Connecticut District Court
Judge:Omar A Williams
Case #: 3:22-cv-00809
Nature of Suit110 Contract - Insurance
Cause28:2201 Declaratory Judgement (Insurance)
Case Filed:Jun 24, 2022
Terminated:Feb 28, 2025
Last checked: Wednesday Dec 21, 2022 3:42 AM EST
Defendant
Kellie Panus
Represented By
John Wade Cannavino, Jr.
Ryan Ryan Deluca, Llp - Stamford
contact info
Robert O. Hickey
Ryan Ryan Deluca LLP
contact info
Defendant
Stephen Panus
Represented By
John Wade Cannavino, Jr.
Ryan Ryan Deluca, Llp - Stamford
contact info
Robert O. Hickey
Ryan Ryan Deluca LLP
contact info
Defendant
Alexis Rorke
Represented By
Jason B. Burdick
Messier, Massad, Burdick & Assoc. LLC
contact info
Defendant
Caitlin Rorke
Represented By
Jason B. Burdick
Messier, Massad, Burdick & Assoc. LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
American Commerce Insurance Co
Represented By
Joseph R. Ciollo
Morrison Mahoney Llp - Hartford
contact info

GPO Feb 07 2025
ORDER granting ECF No. 55, Motion for Summary Judgment. See attached for details. Signed by Judge Omar A. Williams on 2/7/25. (Wagner, R)

Docket last updated: 9 hours ago
Friday, February 28, 2025
61 61 order Judgment Fri 02/28 2:55 PM
JUDGMENT. For Appeal Forms please go to the following website: http://www.ctd.uscourts.gov/forms/all-forms/appeals_forms Signed by Clerk on 2/28/25.(Velez, F)
Related: [-]
notice Judicial Evaluation Program Survey Fri 02/28 2:57 PM
JUDICIAL PROCEEDINGS SURVEY - FOR COUNSEL ONLY: The following link to the confidential survey requires you to log into CM/ECF for SECURITY purposes. Once in CM/ECF you will be prompted for the case number. Although you are receiving this survey through CM/ECF, it is hosted on an independent website called SurveyMonkey. Once in SurveyMonkey, the survey is located in a secure account. The survey is not docketed and it is not sent directly to the judge. To ensure anonymity, completed surveys are held up to 90 days before they are sent to the judge for review. We hope you will take this opportunity to participate, please click on this link: https://ecf.ctd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/Dispatch.pl?survey (Velez, F)
Related: [-]