Kosiba v. Catholic Health Systems of Long Island, Inc.
Original Case: 2:21-cv-06416
Second Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals | |
Case #: | 0:22-cv-01356 |
Type | civil / private |
Nature of Suit | 446 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities - Other |
Case Filed: | Jun 23, 2022 |
Terminated: | Sep 28, 2022 |
Last checked: Thursday Sep 29, 2022 4:34 AM EDT |
Defendant - Appellee
Catholic Health Systems of Long Island, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
Andrew Kosiba
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 09/29/2022 4:27 AM EDT |
Thursday, June 23, 2022 | ||
1 | 1 NOTICE OF CIVIL APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellant Andrew Kosiba, FILED. [3337871] 22-1356 [Entered: 06/24/2022 02:07 PM] | |
Att: 1 2 pgs Dkt_Ntc_BK_CV_PR_Tax | ||
Att: 2 11 pgs Case FILED | ||
2 | 2 5 pgs DISTRICT COURT ORDER, entered in the district court as docket entry dated 05/26/2022, RECEIVED.[3337931] 22-1356 [Entered: 06/24/2022 03:17 PM] | |
3 | 3 ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[3337933] 22-1356 [Entered: 06/24/2022 03:18 PM] | |
Att: 1 1 pgs Notice_of_Index_or_ROA_Filed | ||
Att: 2 6 pgs Index/FRAP 10(d) in lieu of ROA FILED |