Texas Southern District Court
Judge:George C Hanks, Jr
Case #: 4:22-cv-02061
Nature of Suit470 Other Statutes - Racketeer Influenced and Corrupt Organizations
Cause18:1962 Racketeering (RICO) Act
Case Filed:Jun 24, 2022
Last checked: Wednesday Dec 21, 2022 2:40 AM CST
Conflict Check Party
21st Century North America Insurance Co.
Defendant
1st Choice Accident & Injury, LLC, et al
Represented By
Sammy Ford, IV
Ahmad, Zavitsanos & Mensing, PC
contact info
Defendant
Matthew Dang, M.D.
Represented By
Brian Scott Humphrey, II
Humphrey Law PLLC
contact info
Defendant
Maxwell Adu-Lartey, M.D.
Defendant
Medical Center Chiropractic, LLC
Represented By
Sammy Ford, IV
Ahmad, Zavitsanos & Mensing, PC
contact info
Defendant
Millennium Pain & Surgical Institute, LLC
Represented By
Sammy Ford, IV
Ahmad, Zavitsanos & Mensing, PC
contact info
Defendant
Origin MRI And Diagnostics, LLC
Represented By
Sammy Ford, IV
Ahmad, Zavitsanos & Mensing, PC
contact info
Defendant
Origin Spine Institute, LLC
Represented By
Sammy Ford, IV
Ahmad, Zavitsanos & Mensing, PC
contact info
Defendant
Phuc Kien Andy Huynh, D. C
Represented By
Sammy Ford, IV
Ahmad, Zavitsanos & Mensing, PC
contact info
Defendant
Phuc Nancy Hong Huynh, D. C
Represented By
Sammy Ford, IV
Ahmad, Zavitsanos & Mensing, PC
contact info
Defendant
Phuc Vinh Charley Huynh, D.C
Represented By
Sammy Ford, IV
Ahmad, Zavitsanos & Mensing, PC
contact info
Defendant
Prohealth Medical Group Management, LLC
Represented By
Sammy Ford, IV
Ahmad, Zavitsanos & Mensing, PC
contact info
Defendant
Reid Singleton, M.D
Defendant
Scott M. Hung, M.D.
Represented By
Sammy Ford, IV
Ahmad, Zavitsanos & Mensing, PC
contact info
Defendant
See Chin, M.D.
Defendant
Smart Choice Chiropractic, LLC
Represented By
Sammy Ford, IV
Ahmad, Zavitsanos & Mensing, PC
contact info
Defendant
Susan Hanh Huynh
Represented By
Sammy Ford, IV
Ahmad, Zavitsanos & Mensing, PC
contact info
Defendant
Houston Pain Relief & Wellness Clinic, LLC
Represented By
Sammy Ford, IV
Ahmad, Zavitsanos & Mensing, PC
contact info
Defendant
Ali Mazloom, M.D.
Represented By
Sammy Ford, IV
Ahmad, Zavitsanos & Mensing, PC
contact info
Defendant
Celebrity Spine & Joint, LLC
Represented By
Sammy Ford, IV
Ahmad, Zavitsanos & Mensing, PC
contact info
Defendant
Chad Porter, M.D.
Represented By
Brian Scott Humphrey, II
Humphrey Law PLLC
contact info
Defendant
Complete Pain Solutions, LLC
Represented By
Blake A Bailey
Phelps Dunbar LLP
contact info
Defendant
Danielle Bui Huynh
Represented By
Sammy Ford, IV
Ahmad, Zavitsanos & Mensing, PC
contact info
Defendant
David Singleton, M.D
Plaintiff
Farmers Insurance Exchange
Represented By
Scot Graves Doyen
Doyen Sebesta & Poelma, Lllp
contact info
Plaintiff
Farmers Insurance Company, Inc.
Represented By
Scot Graves Doyen
Doyen Sebesta & Poelma, Lllp
contact info
Plaintiff
Farmers Texas County Mutual Insurance Company
Represented By
Scot Graves Doyen
Doyen Sebesta & Poelma, Lllp
contact info
Plaintiff
Fire Insurance Exchange
Represented By
Scot Graves Doyen
Doyen Sebesta & Poelma, Lllp
contact info
Plaintiff
Foremost County Mutual Insurance Company
Represented By
Scot Graves Doyen
Doyen Sebesta & Poelma, Lllp
contact info
Plaintiff
Mid-Century Insurance Company
Represented By
Scot Graves Doyen
Doyen Sebesta & Poelma, Lllp
contact info
Plaintiff
Foremost Insurance Company Grand Rapids, Michigan
Represented By
Scot Graves Doyen
Doyen Sebesta & Poelma, Lllp
contact info
Plaintiff
Bristol West Specialty Insurance
Represented By
Scot Graves Doyen
Doyen Sebesta & Poelma, Lllp
contact info
Plaintiff
Foremost Signature Insurance Company
Represented By
Scot Graves Doyen
Doyen Sebesta & Poelma, Lllp
contact info
Plaintiff
Texas Farmers Insurance Company
Represented By
Scot Graves Doyen
Doyen Sebesta & Poelma, Lllp
contact info
Plaintiff
21st Century Centennial Insurance Co.
Represented By
Scot Graves Doyen
Doyen Sebesta & Poelma, Lllp
contact info
Plaintiff
Truck Insurance Exchange
Represented By
Scot Graves Doyen
Doyen Sebesta & Poelma, Lllp
contact info
Plaintiff
Home State County Mutual Insurance Company
Represented By
Scot Graves Doyen
Doyen Sebesta & Poelma, Lllp
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
Texas Regional Clinic, LLC
Terminated: 11/15/2022
Represented By
Sammy Ford, IV
Ahmad, Zavitsanos & Mensing, PC
contact info
Harry Jay Hulings
Davis & Santos, PC
contact info
Jason Murray Davis
Davis & Santos Attorneys & Counselors, P.C.
contact info

GPO Mar 12 2024
MEMORANDUM AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 62 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Rules 12(b)1, 12(b)(6), and 9(b), 58 Opposed MOTION to Dismiss or Alternatively, Motion for More Definite Statement, 60 MOTION to Dismiss Under Rule 12(b)(6), 61 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , 54 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Objections to M&R due by 3/26/2024(Signed by Magistrate Judge Andrew M Edison) Parties notified.(GeorgeCardenas, 3)
GPO Mar 27 2024
ORDER ADOPTING MAGISTRATE JUDGE'S 83 MEMORANDUM AND RECOMMENDATION granting Defendants' MOTION to Dismiss (Dkts. 54, 58, 60, 61, and 62).(Signed by Judge George C Hanks, Jr) Parties notified. (KimberlyPicota, 4)

Docket last updated: 05/25/2023 10:45 PM CDT
Friday, June 24, 2022
1 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ATXSDC-28368736) filed by Farmers Texas County Mutual Insurance Company, et al.(Doyen, Scot)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 5 pgs Exhibit,
Att: 2 Exhibit,
Att: 3 Exhibit,
Att: 4 Exhibit,
Att: 5 10 pgs Exhibit,
Att: 6 Exhibit,
Att: 7 Exhibit,
Att: 8 Exhibit,
Att: 9 Exhibit,
Att: 10 4 pgs Exhibit,
Att: 11 Exhibit,
Att: 12 Exhibit,
Att: 13 Exhibit,
Att: 14 Exhibit,
Att: 15 Exhibit,
Att: 16 Exhibit,
Att: 17 Exhibit,
Att: 18 Exhibit,
Att: 19 Exhibit,
Att: 20 Exhibit,
Att: 21 Exhibit,
Att: 22 48 pgs Exhibit,
Att: 23 Exhibit,
Att: 24 43 pgs Exhibit,
Att: 25 Exhibit,
Att: 26 Exhibit,
Att: 27 Exhibit,
Att: 28 Exhibit,
Att: 29 Exhibit,
Att: 30 Exhibit