Original Case: 8:17-cv-00386

Eighth Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals
Case #: 0:22-cv-02313
Typecivil / private
Nature of Suit370 Torts - Personal Property - Other Fraud
Case Filed:Jun 22, 2022
Terminated:Oct 11, 2022
Last checked: Wednesday Oct 12, 2022 3:24 AM CDT
Defendant - Appellee
Blake Van Gilder
Represented By
Richard A. DeWitt
CROKER & HUCK
contact info
Scott D. Jochim
CROKER & HUCK
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
Infogroup, Inc., a Corporation
Represented By
Michael C. Cox
KOLEY & JESSEN
contact info
Matthew D. Hammes
LOCHER & PAVELKA
contact info
Gregory Carl Scaglione
KOLEY & JESSEN
contact info
Elizabeth A. Luebbert
KOLEY & JESSEN
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
Koley Jessen P.C., LLO
Represented By
Michael C. Cox
KOLEY & JESSEN
contact info
Gregory Carl Scaglione
KOLEY & JESSEN
contact info
Elizabeth A. Luebbert
KOLEY & JESSEN
contact info
William F. Hargens
MCGRATH & NORTH
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellant
DatabaseUSA.com LLC
Represented By
James L. Schneider
SHERRETS & BRUNO
contact info
Robert S. Sherrets
SHERRETS & BRUNO
contact info


Docket last updated: 10/12/2022 3:24 AM CDT
Wednesday, June 22, 2022
5 pgs Civil case docketed. [5169975] 22-2313 (CJO)
Related: [-]
30+ pgs Originating court document filed consisting of notice of appeal, docket entries, Memorandum and Order 05/24/2022, and Judgment 05/24/2022.[5169978] 22-2313 (CJO)
Related: [-]
2 pgs BRIEFING SCHEDULE SET AS FOLLOWS:
Transcript due on or before 08/01/2022. Appendix due 08/11/2022. BRIEF APPELLANT, DatabaseUSA.com LLC due 08/11/2022
Appellee brief is due 30 days from the date the court issues the Notice of Docket Activity filing the brief of appellant.
[5169982] 22-2313 (CJO)
Related: [-]