notice Notice to Attorney - Retiring MJ Case Reassigned Wed 03/12 11:09 AM
(Text-Only) CLERK'S NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT. Due to the retirement of Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung, this case is reassigned to Magistrate Judge Douglas L. Micko. Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung is no longer assigned to the case. NOTE: the new case number is 22cv1622 KMM/DLM . Please use this case number for all subsequent pleadings. Note: the current hearings and conferences before the magistrate judge in this case will be cancelled unless otherwise indicated by the new MJ courtroom deputy. (JME)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 11, 2025
321 321 notice Notice (Other) Tue 03/11 9:28 AM
NOTICE by John Stotesbery of Consent to Join Action(Kimble, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 2 pgs Exhibit A - Consent to join form