Tennessee Eastern District Court
Judge:Charles E Atchley, Jr
Referred: Cynthia R Wyrick
Case #: 2:22-cv-00070
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause42:2000e Job Discrimination (Employment)
Case Filed:Jun 22, 2022
Terminated:Aug 05, 2024
Last checked: Monday Dec 19, 2022 4:54 AM EST
Defendant
Morristown-Hamblen Hospital Association
Represented By
Paul Edward Wehmeier
Arnett, Draper & Hagood, LLP
contact info
Jay W Mader
Arnett, Draper & Hagood
contact info
Defendant
Shield and Buckler Security, Inc.
Plaintiff
Samantha Graf
Represented By
Caroline Drinnon
Hmc Civil Rights Law, PLLC
contact info
Heather Moore Collins
Hmc Civil Rights Law, PLLC
contact info
Ashley Walter
Hmc Civil Rights Law, PLLC
contact info

GPO Jul 16 2024
MEMORANDUM OPINION & ORDER. 166 Motion will be GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART. Plaintiff's Motions in Limine 117 & 138 are DENIED AS MOOT. The parties SHALL FILE a joint status report on or before 7/19/2024, regarding these issues. Signed by District Judge Charles E Atchley, Jr on 7/16/2024. (DCB)

Docket last updated: 05/08/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Monday, December 23, 2024
274 274 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Seal Previously Filed Document Mon 12/23 3:31 PM
ORDER granting 273 Motion to Seal Document 272 Appeal Transcript,. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cynthia R Wyrick on 12/23/2024. (JCK)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 20, 2024
273 273 motion Seal Previously Filed Document Fri 12/20 5:38 PM
MOTION to Seal Previously Filed Document272 Appeal Transcript,,,, by Samantha Graf. (Collins, Heather)
Related: [-]