Nevada District Court
Judge:Gloria M Navarro
Referred: Daniel J Albregts
Case #: 2:22-cv-00993
Nature of Suit890 Other Statutes - Other Statutory Actions
CauseCivil Miscellaneous Case
Case Filed:Jun 23, 2022
Terminated:Aug 31, 2022
Last checked: Tuesday Dec 20, 2022 12:43 AM PST
Defendant
Law Office of Andrew Fritz
Plaintiff
Ronald J. Allison
7083892 Clark County Detention Center 330 South Casino Center
Las Vegas, NV 89101


Docket last updated: 3 hours ago
Wednesday, August 31, 2022
7 7 order Judgment Wed 08/31 9:12 AM
JUDGMENT in favor of Law Office of Andrew Fritz against Ronald J. Allison. Signed by Clerk of Court Debra K. Kempi on 8/31/2022. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - HAM)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 30, 2022
6 6 2 pgs order Order on Report and Recommendation Wed 08/31 9:08 AM
ORDER adopting5 Report and Recommendation. IT IS ORDERED that Plaintiffs' Complaint, (ECF No.1 -1), is dismissed without prejudice. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk is instructed to close the case. Signed by Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 8/30/2022. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - HAM)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 15, 2022
5 5 motion Report and Recommendation Mon 08/15 3:57 PM
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION Re:1 Receipt of Initiating Documents. The undersigned RECOMMENDS that this case be DISMISSED. Objections to R&R due by 8/29/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Albregts on 8/15/2022. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - HAM)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 05, 2022
4 4 misc Letter Fri 07/08 3:03 PM
LETTER from Ronald Allison. (HAM)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 27, 2022
3 3 3 pgs order Order ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines & Hearings (non motion deadlines) Tue 06/28 9:05 AM
ORDER. IFP/Payment of filing fees due 7/25/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Albregts on 6/27/2022. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - IFP inmate form/instructions mailed to P - HAM)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 23, 2022
2 2 notice Advisory Letter Pro Se non-habeas Thu 06/23 3:42 PM
ADVISORY LETTER to litigant. (HAM)
Related: [-]
1 1 misc Receipt Initiating Documents Thu 06/23 3:39 PM
RECEIPT of Initiating Documents by Court on behalf of Plaintiff. No Application to Proceed IFP or Filing Fee received. (HAM)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Complaint
utility Assign Judges in Civil Case Thu 06/23 3:07 PM
Case randomly assigned to Judge Gloria M. Navarro and Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Albregts. (HAM)
Related: [-]