New Jersey District Court
Case #: 2:22-mj-08180
Case Filed:May 24, 2022
Terminated:May 26, 2022
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
ABDUL S. MADISON (1)
Terminated: 05/26/2022
Represented By
RAHUL KUMAR SHARMA
Office Of The Federal Public Defender
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Terminated: 05/26/2022
Represented By
FATIME MEKA CANO
Doj-Usao
contact info

Create an account to get the full party report for this case.



Docket last updated: 06/23/2022 3:53 AM EDT
Tuesday, May 24, 2022
Arrest (Rule 5) of ABDUL S. MADISON. (jbb)
Related: [-]
1 1 33 pgs INDICTMENT Received from the DISTRICT OF NEW MEXICO as to ABDUL S. MADISON. (jbb)
Related: [-]
2 2 1 pgs Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Jessica S. Allen: Initial Appearance in Rule 5 Proceedings and Bail Hearing as to ABDUL S. MADISON held on 5/24/2022. (Court Reporter/Recorder: ZOOM) (jbb)
Related: [-]
3 3 1 pgs ORDER REGARDING USE OF VIDEO CONFERENCING/TELECONFERENCING as to ABDUL S. MADISON. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jessica S. Allen on 5/24/22. (jbb)
Related: [-]
5 5 1 pgs ORDER APPOINTING FEDERAL PUBLIC DEFENDER as to ABDUL S. MADISON - RAHUL KUMAR SHARMA for ABDUL S. MADISON appointed. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jessica S. Allen on 5/24/22. (jbb)
Related: [-]
6 6 3 pgs ORDER Setting Conditions of Release as to ABDUL S. MADISON (1) $150,000 UNSECURED APPEARANCE BOND WITH CO-SIGNER (Finance notified). Signed by Magistrate Judge Jessica S. Allen on 5/24/22. (jbb) (Main Document 6 replaced on 5/26/2022) (jbb).
Related: [-]
7 7 2 pgs Appearance Bond Entered as to ABDUL S. MADISON in amount of $150,000 UNSECURED WITH CO-SIGNER. (jbb) (Main Document 7 replaced on 5/26/2022) (jbb).
Related: [-]
8 8 1 pgs WAIVER of Rule 5 Hearings by ABDUL S. MADISON. (jbb)
Related: [-]
9 9 1 pgs BRADY ORDER as to ABDUL S. MADISON. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jessica S. Allen on 5/24/22. (jbb)
Related: [-]