Gibbs v. Bank of America Bank, N.A.
Original Case: 1:22-cv-00011
Second Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals | |
Case #: | 0:22-cv-01344 |
Type | civil / private |
Nature of Suit | 470 Other Statutes - Racketeer Influenced and Corrupt Organizations |
Case Filed: | Jun 22, 2022 |
Terminated: | Dec 20, 2022 |
Last checked: Wednesday Dec 21, 2022 3:36 AM EST |
Defendant - Appellee
Cynthia R. Eadon
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
Merrick B. Garland, Attorney General
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
Nancy J. Whaley, Standing Chapter 13 Trustee, Northern District of Georgia (Atlanta Division)
|
|
Defendant - Appellee
Breon S. Peace, US Attorney (EDNY)
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
Does 1-500
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
Rod Rosenstein, (USA)
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
Smithsonian Institution
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
Michael Rosenfeld Art Gallery
|
|
Defendant - Appellee
Peter Stern, Esq.
|
|
Defendant - Appellee
William Bill Cosby
|
|
Defendant - Appellee
Scott and Corley, P.A.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
McGuire Woods, LLP
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
Chief Judge Wendy L. Hagenau
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
Alan M. Wilson, SC AG
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
Judge Michael G. Nettles
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
Federal Housing Finance Agency, (FHFA)
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
United States: Freddie Mac
|
|
Defendant - Appellee
Nationstar, DBA Mr. Cooper
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
Bank of America Bank, N.A.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
United States of America, ex rel.
|
|
Plaintiff
10 Million Homeowners
|
|
Plaintiff
100 Drug Raped Women
|
|
Plaintiff
Fannie Mae and Freddie Mac Investors
|
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
Eugene M. Gibbs
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 12/21/2022 3:32 AM EST |
Wednesday, June 22, 2022 | ||
1 | 1 NOTICE OF CIVIL APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellant Eugene M. Gibbs, FILED. [3337035] 22-1344 [Entered: 06/23/2022 11:06 AM] | |
Att: 1 13 pgs Case FILED | ||
Att: 2 2 pgs Dkt_Ntc_BK_CV_PR_Tax | ||
2 | 2 11 pgs DISTRICT COURT MEMORANDUM AND ORDER, dated 05/10/2022, RECEIVED.[3337047] 22-1344 [Entered: 06/23/2022 11:16 AM] | |
3 | 3 2 pgs DISTRICT COURT JUDGMENT, dated 05/11/2022, RECEIVED.[3337051] 22-1344 [Entered: 06/23/2022 11:17 AM] | |
4 | 4 ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[3337052] 22-1344 [Entered: 06/23/2022 11:19 AM] | |
Att: 1 1 pgs Notice_of_Index_or_ROA_Filed | ||
Att: 2 11 pgs Index/FRAP 10(d) in lieu of ROA FILED |