Ohio Southern District Court
Judge:Michael R Barrett
Case #: 1:14-cv-00712
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Case Filed:Sep 06, 2014
Terminated:Apr 27, 2015
Last checked: Sunday May 10, 2015 10:40 PM EDT
Defendant
Sgt. Chris Bowen
Highland County Sheriff's Office Highland County Sheriff's Office 130 Homestead Avenue
Hillsboro, OH 45133
Represented By
Daniel T Downey
Fishel, Hass, Kim & Albrecht, LLP
contact info
Melanie J. Williamson
Fishel Hass Kim Albrecht LLP
contact info
Melanie J Williamson
Fishel Hass Kim Albrecht LLP
contact info
Defendant
Highland County Sheriff's Office
130 Homestead Avenue
Hillsboro, OH 45133
Represented By
Daniel T Downey
Fishel, Hass, Kim & Albrecht, LLP
contact info
Melanie J. Williamson
Fishel Hass Kim Albrecht LLP
contact info
Melanie J Williamson
Fishel Hass Kim Albrecht LLP
contact info
Defendant
Deputy Jeff Vickers
Highland County Sheriff's Office Highland County Sheriff's Office 130 Homestead Ave.
Hillsboro, OH 45133
Represented By
Daniel T Downey
Fishel, Hass, Kim & Albrecht, LLP
contact info
Melanie J. Williamson
Fishel Hass Kim Albrecht LLP
contact info
Melanie J Williamson
Fishel Hass Kim Albrecht LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Donald Mckenzie
11688 Highland Hills Dr.
Hillsboro, OH 45133
Represented By
Joshua A Engel
Joshua A. Engel, LLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 8 hours ago
Friday, April 24, 2015
11 11 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Fri 04/24 3:07 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal by Plaintiff Donald Mckenzie. (Engel, Joshua)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 10, 2015
minutes Status Conference Tue 02/10 5:14 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Michael R. Barrett: Status Conference held on 2/10/2015; Joshua Engel appeared for Plaintiff; Melanie Williamson appeared for Defendant; Court to conduct exparte conferences; calendar to proceed. (ba1)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 26, 2015
10 10 order Cincinnati Preliminary Pretrial Order Mon 01/26 3:54 PM
CALENDAR ORDER: Amended Pleadings due by 8/21/2015. Lay Witness due by 11/30/2015. Status Conference set for 2/10/2015 at 04:45 PM by teleconference before Judge Michael R. Barrett. Plaintiff Primary Expert due by 8/21/2015. Plaintiff Rebuttal Expert due by 11/30/2015. Defendant Primary Expert due by 10/19/2015. Discovery due by 12/20/2015. Motions due by 1/11/2016. Settlement Conference set for 3/3/2016 at 09:30 AM in Chambers before Judge Michael R. Barrett. Final Pretrial Conference set for 5/27/2016 at 09:30 AM in Chambers before Judge Michael R. Barrett. Status Conference set for 1/7/2016 at 09:30 AM by teleconference before Judge Michael R. Barrett. Jury trial 7/2016. Signed by Judge Michael R. Barrett on 1/26/15. (ba1)
Related: [-]
minutes Scheduling Conference Mon 01/26 1:19 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Michael R. Barrett: Scheduling Conference held on 1/26/2015; Joshua Engel appeared for Plaintiff; Melanie Williamson appeared for Defendant calendar order to follow. (ba1)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 09, 2015
9 9 misc Rule 26(f) Report Fri 01/09 11:26 AM
RULE 26(f) REPORT (JOINT AGREED) by Plaintiff Donald Mckenzie. (Engel, Joshua)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 22, 2014
8 8 notice Notice of Telephone Conference Mon 12/22 9:16 AM
NOTICE: Please be aware that a Scheduling Conference is set for 1/26/2015 at 10:00 AM by teleconference before Judge Michael R. Barrett; Rule 26(f) due 1/19/15; YOU MUST ACCESS THIS DOCUMENT TO OBTAIN CONFERENCING INFORMATION. PLEASE BE AWARE THAT YOU MUST BE LOGGED INTO CM/ECF THROUGH THE COURTS WEBSITE (NOT PACER) AT WWW.OHSD.USCOURTS.GOV USING YOUR OWN PASSWORD BEFORE RETRIEVING THIS DOCUMENT THROUGH THE NOTICE OF ELECTRONIC FILING. NOTE: You will be required to use this information each time the Court conducts a telephone conference. (ba1)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 06, 2014
7 7 DEFENDANTS' ANSWER to1 Complaint with Jury Demand filed by Chris Bowen, Highland County Sheriff's Office, Jeff Vickers. (Downey, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 08, 2014
6 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Waiver sent to Highland County Sheriff's Office on 9/8/2014, answer due 11/7/2014. (Engel, Joshua)
Related: [-]
5 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Waiver sent to Chris Bowen on 9/8/2014, answer due 11/7/2014. (Engel, Joshua)
Related: [-]
4 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Waiver sent to Jeff Vickers on 9/8/2014, answer due 11/7/2014. (Engel, Joshua)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 24, 2014
3 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Melanie J Williamson for Defendants Chris Bowen, Highland County Sheriff's Office, Jeff Vickers (Williamson, Melanie)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 23, 2014
2 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel T Downey for Defendants Chris Bowen, Highland County Sheriff's Office, Jeff Vickers (Downey, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 08, 2014
1 1 COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against All Defendants, filed by Donald Mckenzie. (Engel, Joshua)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet
Filing fee: $ 400.00, receipt number 0648-4715822 (sct1)
Related: [-]