California Southern District Court
Judge:Cynthia Bashant
Referred: William V Gallo
Case #: 3:22-cv-00919
Nature of Suit485 Other Statutes - Telephone Consumer Protection Act
Cause47:227 Restrictions of Use of Telephone Equipment
Case Filed:Jun 23, 2022
Terminated:Jan 25, 2023
Last checked: Friday Mar 15, 2024 4:47 PM PDT
Defendant
All Credit Funding, LLC
Represented By
Christopher C. Wager
Mac Murray & Shuster
contact info
David J Kaminski
Carlson And Messer
contact info
Brett B. Goodman
Goodman Law Firm, Apc
contact info
Plaintiff
Anton A. Ewing
3077 B Clairmont Drive #372
San Diego, CA 92117
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
Izhak Halbani
Terminated: 10/21/2022
Represented By
Christopher C. Wager
Mac Murray & Shuster
contact info
David J Kaminski
Carlson And Messer
contact info
Brett B. Goodman
Goodman Law Firm, Apc
contact info

GPO Sep 27 2022
Order Denying Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction (ECF No. 8). Signed by Judge Cynthia Bashant on 9/27/22. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(jmo)

Docket last updated: 5 hours ago
Wednesday, January 25, 2023
36 36 2 pgs order Order on Motion to Dismiss Wed 01/25 3:57 PM
Order Granting Joint Motion to Dismiss (ECF No.35 ). The Court DISMISSES WITH PREJUDICE the action against Defendant. Signed by Judge Cynthia Bashant on 1/25/23. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(jmo)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 20, 2023
35 35 motion Dismiss Mon 01/23 9:54 AM
Joint Motion for Dismissal with Prejudice, by Anton A. Ewing. (jmo)
Related: [-]
34 34 notice Notice of Settlement Mon 01/23 9:47 AM
NOTICE of Settlement by Anton A. Ewing. (jmo)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 29, 2022
33 33 8 pgs order Order for Early Neutral Evaluation Tue 11/29 3:40 PM
Notice and Order for (1) Early Neutral Evaluation Conference, (2) Case Management Conference, and (3) Telephonic Status Conference. Early Neutral Evaluation set for 2/6/2023 at 09:00 AM before Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo. Case Management Conference set for 2/6/2023 at 09:00 AM before Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo. Status Conference set for 1/30/2023 at 01:00 PM before Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo. Joint Discovery Plan due 1/13/2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo on 11/29/22.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(jmo)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 02, 2022
32 32 answer Answer to Amended Complaint Wed 11/02 8:58 AM
ANSWER to12 Amended Complaint by All Credit Funding, LLC.(Kaminski, David)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 21, 2022
31 31 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Fri 10/21 11:26 AM
NOTICE of Dismissal of Izhak Halbani Without Prejudice Pursuant to Rule 41, by Anton A. Ewing. (jmo)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 19, 2022
30 30 2 pgs order Order on Motion to Withdraw Wed 10/19 2:01 PM
Order Granting Joint Motion to Withdraw Pending Motions (ECF No. [28). Signed by Judge Cynthia Bashant on 10/19/22. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(jmo)
Related: [-]
29 29 2 pgs order Order on Motion to Strike Wed 10/19 1:57 PM
Order Overruling Plaintiff's Objection to Pro Hac Vice Application (ECF No.26 ). Signed by Judge Cynthia Bashant on 10/19/22. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(jmo)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 17, 2022
28 28 motion Withdraw Mon 10/17 12:46 PM
Joint MOTION to Withdraw Pending Motions by All Credit Funding, LLC, Izhak Halbani. (Kaminski, David) (jmo)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 13, 2022
27 27 motion Sanctions Fri 10/14 9:56 AM
Second Motion for Sanctions Against Attorney Kmainski Pursuant to 28 USC §1927, by Anton A. Ewing. (jmo)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 12, 2022
26 26 motion Strike Wed 10/12 1:15 PM
Plaintiff Ewing's Objection to Pro Hac Vice Application re:24 by Anton A. Ewing. (jmo)
Related: [-]
24 24 notice Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice Wed 10/12 7:07 AM
Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee received: $ 213 receipt number ACASDC-17243383.) (Application to be reviewed by Clerk.) (Wager, Christopher)
Related: [-]
misc Pro Hac Vice Approved - Clerk Wed 10/12 11:57 AM
PRO HAC APPROVED: Christopher C. Wager appearing for Defendants All Credit Funding, LLC, Izhak Halbani (no document attached) (jrm)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 11, 2022
23 23 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 10/11 11:32 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Brett B. Goodman on behalf of All Credit Funding, LLC, Izhak Halbani (Goodman, Brett)Attorney Brett B. Goodman added to party All Credit Funding, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Brett B. Goodman added to party Izhak Halbani(pty:dft)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 07, 2022
22 22 respm Reply to Response to Motion Fri 10/07 2:52 PM
REPLY to Response to Motion re15 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Related [+] filed by Izhak Halbani. (Kaminski, David)
Related: [-] ply in Support of Defendant All Credit Funding LLCs Motion to Dismiss First Amended Complaint
Monday, October 03, 2022
21 21 motion Sanctions Wed 10/05 11:32 AM
Motion for Sanctions Against Attorney Kaminski Pursuant to 28 USC 1927 by Anton A. Ewing.(jmo)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration in support
20 20 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Wed 10/05 11:29 AM
Plaintiff's Response in Opposition to Defendant All Credit Funding, LLC's Motion to Dismiss re15 filed by Anton A. Ewing. (jmo)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 27, 2022
19 19 3 pgs order Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction Tue 09/27 2:54 PM
Order Denying Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction (ECF No.8 ). Signed by Judge Cynthia Bashant on 9/27/22. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(jmo)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 26, 2022
18 18 respm Response in Support of Motion Mon 09/26 12:09 PM
RESPONSE in Support re14 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction (Motion of Defendant to Dismiss First Amended Complaint) filed by Izhak Halbani. (Kaminski, David)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 22, 2022
17 17 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Fri 09/23 2:07 PM
Plaintiff's Declaration in Support of Response in Opposition to Defendant All Credit Funding. LLC's Motion to Dismiss re15 filed by Anton A. Ewing. (jmo)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 13, 2022
16 16 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Wed 09/14 12:35 PM
Plaintiff's Response in Opposition to Defendant Halbani's Motion to Dismiss14 filed by Anton A. Ewing.(jmo)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration
Friday, September 09, 2022
15 15 motion Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction Fri 09/09 1:02 PM
MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by All Credit Funding, LLC.(Kaminski, David)Attorney David J Kaminski added to party All Credit Funding, LLC(pty:dft) (jmo)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memo of Points and Authorities Memorandum in support of Motion,
Att: 2 Declaration Declaration of Izhak Halbani
Friday, September 02, 2022
14 14 motion Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction Fri 09/02 10:15 AM
MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction (Motion of Defendant to Dismiss First Amended Complaint) by Izhak Halbani.(Kaminski, David)(jmo)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memo of Points and Authorities,
Att: 2 Declaration Declaration Of Izhak Halbani
Monday, August 22, 2022
13 13 service Summons Issued Mon 08/22 10:42 AM
Amended Summons Issued to First Amended Complaint. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiffs not receiving notice electronically. (jmo)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 19, 2022
12 12 cmp Amended Complaint Mon 08/22 10:41 AM
AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Credit Funding, LLC, Izhak Halbani, filed by Anton A. Ewing. (jmo)
Related: [-]
11 11 respm Reply to Response to Motion Mon 08/22 9:59 AM
Plaintiff's Reply in Opposition to Defendant's Response to TRO re: [ECF 8], filed by Anton A. Ewing. (jmo)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 15, 2022
10 10 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Mon 08/15 2:57 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition re8 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Izhak Halbani.(Kaminski, David) (jmo)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration of Rogelio Casuso
9 9 motion Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction Mon 08/15 2:20 PM
MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Izhak Halbani.(Kaminski, David) (jmo)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memo of Points and Authorities,
Att: 2 Declaration Declaration Of Izhak Halbani
Monday, August 01, 2022
8 8 motion Preliminary Injunction Tue 08/02 11:12 AM
MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Anton A. Ewing.(fth)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memo of Points and Authorities,
Att: 2 Proof of Service
7 7 order Notice and Order of Document Discrepancies Mon 08/01 3:42 PM
Notice of Document Discrepancies and Order Thereon by Judge Cynthia Bashant Rejecting Document: Anton Ewing's Application for Entry of Default Against Non-Responding Defendant CSolar, from Plaintiff Anton A. Ewing. Non-compliance with local rule(s), OTHER: Civ.L. Rule 5.1: Improper format, caption lists defendants who are not a party to the case.. Signed by the Chambers of Judge Cynthia Bashant on 8/1/2022.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(ave)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 29, 2022
6 6 misc Request for Entry of Clerk Default Mon 08/01 9:29 AM
** Document Stricken per ECF7 ** Anton Ewing's Application for Entry of Default Against Non-Responding Defendant CSolar by Anton Ewing (Default not entered due to extension of response deadline granted) (ave) (ave)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 (8/1/2022) Stricken Document
Thursday, July 28, 2022
5 5 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Fri 07/29 8:29 AM
ORDER Granting Joint Motion to Extend Defendant's Time to Respond to the Complaint [ECF No.4 ]. Signed by Judge Cynthia Bashant on 7/28/2022. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(anh)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 27, 2022
4 4 motion Extension of Time to File Wed 07/27 5:06 PM
Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to Complaint by Izhak Halbani.(Kaminski, David)Attorney David J Kaminski added to party Izhak Halbani(pty:dft)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit
Tuesday, July 12, 2022
3 3 service Summons Returned Executed Wed 07/13 1:50 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Anton A. Ewing. Izhak Halbani served (by certified mail). (jmo)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 23, 2022
2 2 service Summons Issued Thu 06/23 2:47 PM
Summons Issued. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. Summons has been provided to plaintiffs not receiving notice electronically. (cxt)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Thu 06/23 2:43 PM
COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Izhak Halbani ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number CAS138727.), filed by Anton A. Ewing. The new case number is 3:22-cv-919-BAS-WVG. Judge Cynthia Bashant and Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo are assigned to the case. (Anton A. Ewing)(cxt)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Exhibit A,
Att: 3 Exhibit B,
Att: 4 Exhibit C,
Att: 5 Exhibit D,
Att: 6 Exhibit E,
Att: 7 Filing Fee Receipt