Hawaii District Court
Judge:Derrick K Watson
Referred: Rom Trader
Case #: 1:22-cv-00282
Nature of Suit362 Torts - Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice
Cause28:1346 Tort Claim
Case Filed:Jun 22, 2022
Terminated:Jul 11, 2024
Last checked: Sunday Dec 18, 2022 11:20 PM HST
Defendant
United States of America
Represented By
Dana A. Barbata
U. S. Attorney'S Office -District Of Hawaii
contact info
Natalie Moreland Villalon
Office Of The United States Attorney
contact info
Plaintiff
Sterling Halmas
Represented By
Loretta A. Sheehan
Davis Levin Livingston
contact info
Mark S. Davis
Davis Levin Livingston Grande
contact info
Michael K. Livingston
Davis Levin Livingston
contact info
Plaintiff
Clarita Cabigas
Represented By
Loretta A. Sheehan
Davis Levin Livingston
contact info
Mark S. Davis
Davis Levin Livingston Grande
contact info
Michael K. Livingston
Davis Levin Livingston
contact info
Plaintiff
Francisco Cabigas
Represented By
Loretta A. Sheehan
Davis Levin Livingston
contact info
Mark S. Davis
Davis Levin Livingston Grande
contact info
Michael K. Livingston
Davis Levin Livingston
contact info
Plaintiff
Jayla Halmas
Represented By
Loretta A. Sheehan
Davis Levin Livingston
contact info
Mark S. Davis
Davis Levin Livingston Grande
contact info
Michael K. Livingston
Davis Levin Livingston
contact info
Plaintiff
Julius Halmas
Represented By
Loretta A. Sheehan
Davis Levin Livingston
contact info
Mark S. Davis
Davis Levin Livingston Grande
contact info
Michael K. Livingston
Davis Levin Livingston
contact info
Plaintiff
Syrus Halmas
Represented By
Loretta A. Sheehan
Davis Levin Livingston
contact info
Mark S. Davis
Davis Levin Livingston Grande
contact info
Michael K. Livingston
Davis Levin Livingston
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/05/2025 11:59 PM HST
Thursday, July 11, 2024
108 108 order Stipulation for Dismissal and Order Thu 07/11 3:21 PM
STIPULATION FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE AS TO ALL CLAIMS AND PARTIES; ORDER by United States of America - Signed by CHIEF JUDGE DERRICK K. WATSON on 7/11/2024. (eta)
Related: [-]