Texas Eastern District Court
Judge:Sean D Jordan
Referred: Christine A Nowak
Case #: 4:22-cv-00515
Nature of Suit510 Prisoner Petitions - Motions to Vacate Sentence
Cause28:2255 Motion to Vacate/Correct Illegal Sentence
Case Filed:Jun 21, 2022
Terminated:Apr 27, 2023
Petitioner
William Randall Brannan
Respondent
USA

GPO Mar 31 2023
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION OF UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE. The Court recommends that this case be DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(b). See FED. R. CIV. P. 41(b). Signed by Magistrate Judge Christine A. Nowak on 03/31/2023. (jmb, )
GPO Apr 27 2023
ORDER OF DISMISSAL ADOPTING 10 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION. It is ORDERED the motion to vacate, set aside, or correct sentence is DISMISSED without prejudice. It is further ORDERED all motions by either party not previously ruled on are hereby DENIED. Signed by District Judge Sean D. Jordan on 04/27/2023. (jmb)
GPO Jun 14 2023
MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER. It is ORDERED that Brannan's motion for an extension of time to file objections, (Dkt. #15), is DENIED as moot. It is further ORDERED that Brannan's motion for appointment of counsel, (Dkt. #18), is DENIED. Finally, it is ORDERED that Brannan's motion that was construed as a motion for certificate of appealability, (Dkt. #19), is DENIED. All future motions should be filed with the Clerk of the United States Court of Appeals for the Fifth Circuit. Signed by District Judge Sean D. Jordan on 06/14/2023. (jmb)

Docket last updated: 12 hours ago
Monday, October 02, 2023
28 28 appeal USCA Order Tue 10/03 5:07 PM
ORDER of USCA: A COA is DENIED. Brannan's IFP motion is also DENIED. 23-40314 (jmb, )
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Cover Letter
Tuesday, August 15, 2023
notice Notice (Other) Tue 08/15 4:10 PM
USCA 5th CIRCUIT NOTICE: Original eROA has been accepted. (jmb)
Related: [-]
appeal USCA Availability of eROA Tue 08/15 4:12 PM
Appeal Remark re: Counsel can access the record on appeal by following the instructions in the link. If an appearance wasn't made in the appellant court, counsel doesn't have access through the link.[LINK:Link to Instructions] re17 Notice of Appeal : (jmb)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 25, 2023
notice Notice (Other) Tue 07/25 4:49 PM
Notice of certification of eROA provided to 5th Circuit Court of Appeals. 23-40314 (jmb)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 17, 2023
27 27 misc Sealed Document Mon 07/17 4:22 PM
SEALED Correspondence to the Court received from William Randall Brannan. (jmb)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Envelope
Wednesday, July 12, 2023
26 26 1 pgs order Order Wed 07/12 8:19 AM
POSTJUDGMENT ORDER. It is ORDERED the motion for leave to appeal in forma pauperis (Dkt. #25 ) is DENIED. All future motions should be filed with the Clerk of the United States Court of Appeals for the Fifth Circuit. Signed by District Judge Sean D. Jordan on 07/12/2023. (jmb) Modified text on 7/12/2023 (jmb)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 05, 2023
25 25 motion Appeal In Forma Pauperis Wed 07/05 4:10 PM
MOTION for Leave to Appeal in forma pauperis by William Randall Brannan.(jmb)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Envelope
Monday, June 26, 2023
24 24 misc Sealed Document Fri 06/30 5:44 PM
SEALED Correspondence to the Court received from William Randall Brannan.(jmb)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Envelope
Monday, June 19, 2023
23 23 notice Notice (Other) Wed 06/21 11:48 AM
USCA Notice re denial of motion for certificate of appealability and filing fees due. (jmb)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 14, 2023
22 22 4 pgs order Memorandum & Opinion Order Thu 06/15 9:52 AM
MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER. It is ORDERED that Brannan's motion for an extension of time to file objections, (Dkt. #15 ), is DENIED as moot. It is further ORDERED that Brannan's motion for appointment of counsel, (Dkt. #18 ), is DENIED. Finally, it is ORDERED that Brannan's motion that was construed as a motion for certificate of appealability, (Dkt. #19 ), is DENIED. All future motions should be filed with the Clerk of the United States Court of Appeals for the Fifth Circuit. Signed by District Judge Sean D. Jordan on 06/14/2023. (jmb)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 05, 2023
21 21 misc Letter Tue 06/06 3:30 PM
Correspondence from William Brannan (daj, )
Related: [-]
20 20 misc Letter Tue 06/06 3:29 PM
Correspondence from William Brannan (daj, )
Related: [-]
19 19 motion Miscellaneous Relief Tue 06/06 3:28 PM
Request for permission to appeal by William Randall Brannan. (daj, )
Related: [-]
18 18 motion Appoint Counsel Tue 06/06 3:26 PM
MOTION to Appoint Counsel by William Randall Brannan.(daj, )
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Envelope
Thursday, June 01, 2023
appeal USCA Case Number Wed 06/07 9:21 AM
Notice of Docketing Notice of Appeal from USCA re17 Notice of Appeal filed by William Randall Brannan. USCA Case Number 23-40314 (jmb)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 25, 2023
17 17 appeal Notice of Appeal Thu 05/25 4:50 PM
NOTICE OF APPEAL as to13 Final Judgment by William Randall Brannan. (No fee paid) (jmb)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Envelope
16 16 notice Notice of Change of Address Thu 05/25 4:47 PM
NOTICE of Change of Address by William Randall Brannan.(jmb)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Envelope
15 15 motion Extension of Time to File Thu 05/25 4:45 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Objections by William Randall Brannan.(jmb)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Envelope
Friday, May 19, 2023
14 14 respoth Response to Non-Motion Fri 05/19 2:52 PM
RESPONSE to10 Report and Recommendation,12 Order Adopting Report and Recommendation,13 Judgment, by William Randall Brannan.(jmb)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Envelope(s)
Thursday, April 27, 2023
13 13 order Judgment Thu 04/27 8:59 AM
FINAL JUDGMENT. The Court ORDERS that the case is DISMISSED without prejudice. Signed by District Judge Sean D. Jordan on 04/27/2023. (jmb)
Related: [-]
12 12 1 pgs order Order Adopting Report and Recommendations Thu 04/27 8:28 AM
ORDER OF DISMISSAL ADOPTING10 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION. It is ORDERED the motion to vacate, set aside, or correct sentence is DISMISSED without prejudice. It is further ORDERED all motions by either party not previously ruled on are hereby DENIED. Signed by District Judge Sean D. Jordan on 04/27/2023. (jmb)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 13, 2023
11 11 misc Mail Returned Fri 04/14 2:51 PM
Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Order10 sent to William Randall Brannan returned marked, "RETURN TO SENDER - REFUSED - UNABLE TO FORWARD". (jmb, )
Related: [-]
Friday, March 31, 2023
10 10 misc Report and Recommendations Fri 03/31 1:34 PM
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION OF UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE. The Court recommends that this case be DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(b). See FED. R. CIV. P. 41(b). Signed by Magistrate Judge Christine A. Nowak on 03/31/2023. (jmb, )
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 29, 2023
9 9 misc Mail Returned Thu 03/30 8:37 AM
Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Order8 sent to William Randall Brannan returned marked, "RETURN TO SENDER - UNDELIVERABLE AS ADDRESSED - UNABLE TO FORWARD". (daj, )
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 09, 2023
8 8 1 pgs order Order Fri 03/10 3:10 PM
ORDER. Movant has 14 days in which to file a separate notice of change of address. This case may be dismissed for failure to prosecute if Movant fails to timely comply with this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christine A. Nowak on 3/9/23. (dm, )
Related: [-]
Monday, February 06, 2023
7 7 misc Mail Returned Tue 02/07 10:01 AM
Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Order6 sent to William Randall Brannan returned marked, "RETURN TO SENDER - REFULED - UNABLE TO FORWARD". (daj, )
Related: [-]
Friday, January 20, 2023
6 6 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Fri 01/20 11:22 AM
ORDER finding as moot4 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to1 Motion to Vacate/Set Aside/Correct Sentence (2255) . Signed by Magistrate Judge Christine A. Nowak on 1/20/2023. (mmc)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 28, 2022
5 5 respoth Response to Non-Motion Mon 11/28 2:54 PM
RESPONSE to1 Motion to Vacate/Set Aside/Correct Sentence (2255) filed by USA .(Johnson, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
4 4 motion Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Mon 11/28 2:49 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to1 Motion to Vacate/Set Aside/Correct Sentence (2255) by USA.(Johnson, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
Monday, September 19, 2022
3 3 1 pgs order Order Mon 09/19 2:39 PM
SHOW CAUSE ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christine A. Nowak on 09/19/2022. (klc, )
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 21, 2022
2 2 utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Tue 06/21 4:42 PM
Case assigned to District Judge Sean D. Jordan and referred to Magistrate Judge Christine A. Nowak. (mmc)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Magistrate referral
1 1 mot2255 Motion to Vacate/Set Aside/Correct Sentence (2255) Tue 06/21 4:37 PM
MOTION to Vacate, Set Aside or Correct Sentence (2255), filed by William Randall Brannan.(mmc)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Cover Letter,
Att: 2 Envelope(s)