Utah District Court
Judge:Dale A Kimball
Referred: Dustin B Pead
Case #: 2:22-cv-00426
Nature of Suit350 Torts - Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle
Cause28:1441 Notice of Removal- Tort/Motor Vehicle (P.I.)
Case Filed:Jun 24, 2022
Terminated:Nov 13, 2023
Case in other court:3rd District Court, Salt Lake County, 220901777
Last checked: Wednesday Dec 21, 2022 2:18 AM MST
Counter Claimant
Cincinnati Insurance Company, The
Represented By
Karmen Schmid
Strong & Hanni
contact info
Counter Defendant
Paul Telford
Represented By
Mark L. Carlson
Carlson Injury Law
contact info
Defendant
Cincinnati Insurance Company, The
Represented By
Karmen Schmid
Strong & Hanni
contact info
Plaintiff
Paul Telford
Represented By
Mark L. Carlson
Carlson Injury Law
contact info


Docket last updated: 10 hours ago
Monday, November 13, 2023
18 18 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Dismiss Mon 11/13 9:32 AM
ORDER granting 17 Stipulated Motion to Dismiss All Claims with Prejudice. The parties shall bear their own respective costs and fees. This action is closed. Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead is no longer assigned to case. Signed by Judge Dale A. Kimball on 11/13/2023. (eat)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 10, 2023
17 17 motion Dismiss Fri 11/10 12:40 PM
Stipulated MOTION to Dismiss All Claims with Prejudice filed by Defendant Cincinnati Insurance Company, The.(Schmid, Karmen)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order to Dismiss All Claims with Prejudice
Monday, January 09, 2023
16 16 notice Notice (Other) Mon 01/09 1:50 PM
NOTICE of Deposition by Cincinnati Insurance Company, The Deposition of Paul Telford (Schmid, Karmen)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 14, 2022
15 15 5 pgs order Order on Motion for Scheduling Order Mon 11/14 12:36 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER granting 14 Motion for Scheduling Order. Amended Pleadings due by 2/1/2023. Joinder of Parties due by 2/1/2023. Expert Discovery due by 10/1/2023. Dispositive Motions due by 11/30/2023. 6-Day Jury Trial is set for 7/1/2024 at 08:30 AM in Rm 3.400 before Judge Dale A. Kimball. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead on 11/14/2022. (eat)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 02, 2022
14 14 motion Scheduling Order Wed 11/02 9:24 AM
MOTION for Scheduling Order filed by Plaintiff Paul Telford. Motions referred to Dustin B. Pead.(Carlson, Mark)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 21, 2022
12 12 answer Answer to Counterclaim Thu 07/21 2:51 PM
ANSWER to10 Counterclaim filed by Paul Telford. (eat) (Main Document 12 replaced on 7/21/2022) (nl)
Related: [-]
11 11 respoth Response (NOT to motion) Thu 07/21 2:34 PM
*DOCKET ENTRY ERROR* Disregard, see Docket Entry12 for correct entry. First RESPONSE to Counterclaim filed by Paul Telford. (Carlson, Mark) Modified by striking entry and adding error text on 7/21/2022 (eat)
Related: [-]
misc Modification of Docket Thu 07/21 2:55 PM
Modification of Docket: re11 Response to Counterclaim. The Counter Defendant filed the document under the wrong event. The clerk has refiled the document as docket entry12 Answer to Counterclaim. No further action is required by the parties at this time. (eat)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 01, 2022
10 10 cmp Counterclaim Fri 07/01 3:00 PM
COUNTERCLAIM against Paul Telford filed by Cincinnati Insurance Company, The. (Defendant's9 Answer contained a counterclaim, but Defendant did not select that option when filing its Answer so the clerk has refiled the document as a separate event on the docket.) (eat)
Related: [-]
9 9 respoth Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal) Fri 07/01 2:26 PM
ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal2 ) with Jury Demand filed by Cincinnati Insurance Company, The. (Schmid, Karmen)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 29, 2022
order Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge Wed 06/29 10:36 AM
ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead under 28:636 (b)(1)(A), Magistrate to hear and determine all nondispositive pretrial matters. No attached document. Signed by Judge Dale A. Kimball on 6/29/2022. (eat)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 28, 2022
misc Received Consent /Reassignment Form Tue 06/28 1:56 PM
RECEIVED Consent/Reassignment Form from Plaintiff Paul Telford. (alf)
Related: [-]
utility Reassignment to District Judge Tue 06/28 1:57 PM
All Consent/Reassignment Forms have now been received. After review of all forms, Case Reassigned to District Judge per request of one or more party(s). Case randomly assigned to Judge Dale A. Kimball. Magistrate Judge Jared C. Bennett no longer assigned to the case. (alf)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 27, 2022
4 4 notice Notice of Presiding Magistrate Assignment Mon 06/27 9:36 AM
NOTICE - This case is assigned to a magistrate judge. To consent or request reassignment, use[LINK:the form on this link] or use the included form for non-efilers and send it to consents@utd.uscourts.gov within 15 days or mail to the court with Attention: Consent Clerk on the envelope. Notice e-mailed or mailed to Defendant Cincinnati Insurance Company, The, Plaintiff Paul Telford. Form due by 7/12/2022. (alf)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Notice of ADR Mon 06/27 9:35 AM
NOTICE OF ADR, e-mailed or mailed to Defendant The Cincinnati Insurance Company, Plaintiff Paul Telford. (alf)
Related: [-]
misc Received Consent /Reassignment Form Tue 06/28 7:25 AM
RECEIVED Consent/Reassignment Form from Defendant The Cincinnati Insurance Company. (alf)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 24, 2022
2 2 18 pgs notice Notice of Removal (Atty) Fri 06/24 4:48 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 3rd Judicial District Court Salt Lake County, case number 220901777, (Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AUTDC-4373019) filed by Cincinnati Insurance Company, The. Assigned to Magistrate Judge Jared C. Bennett (Schmid, Karmen)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet
1 1 misc Remark - New Case Fri 06/24 4:22 PM
Case has been indexed and assigned to Magistrate Judge Jared C. Bennett. Defendant Cincinnati Insurance Company, The is directed to E-File the Notice of Removal and cover sheet (found under Complaints and Other Initiating Documents) and pay the filing fee of $ 402 by the end of the business day. NOTE: The court will not have jurisdiction until the opening document is electronically filed and the filing fee paid in the CM/ECF system. Civil Summons may be issued electronically. Prepare the summons using the courts[LINK:PDF version] and email it to utdecf_clerk@utd.uscourts.gov for issuance. (mh)
Related: [-]