Georgia Northern District Court
Judge:Thomas W Thrash, Jr
Case #: 1:22-cv-02455
Nature of Suit710 Labor - Fair Labor Standards Act
Cause29:216(b) Labor - Minimum wage or overtime compensation
Case Filed:Jun 20, 2022
Terminated:Jan 11, 2023
Last checked: Saturday Dec 17, 2022 4:22 AM EST
Defendant
John Edward Biord
Plaintiff
James Curry
Represented By
James D. Fagan, Jr.
Stanford Fagan, LLC
contact info
Michael Blair Schoenfeld
Stanford Fagan, LLC
contact info
Robert S. Giolito
Robert S Giolito PC
contact info


Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Tuesday, May 06, 2025
27 27 misc Leave of Absence Tue 05/06 4:16 PM
Notice for Leave of Absence for the following date(s): June 16, 17, 18, 19, 20, 23, 24, 25, 26, 27, 30, July 1, 2, 3, 4, by Michael Blair Schoenfeld. (Schoenfeld, Michael)
Related: [-]
26 26 motion Sanctions Tue 05/06 3:49 PM
MOTION for Sanctions by James Curry.(Schoenfeld, Michael)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 M. Schoenfeld Declaration
Monday, May 05, 2025
25 25 motion Extension of Time Tue 05/06 3:46 PM
PRO SE MOTION for Extension of Time to carry out the Settlement Agreement by John Edward Biord. (tcc)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 09, 2024
24 24 misc Status Report Tue 07/09 10:14 AM
STATUS REPORT re Defendant's compliance with the Order dated 12/20/23 by James Curry. (Schoenfeld, Michael)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 10, 2024
23 23 misc Status Report Mon 06/10 4:31 PM
STATUS REPORT re Defendant's compliance with the Order dated 12/20/23 by James Curry. (Schoenfeld, Michael)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 10, 2024
22 22 misc Status Report Fri 05/10 12:11 PM
STATUS REPORT re Defendant's compliance with the Order dated 12/20/23 by James Curry. (Schoenfeld, Michael)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 11, 2024
21 21 2 pgs order Order on Motion to Hold in Contempt Thu 04/11 11:47 AM
ORDER granting in part16 Motion for Contempt and Sanctions. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Defendant Biord shall pay a fine of $100.00 per day to the Clerk of the Northern District of Georgia beginning on 04/12/2024, until he purges himself of contempt. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that by 05/10/2024, Plaintiff shall file a status report with the Court regarding Defendant's compliance with the Court's Order dated 12/30/2023, or alternatively, request a hearing. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 4/11/2024. c:Financial Office(jkb)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 10, 2024
20 20 minutes Motion Hearing Wed 04/10 2:51 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr.: Motion Hearing held on 4/10/2024 re16 MOTION for Contempt and Sanctions filed by James Curry. (Court Reporter Diane Peede)(jkb)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 11, 2024
notice Notice of Hearing on Motion Mon 03/11 10:28 AM
NOTICE of Hearing on Motion re:16 MOTION for Contempt and Sanctions. Motion Hearing set for 4/10/2024 at 02:00 PM in ATLA Courtroom 2108 before Judge Thomas W. Thrash Jr. (cbi)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 04, 2024
19 19 misc Certified Mail Returned Receipt Tue 03/05 12:44 PM
Certified Mail Returned Receipt re Clerks Certificate of Mailing (jkb)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 26, 2024
18 18 misc Certified Mail Returned Receipt Mon 02/26 11:11 AM
Certified Mail Returned Receipt re Clerks Certificate of Mailing (jkb)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 20, 2024
utility Submission to District Judge Tue 02/20 2:42 PM
Submission of16 MOTION for Contempt and Sanctions , to District Judge Thomas W. Thrash Jr. (hfm)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 14, 2024
order Writ Issued Wed 02/14 8:38 AM
WRIT of of Execution issued in the amount of $21,500.00 to attorney Michael B. Schoenfeld (jkb)
Related: [-]
utility Clerks Certificate of Mailing Wed 02/14 8:42 AM
Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Attorney Michael Schoenfeld re Writ Issued. CMRR# 70211970000227233884 (jkb)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 13, 2024
17 17 misc Application for Writ Tue 02/13 10:13 AM
APPLICATION for Writ of Execution by James Curry. (Schoenfeld, Michael)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 31, 2024
16 16 motion Contempt Wed 01/31 11:51 AM
MOTION for Contempt and Sanctions by James Curry.(Schoenfeld, Michael)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Schoenfeld Declaration
Thursday, December 21, 2023
15 15 misc Judgment - Clerk Thu 12/21 8:43 AM
CLERK'S JUDGMENT in favor of Plaintiff against Defendant (jkb)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 20, 2023
14 14 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Order Thu 12/21 8:28 AM
ORDER granting12 Motion for Order. The Defendant Biord is to take the steps set forth in Section 1(a-f) of the Settlement Agreement, including but not limited to, deposit $2,000,000.00 into an escrow account to pay wages, benefits, and expenses owed and unpaid to all persons who performed services on the motion picture On Smoother Dirt as film production crew members; and IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that judgment shall be entered in favor of Plaintiff in the amount of $25,000.00 in liquidated damages. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 12/20/2023. (jkb)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 30, 2023
utility Submission to District Judge Thu 11/30 3:43 PM
Submission of12 MOTION for Order Enforcing FLSA Settlement Agreement to District Judge Thomas W. Thrash Jr. (jeh)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 13, 2023
13 13 notice Notice of Filing Mon 11/13 1:03 PM
NOTICE Of Filing Corrected Motion to Enforce Settlement Agreement by James Curry re12 MOTION for Order Enforcing FLSA Settlement Agreement (Schoenfeld, Michael)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Corrected Motion to Enforce Settlement Agreement,
Att: 2 Corrected Brief,
Att: 3 Corrected Declaration of M. Schoenfeld,
Att: 4 Corrected Text of Proposed Order
Thursday, November 09, 2023
12 12 motion For Order Thu 11/09 3:17 PM
MOTION for Order Enforcing FLSA Settlement Agreement with Brief In Support by James Curry.(Schoenfeld, Michael)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Brief,
Att: 2 Schoenfeld Declaration,
Att: 3 Text of Proposed Order
Wednesday, January 11, 2023
11 11 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Order Wed 01/11 2:35 PM
ORDER granting10 Motion to Approve FLSA Settlement Agreement. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Settlement Agreement is APPROVED. The Parties are to file a Stipulation of Dismissal of this action with prejudice following Defendant's satisfaction of the steps set forth in Section 1 (a-f) of the Settlement Agreement. The Parties shall bear their own costs. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 1/11/23. (rsg)
Related: [-]
utility Terminate Civil Case Wed 01/11 2:37 PM
Civil Case Terminated. (rsg)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 09, 2023
10 10 motion For Order Mon 01/09 11:02 AM
MOTION for Order Approving FLSA Settlement Agreement with Brief In Support by James Curry.(Schoenfeld, Michael)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Brief,
Att: 2 Ex. 1 - Settlement Agreement,
Att: 3 Text of Proposed Order
Tuesday, December 06, 2022
9 9 2 pgs order Order on Motion to Certify Class Wed 12/07 11:44 AM
ORDER granting8 Motion to Certify Class. It is: 1. ORDERED that this action is conditionally certified pursuant to 29 U.S.C. §216(b) on behalf of the following: All persons who performed services on the motion picture On Smoother Dirt as film production crew members since January 1, 2022 (collectively the FLSA Class); 2. ORDERED that Defendant will produce to Plaintiff's counsel the names and last known: addresses, telephone numbers and email addresses of all potential members of the FLSA Class within ten (10) days of the date of this Order; 3. ORDERED that Plaintiff may issue notice to all potential members of the FLSA Class by first-class mail and email, informing them of their right to opt-in to this case; 4. ORDERED that there shall be an opt-in period of sixty (60) days, beginning from the date of Plaintiff's first issuance of notice; 5. ORDERED that Plaintiff is permitted to send reminder notices by first-class mail and email to all potential members of the FLSA Class who have not yet responded to notice within twenty-five (25) days of the first issuance of notice; 6. ORDERED that Plaintiff's proposed form of notice, attached to Plaintiff's Motion as Exhibit A, and Plaintiff's proposed Opt-In Consent Form, attached to Plaintiff's Motion as Exhibit B, are APPROVED, and shall be included in the issuance of notice. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 12/06/2022. (rsg)
Related: [-]
utility Submission to District Judge Tue 12/06 2:44 PM
Submission of8 MOTION to Certify Class to District Judge Thomas W. Thrash Jr. (jeh)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 18, 2022
8 8 4 pgs motion Certify Class Fri 11/18 4:28 PM
MOTION to Certify Class with Brief In Support by James Curry.(Schoenfeld, Michael)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Brief,
Att: 2 Ex. A - Proposed Notice,
Att: 3 Ex. B - Proposed Consent Form,
Att: 4 J. Curry Declaration,
Att: 5 D. Connell Declaration,
Att: 6 D. Luse Declaration,
Att: 7 Text of Proposed Order
Friday, October 07, 2022
7 7 order Scheduling Order Fri 10/07 3:49 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER: re:5 Joint Preliminary Report and Discovery Plan: Amended Pleadings due by 11/7/2022. Discovery ends on 2/3/2023. Motions due by 3/3/2023. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 3/3/2023. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 10/7/22. (jra)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 06, 2022
6 6 service Certificate of Service Thu 10/06 12:18 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by James Curry re Plaintiff's Initial Disclosures (Schoenfeld, Michael)
Related: [-]
5 5 misc Joint Preliminary Report and Discovery Plan Thu 10/06 12:17 PM
JOINT PRELIMINARY REPORT AND DISCOVERY PLAN filed by James Curry. (Schoenfeld, Michael)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 06, 2022
4 4 answer Answer to Complaint Wed 09/07 10:18 AM
(*Construed by clerk as) ANSWER to1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand by John Edward Biord - (Titled as "Defendant's Initial Disclosures, Response, and Affirmative Defense") Discovery ends on 2/3/2023.(jra)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 30, 2022
utility Clerks Entry of Default Tue 08/30 10:54 AM
Clerks Entry of Default as to John Edward Biord (jra)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 29, 2022
3 3 motion Clerks Entry of Default Mon 08/29 10:17 AM
MOTION for Clerks Entry of Default by James Curry.(Schoenfeld, Michael)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration of M. Schoenfeld
Monday, August 01, 2022
2 2 service Waiver of Service Executed Mon 08/01 2:55 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by James Curry. John Edward Biord waiver mailed on 6/23/2022, answer due 8/22/2022. (Schoenfeld, Michael)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 20, 2022
1 1 cmp Complaint Wed 06/22 10:20 AM
COLLECTIVE ACTION COMPLAINT with Jury Demand (Filing fee $402, receipt number AGANDC-11876768) filed by James Curry.(kxm)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 - Curry Consent,
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet