Tennessee Middle District Court
Judge:Waverly D Crenshaw, Jr
Referred: Alistair Newbern
Case #: 2:22-cv-00028
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Case Filed:Jun 22, 2022
Terminated:Feb 20, 2024
Last checked: Monday Dec 19, 2022 2:47 AM CST
Defendant
Jacob Norris
Represented By
Michael G. Abelow
Sherrard Roe Voigt & Harbison, PLC
contact info
Defendant
Justin Norris
Represented By
Michael G. Abelow
Sherrard Roe Voigt & Harbison, PLC
contact info
Defendant
Norris Bros. Excavating, LLC
Represented By
Michael G. Abelow
Sherrard Roe Voigt & Harbison, PLC
contact info
Defendant
Norris Bros. Properties, LLC
Represented By
Michael G. Abelow
Sherrard Roe Voigt & Harbison, PLC
contact info
Plaintiff
United States Fire Insurance Company
Represented By
Melissa J. Lee
Manier & Herod, PC
contact info
Taylor S. Ward
Manier & Herod, PC
contact info

GPO Jan 02 2024
OCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(mg)MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER: Pending before the Court in this breach of contract action against Norris Brothers Excavating, LLC ("NBE"), Norris Brothers Properties, LLC ("NBP"), Jacob Norris, and Justin Norris is United States Fire Insurance Company's ("USFIC") 16 Motion for Summary Judgment. Accordingly, and for the foregoing reasons, USFIC's Motion for Summary Judgment is GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART. The Motion is GRANTED with respect to USFIC's claims against Jacob Norris, Justin Norris and Norris Bros. Excavating, LLC, but is DENIED with respect to the claims against Norris Bros. Properties, LLC. Signed by Chief Judge Waverly D. Crenshaw, Jr on 1/02/2024. (D

Docket last updated: 72 minutes ago
Tuesday, February 20, 2024
46 46 1 pgs order Order Dismissing Case Tue 02/20 3:51 PM
AGREED ORDER DISMISSING CASE: It appearing before the Court, that all claims raised in this matter by and between Plaintiff United State Fire Insurance Company and Defendants Norris Bros. Excavating, LLC, Norris Bros. Properties, LLC, Jacob Norris, and Justin Norris have been compromised and settled. Accordingly, all claims raised by the parties are DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. By agreement all costs taxed to the Plaintiffs. The Clerk is directed to close this case. Signed by Chief Judge Waverly D. Crenshaw, Jr on 2/20/2024. (mg)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 19, 2024
45 45 misc Proposed Order of Dismissal Mon 02/19 9:14 AM
PROPOSED ORDER OF DISMISSAL filed by United States Fire Insurance Company. (Lee, Melissa)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 06, 2024
44 44 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Tue 02/06 3:48 PM
ORDER: Motion43 is GRANTED and the parties deadline to file their dismissal documents is extended to February 19, 2024. Signed by Chief Judge Waverly D. Crenshaw, Jr on 2/6/2024. (mg)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 05, 2024
43 43 motion Extension of Time to File Document Mon 02/05 10:56 AM
Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File to File Agreed Order of Dismissal by United States Fire Insurance Company.(Lee, Melissa)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Attachment Proposed Agreed Order
Friday, January 05, 2024
42 42 1 pgs order Order 1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings Fri 01/05 1:46 PM
ORDER: The parties have filed a Notice of Settlement (Doc. No.41 ) advising that all matters and things in controversy in this action have been compromised and settled. Accordingly, the parties shall file an Agreed Order of Dismissal by February 5, 2024. The pretrial conference set for January 5, 2024 and the trial set for January 16, 2024 are hereby CANCELLED. Signed by Chief Judge Waverly D. Crenshaw, Jr on 01/05/2024. (mg)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 04, 2024
41 41 2 pgs notice Notice of Settlement Thu 01/04 6:16 PM
NOTICE of Settlement JOINT by United States Fire Insurance Company (Lee, Melissa)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 02, 2024
40 40 trial Proposed Jury Verdict Form Tue 01/02 9:43 PM
Proposed Jury Verdict Form by Norris Bros. Properties, LLC. (Abelow, Michael)
Related: [-]
39 39 trial Proposed Jury Instructions Tue 01/02 9:42 PM
Proposed Jury Instructions by Norris Bros. Properties, LLC . (Abelow, Michael)
Related: [-]
38 38 order Pretrial Order Tue 01/02 2:38 PM
JOINT PRETRIAL ORDER. Signed by Chief Judge Waverly D. Crenshaw, Jr on 01/02/2024. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.) (mg)
Related: [-]
37 37 7 pgs order Memorandum Opinion of the Court Order ~Util - Terminate Motions Tue 01/02 11:30 AM
MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER: Pending before the Court in this breach of contract action against Norris Brothers Excavating, LLC ("NBE"), Norris Brothers Properties, LLC ("NBP"), Jacob Norris, and Justin Norris is United States Fire Insurance Company's ("USFIC")16 Motion for Summary Judgment. Accordingly, and for the foregoing reasons, USFIC's Motion for Summary Judgment is GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART. The Motion is GRANTED with respect to USFIC's claims against Jacob Norris, Justin Norris and Norris Bros. Excavating, LLC, but is DENIED with respect to the claims against Norris Bros. Properties, LLC. Signed by Chief Judge Waverly D. Crenshaw, Jr on 1/02/2024. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.) (mg)
Related: [-]
36 36 1 pgs order Order Tue 01/02 10:13 AM
ORDER: The pretrial conference set for January 5, 2024, at 9:00 a.m. will be in held at the Fred D. Thompson Courthouse and Federal Building, 719 Church Street, Nashville, Tennessee. Signed by Chief Judge Waverly D. Crenshaw, Jr on 1/02/2024. (mg)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 29, 2023
35 35 trial Proposed Jury Verdict Form Fri 12/29 4:14 PM
Proposed Jury Verdict Form by United States Fire Insurance Company. (Ward, Taylor)
Related: [-]
34 34 trial Proposed Jury Instructions Fri 12/29 2:58 PM
Proposed Jury Instructions by United States Fire Insurance Company Additional . (Lee, Melissa)
Related: [-]
33 33 trial Proposed Jury Instructions Fri 12/29 2:53 PM
Proposed Jury Instructions by United States Fire Insurance Company Joint . (Lee, Melissa)
Related: [-]
32 32 misc Stipulation Fri 12/29 2:20 PM
STIPULATION for Trial by United States Fire Insurance Company. (Lee, Melissa)
Related: [-]
31 31 trial Exhibit List Fri 12/29 1:59 PM
Exhibit List by United States Fire Insurance Company.. (Lee, Melissa)
Related: [-]
30 30 trial Witness List Fri 12/29 1:58 PM
Witness List by United States Fire Insurance Company. (Lee, Melissa)
Related: [-]
29 29 misc Proposed Pretrial Order Fri 12/29 1:51 PM
Proposed Pretrial Order Joint by United States Fire Insurance Company. (Lee, Melissa)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 24, 2023
28 28 respm Reply to Response to Motion Fri 11/24 12:07 PM
REPLY to Response to re16 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by United States Fire Insurance Company. (Ward, Taylor)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 17, 2023
27 27 misc Statement of facts Fri 11/17 2:58 PM
STATEMENT of facts (Defendants' Response to Plaintiff's Statement of Facts) . (Abelow, Michael)
Related: [-]
26 26 respm Response to Motion Fri 11/17 2:56 PM
RESPONSE to Motion re16 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Norris Bros. Properties, LLC. (Abelow, Michael)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 08, 2023
25 25 1 pgs order Order Wed 11/08 4:51 PM
ORDER: The Joint Status Report and Renewed Joint Motion To Continue the Trial Date and Pretrial Deadlines (Doc. No.24 ) is DENIED. The parties' decision to select a new mediation date that is almost 60 days after the original mediation date does not justify the relief sought. The Court will not condone the parties delay given the long-scheduled trial date and pending motion. Signed by Chief Judge Waverly D. Crenshaw, Jr on 11/8/2023. (mg)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 06, 2023
24 24 misc Status Report Mon 11/06 1:19 PM
STATUS REPORT Joint and Renewed Joint Motion to Continue the Trial Date and Pretrial Deadlines by United States Fire Insurance Company. (Lee, Melissa)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 30, 2023
23 23 1 pgs order Order Mon 10/30 4:23 PM
ORDER: It appears that the parties' informal efforts for an agreed resolution have not been productive. The Court believes that a formal mediation is appropriate. Accordingly, on or before November 6, 2023, the parties shall report on an agreed mediator and date for a mediation. IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed by Chief Judge Waverly D. Crenshaw, Jr on 10/30/2023. (af)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 08, 2023
22 22 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Continue Fri 09/08 11:25 AM
ORDER: The Joint Motion To Continue Trial (Doc. No.21 ) is DENIED. As the parties know this case was set for trial in 2022 giving them at least 15 months to mediate the case. Their decision to wait to the eve of trial to mediate the case does not merit a trial continuance. IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed by Chief Judge Waverly D. Crenshaw, Jr on 9/8/2023. (af)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 05, 2023
21 21 3 pgs motion Continue Tue 09/05 12:19 PM
Joint MOTION to Continue Trial by Jacob Norris, Justin Norris, Norris Bros. Excavating, LLC, Norris Bros. Properties, LLC. (Abelow, Michael)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 15, 2023
20 20 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Tue 08/15 2:17 PM
ORDER: The Joint Motion to Extend Dispositive Motion Response Deadline (Doc. No.19 ) is GRANTED and the deadline for the Defendants to respond to Plaintiff's motion for summary judgment is extended to November 17, 2023. The parties should not anticipate the court will continue the trial unless there is good cause. IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed by Chief Judge Waverly D. Crenshaw, Jr on 8/15/2023. (af)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 14, 2023
19 19 motion Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Mon 08/14 10:20 AM
Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Jugment by Jacob Norris, Justin Norris, Norris Bros. Excavating, LLC, Norris Bros. Properties, LLC.(Abelow, Michael)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit A
Thursday, July 20, 2023
18 18 8 pgs misc Statement of facts Thu 07/20 4:24 PM
STATEMENT of facts in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment filed by United States Fire Insurance Company in support of16 Motion for Summary Judgment.(Lee, Melissa)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 65 pgs Exhibit A - Declaration of Eric Levine in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment,
Att: 2 3 pgs Exhibit B - Pertinent excerpts of Jacob Norriss Responses to USFICs First Set of Interrogatories,
Att: 3 3 pgs Exhibit C - Pertinent excerpts of Justin Norriss Responses to USFICs First Set of Interrogatories,
Att: 4 3 pgs Exhibit D - Declaration of Melissa Jane Lee In Support of Motion for Summary Judgment
17 17 19 pgs respoth Memorandum in Support Thu 07/20 4:18 PM
MEMORANDUM in Support of16 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by United States Fire Insurance Company . (Lee, Melissa)
Related: [-]
16 16 3 pgs motion Summary Judgment Thu 07/20 4:17 PM
MOTION for Summary Judgment by United States Fire Insurance Company. (Lee, Melissa)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 24, 2023
15 15 3 pgs misc Status Report Wed 05/24 3:40 PM
STATUS REPORT by United States Fire Insurance Company. (Ward, Taylor)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 23, 2023
14 14 1 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Deadlines Tue 05/23 4:21 PM
ORDER: The parties were ordered to file a joint status report regarding their case resolution efforts no later than 60 days before the deadline for the filing of dispositive motions. (Doc. No.10 .) That deadline passed on May 22, 2023, and no joint status report has been filed. The parties are ORDERED to file a joint status report by May 30, 2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern on 05/23/23. (ad)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 21, 2023
13 13 1 pgs order Order 1 - Terminate Hearings Wed 02/22 8:21 AM
ORDER: Magistrate Judge Newbern will no longer be holding second case management conferences as a matter of course in civil actions. The case management conference set on March 22, 2023 is CANCELLED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern on 02/21/23. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.) (ad)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 17, 2023
12 12 3 pgs misc Status Report Tue 01/17 1:22 PM
STATUS REPORT Joint by United States Fire Insurance Company. (Lee, Melissa)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 26, 2022
11 11 3 pgs order Order Setting Case for Trial Mon 09/26 3:51 PM
ORDER SETTING CASE FOR TRIAL: Jury Trial is set for 1/16/2024 at 09:00 AM in Cookeville before Chief Judge Waverly D. Crenshaw Jr. Exhibit List due by 12/29/2023. Witness List due by 12/29/2023. Pretrial Conference is set for 1/5/2024 at 09:00 AM in Cookeville before Chief Judge Waverly D. Crenshaw Jr. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 12/29/2023. Signed by Chief Judge Waverly D. Crenshaw, Jr on 9/26/2022. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.) (kc)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 19, 2022
10 10 8 pgs order Case Management Order Mon 09/19 3:02 PM
INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER: Amended Pleadings due by 12/16/2022. Discovery due by 5/26/2023. Dispositive Motions due by 7/21/2023. Case Management Conference by Telephone set for 3/22/2023 at 09:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern on 9/19/2022. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.) (jm)
Related: [-]
minutes Case Management Conference by Telephone Mon 09/19 11:11 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern: Case Management Conference by Telephone held on 9/19/2022. (Hearing lasted 00:10)(sd)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 15, 2022
9 9 9 pgs misc Proposed Case Management Order Thu 09/15 10:11 AM
PROPOSED CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER Joint filed by United States Fire Insurance Company. (Lee, Melissa)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 01, 2022
8 8 5 pgs answer Answer to Complaint Thu 09/01 8:41 AM
ANSWER to1 Complaint, by Jacob Norris, Justin Norris, Norris Bros. Excavating, LLC, Norris Bros. Properties, LLC.(Abelow, Michael)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 24, 2022
7 7 2 pgs order Order Fri 06/24 1:29 PM
ORDER: This case is REFERRED to the Magistrate Judge for customized case management in accordance with Local Rule 16.01 and 28 U.S.C. § 636(b)(1)(A). Lead counsel for the parties shall attend the initial case management conference. Signed by Chief Judge Waverly D. Crenshaw, Jr on 6/24/2022. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.) (jm)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 23, 2022
6 6 4 pgs service Summons Issued Thu 06/23 10:46 AM
Summons issued as to Jacob Norris, Justin Norris, Norris Bros. Excavating, LLC, and Norris Bros. Properties, LLC. (Service copies sent to counsel by regular mail.) (jm)
Related: [-]
5 5 2 pgs notice Notice of Case Management Conference Thu 06/23 10:34 AM
NOTICE of Initial Case Management Conference by Telephone set for 9/19/2022 at 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern. (jm)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 22, 2022
4 4 misc Business Entity Disclosure Statement Thu 06/23 10:08 AM
BUSINESS ENTITY DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by United States Fire Insurance Company. (jm)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Notice/Information re Consent of the Parties to MJ Thu 06/23 10:07 AM
NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (jm)
Related: [-]
2 2 notice Notice of Business Entity Disclosure Statement Filing Requirement Thu 06/23 10:07 AM
NOTICE of Business Entity Disclosure Statement filing requirement. (jm)
Related: [-]
1 1 15 pgs cmp Complaint Thu 06/23 10:06 AM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $402, Receipt number ATNMDC- 3616606), filed by United States Fire Insurance Company.(jm)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Attachment Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 11 pgs Exhibit 1 - Indemnity Agreement,
Att: 3 1 pgs Exhibit 2 - Cottrell Release,
Att: 4 1 pgs Exhibit 3 - J. Cumby Notice of Termination and Demand on Surety,
Att: 5 21 pgs Exhibit 4 - J. Cumby Updated Proof of Claim,
Att: 6 4 pgs Exhibit 5 - Collateral Indemnity Demand
misc Annotation - Bar Status Thu 06/23 10:22 AM
TN State Bar status verified as active for Melissa J. Lee and Taylor S. Ward admitted to this court . (jm)
Related: [-]