New Jersey District Court
Judge:John Michael Vazquez
Referred: Cathy L Waldor
Case #: 2:22-cv-04211
Nature of Suit370 Torts - Personal Property - Other Fraud
Cause15:77 Securities Fraud
Case Filed:Jun 23, 2022
Terminated:Jul 13, 2023
Last checked: Tuesday Dec 20, 2022 4:01 AM EST
Defendant
JEAN CALVIN ABELA
Defendant
TANZIL AHMAD
Defendant
MBOGMIS NEE BASSOMO MAR ANGELINE
Defendant
ANNY P N ELODIE ASSIH
Defendant
GILLES AUJOL
Defendant
RENE AYINA
Defendant
MONIQUE YOHANA NGO MAIH BAHOYA
Defendant
BIENVENU BAMOUNI
Defendant
MARIE DELPHINE BANG
Defendant
MARIE BROUARD NEE MAR BASSOMO
Defendant
BERNARD BAYIHA
Defendant
ANNE-GEORGETTE BEKONO
Defendant
CECILE JEANNETTE FOTSO BENGA
Defendant
ALAIN BESSALA
Defendant
JEANNE D'ARC BIDJONI
Defendant
JACQUES LANDRY BIKAI
Defendant
EDWIGE BITEU
Defendant
DOMINIQUE BITJOKA
Defendant
AUGUSTIN BOUDA
Defendant
MARTIN BROCHU
Defendant
MENSAH DAKEVI
Defendant
SACKO DAPA
Defendant
SERAPHINE DENTO
Defendant
BOUBAKAR DIARRA
Defendant
ACHILLE DJOUTA
Defendant
PAUL DONGUE
Defendant
NATHAN GUY EKWALLA
Defendant
RICHARD ENGOULOU
Defendant
HERVE SIMON EONE EONE
Defendant
JEFFE KOUMBOU F
Defendant
WILFRIED FAMI
Defendant
SANDRINE FAMI-ETETMAN
Defendant
SOUMARE FATOUMATA
Defendant
XAVIER CLAUDE FEUDJIO
Defendant
SERGE FOGUE
Defendant
EMMANUEL FOKO
Defendant
SERGE PATRICK FOTUE
Defendant
FRU ANNA EBENYE EPS FRU
Defendant
BRICE HOUSSOU
Defendant
PANGSOU INNOCENT
Defendant
MAMBO EPSE KOUM JULIENNE
Defendant
FRANCK KABORE
Defendant
DAVID CHRISTIAN KOM
Defendant
AIME SAMUEL KOUM
Defendant
SAMUEL AIME KOUM
Defendant
ARMELLE KUEMO
Defendant
CHARLINE LEMA
Defendant
LANDRY ANTOINE LEMOGO
Defendant
NGO NDEBI EPSE LIBAM
Defendant
FREDERICK SOME M
Defendant
AUGUSTINE REINE SOUVENIRS MAIH
Defendant
JUNIOR MAIH
Defendant
WILLIAM HENRY MBOM MAIH
Defendant
STEPHANIE MAMSEU
Defendant
JOHN MANDENG
Defendant
CLAUDINE MANGA
Defendant
CLAUDINE SYLVIE ELOUMOU MANGA
Defendant
THOMAS TIMOTHEE MANGA
Defendant
YETNA YETNA MATHIEU
Defendant
RUDY THIBAULT IKELE MATIBA
Defendant
GILDAS NGAMBOU MBOUNA
Defendant
SOULEMANOU MEFIRE
Defendant
JEAN LOUIS MESSANG
Defendant
PATRICK MESSI
Defendant
YVETTE MEVAZARA
Defendant
HENRI NOEL MOUKOURI MISSIPO
Defendant
EVELYN MOCHE
Defendant
JEAN-JACQUES MOIFFO
Defendant
LISE AMANDINE MOUENDI
Defendant
NEMESIOUS MOUENDI MOUENDI
Defendant
BENOIT BEA MOULAL
Defendant
NADEGE MOULAL
Defendant
DANIEL NJOME MOUSSINGA
Defendant
LAURE EPIPHANIE NDAKGO
Defendant
JULIENNE NDJE
Defendant
FILS NGAI NGAI
Defendant
FERDINAND NGANGUE
Defendant
ROUSSEL NGANGWA
Defendant
WILLY TCHUILEN NGATCHA
Defendant
ALBERT NGOG
Defendant
ERIC DENIS NGONO
Defendant
RENE HERMANN NGOUADJE
Defendant
CABRAL LIBII LI NGUE
Defendant
STEVE ARNOLD DJOUMESS NGUEKENG
Defendant
PAMELA JUDITH YOUMBI NGUENANG
Defendant
MATECK EPOUSE BAYIHA J NICOLE
Defendant
CHRISTOPHE NYOBE NLEND
Defendant
ALOYS RODRIGUE NOUCK
Defendant
CHARLES TAKAM NOULE
Defendant
NATHAN GUY HERVE NTONE
Defendant
JODEL ARMAND MANDENG NTSIMI
Defendant
JOSEPH FLAUBERT NYA
Defendant
JULES HONORE NYECK
Defendant
DESIRE OLOMO
Defendant
EDOUARD ARSEN OUATTARA
Defendant
SIMON OUEDRAOGO
Defendant
KOANDA OUSMANE
Defendant
SEBASTIEN PANNY
Defendant
SEVERIN PEFOUMBOU
Defendant
JOLANDE PETIPA
Defendant
SEVERIN POFOUMBO
Defendant
NICOLE RASOLONJATOVO
Defendant
HONORINE RATOLOJANAHARY
Defendant
JEFF JULLIAN DJAPA SAPEYA
Defendant
EMILE PARFAIT SIMB
Defendant
GERMAINE SIMB
Defendant
PAULIN NYOBE SIMON
Defendant
SIMTREX COMMERCIAL BROKERS LLC
Defendant
M'WETIGNE FREDERIC SOME
Defendant
SUMCH TAREK
Defendant
MONIQUE TATIOSOP
Defendant
JACK RAYANE DJAPA TCHAGWO
Defendant
DANIEL LE BON KEMA TCHOUZOU
Defendant
ALBERT NOEL TCHUENTE
Defendant
MURIEL CHRISTILLE TEDJO
Defendant
MAHAMADOU TO
Defendant
MARIE JOSEPH VOGTEMBING
Defendant
NATHALIE YAKAM
Defendant
NATHALIE YAMB
Defendant
MATHIEU YETNA YETNA
Defendant
PIERRE ZOUNGRANA
Defendant
GLOBAL INVESTMENT TRADING S.A.
Plaintiff
ARMEL BEMMO
Represented By
GALEN JOSEPH CRISCIONE
Criscione Ravala, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
ARMEL CONSTANT BOGUISSOGO
Represented By
GALEN JOSEPH CRISCIONE
Criscione Ravala, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
HILAIRE BOUDA
Represented By
GALEN JOSEPH CRISCIONE
Criscione Ravala, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
ANNIE NGO DIPOUMBI
Represented By
GALEN JOSEPH CRISCIONE
Criscione Ravala, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
HYPPOLITTE DJOUDA
Represented By
GALEN JOSEPH CRISCIONE
Criscione Ravala, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
ROSINE FOUKENG DJOUDA
Represented By
GALEN JOSEPH CRISCIONE
Criscione Ravala, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
PAUL EKWALLA EKOLLO
Represented By
GALEN JOSEPH CRISCIONE
Criscione Ravala, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
SOLOMON KABORE
Represented By
GALEN JOSEPH CRISCIONE
Criscione Ravala, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
MAYESSA M.KOULIBAY LEMAN
Represented By
GALEN JOSEPH CRISCIONE
Criscione Ravala, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
DIEUDONNE MANANGA
Represented By
GALEN JOSEPH CRISCIONE
Criscione Ravala, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
ARTHUR TIAM NGNEPIEPAYE
Represented By
GALEN JOSEPH CRISCIONE
Criscione Ravala, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
FRANCOIS EMMANUEL NGUETTA
Represented By
GALEN JOSEPH CRISCIONE
Criscione Ravala, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
TIMOTHEE NTAMACK
Represented By
GALEN JOSEPH CRISCIONE
Criscione Ravala, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
SABINE HORTENSE NTSAMA
Represented By
GALEN JOSEPH CRISCIONE
Criscione Ravala, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
KUMAKOLO FRIDA PAOLA
Represented By
GALEN JOSEPH CRISCIONE
Criscione Ravala, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
SIRINA SAVADOGO
Represented By
GALEN JOSEPH CRISCIONE
Criscione Ravala, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
NWAFO WANDJI CATHY STELLA
Represented By
GALEN JOSEPH CRISCIONE
Criscione Ravala, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
NOELIE TAPSOBA
Represented By
GALEN JOSEPH CRISCIONE
Criscione Ravala, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
EDITCH TCHE
Represented By
GALEN JOSEPH CRISCIONE
Criscione Ravala, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
ELEONORE TIENTCHEU
Represented By
GALEN JOSEPH CRISCIONE
Criscione Ravala, LLP
contact info

GPO May 17 2023
OPINION. Signed by Judge John Michael Vazquez on 5/17/2023. (sm)

Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Thursday, September 07, 2023
52 52 misc Mail Returned Thu 09/07 4:37 PM
Mail Returned as Undeliverable as to51 . (sm)
Related: [-]