Ohio Northern District Court
Judge:Charles Esque Fleming
Referred: Jonathan D Greenberg
Case #: 1:22-cv-01107
Nature of Suit880 Civil Rights - Defend Trade Secrets Act of 2016 (DTSA)
Cause18:1836(a) Injunction against Misappropriation of Trade Secrets
Case Filed:Jun 22, 2022
Terminated:Dec 19, 2024
Last checked: Monday Dec 19, 2022 3:55 AM EST
Defendant
Annette Blanc
Represented By
Anthony L. Hunter
Health Law
contact info
David R. Cooper
Marshall & Melhorn
contact info
Michael A. Gonzalez
Health Law
contact info
Defendant
Hylant Group, Inc.
Represented By
Anthony L. Hunter
Health Law
contact info
David R. Cooper
Marshall & Melhorn
contact info
Michael A. Gonzalez
Health Law
contact info
Defendant
Christine Podlogar Loiselle
Represented By
Anthony L. Hunter
Health Law
contact info
David R. Cooper
Marshall & Melhorn
contact info
Michael A. Gonzalez
Health Law
contact info
Defendant
Michael Maitland
Represented By
Anthony L. Hunter
Health Law
contact info
David R. Cooper
Marshall & Melhorn
contact info
Michael A. Gonzalez
Health Law
contact info
Defendant
Dennis Neate
Represented By
Anthony L. Hunter
Health Law
contact info
David R. Cooper
Marshall & Melhorn
contact info
Michael A. Gonzalez
Health Law
contact info
Plaintiff
JBO Holding Company
Represented By
Ami J. Patel
Zashin & Rich - Cleveland
contact info
Stephen S. Zashin
Zashin & Rich - Cleveland
contact info
Lisa A. Kainec
Zashin & Rich - Cleveland
contact info
Plaintiff
James B. Oswald Company
Represented By
Ami J. Patel
Zashin & Rich - Cleveland
contact info
Stephen S. Zashin
Zashin & Rich - Cleveland
contact info
Lisa A. Kainec
Zashin & Rich - Cleveland
contact info
Jzinae N. Jackson
Zashin & Rich - Cleveland
contact info

GPO Sep 22 2022
Order: The Court GRANTS Defendants' 31 motion to quash 33 non-party subpoenas. Plaintiffs' 32 motion to strike is DENIED. Judge Charles Esque Fleming on 9/22/2022. (S,SR)

Docket last updated: 05/05/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Thursday, December 19, 2024
90 90 minutes ~Util - Terminate Referral Order Dismissing Case Thu 12/19 2:48 PM
Marginal Order of Case Dismissal. Judge Charles Esque Fleming on 12/19/2024. Related Document89 . (S,SR)
Related: [-]
89 89 notice Notice of Dismissal Thu 12/19 2:33 PM
Stipulated Notice of Dismissal Under FRCP 41(a)(1) filed by James B. Oswald Company, JBO Holding Company. (Patel, Ami)
Related: [-]