Securities Exchange Commission v. Moynes et al
Massachusetts District Court | |
Judge: | Richard G Stearns |
Case #: | 1:22-cv-11006 |
Nature of Suit | 850 Other Statutes - Securities/Commodities/Exchange |
Cause | 15:77 Securities Fraud |
Case Filed: | Jun 27, 2022 |
Terminated: | Mar 08, 2023 |
Last checked: Saturday Dec 24, 2022 3:49 AM EST |
Defendant
Digatrade Financial Corp.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Bradley J Moynes
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Vancap Ventures, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Securities Exchange Commission
33 Arch St, 24th Floor
Boston, MA 02110 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/28/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Wednesday, March 08, 2023 | ||
27 | 27
4
pgs
order
Judgment
Wed 03/08 10:38 AM
Judge Richard G. Stearns: ORDER entered. Final Judgment as to relief defendant Vancap Ventures, Inc. (Pacho, Arnold) |
|
26 | 26
8
pgs
order
Judgment
Wed 03/08 10:36 AM
Judge Richard G. Stearns: ORDER entered. Final Judgment as to defendant Digatrade Financial Corp. (Pacho, Arnold) |
|
25 | 25
9
pgs
order
Judgment
Wed 03/08 10:35 AM
Judge Richard G. Stearns: ORDER entered. Final Judgment as to defendant Bradley J. Moynes. (Pacho, Arnold) |
|
24 | 24
order
Order on Motion to Approve Consent Judgment
Wed 03/08 10:33 AM
Judge Richard G. Stearns: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting23 Assented to MOTION to Approve Consent Judgment as to all defendants. (Pacho, Arnold) |
|
Tuesday, March 07, 2023 | ||
23 | 23
motion
Approve Consent Judgment
Tue 03/07 1:33 PM
Assented to MOTION to Approve Consent Judgment as to all defendants by Securities Exchange Commission.(Shields, Kathleen) |
|
Att: 1 9 pgs Text of Proposed Order Final Judgment as to Moynes, | ||
Att: 2 8 pgs Consent of Moynes, | ||
Att: 3 8 pgs Text of Proposed Order Final Judgment as to Digatrade, | ||
Att: 4 Consent of Digatrade, | ||
Att: 5 4 pgs Text of Proposed Order Final Judgment as to Vancap Ventures, | ||
Att: 6 Consent as to Vancap | ||
Wednesday, January 04, 2023 | ||
22 | 22
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery
Wed 01/04 9:47 AM
Judge Richard G. Stearns: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting21 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to February 13, 2023 to Complete Discovery. (Pacho, Arnold) |
|
Tuesday, January 03, 2023 | ||
21 | 21
motion
Extension of Time to Complete Discovery
Tue 01/03 4:56 PM
Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to time for written discovery to February 13, 2023 to Complete Discovery by Securities Exchange Commission.(Shields, Kathleen) |
|
Monday, November 14, 2022 | ||
20 | 20
discov
Joint submission pursuant to Local Rule 16.1
Mon 11/14 2:27 PM
JOINT SUBMISSION pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 by Securities Exchange Commission.(Shields, Kathleen) |
|
Monday, October 31, 2022 | ||
19 | 19
order
Order
Mon 10/31 10:01 AM
Judge Richard G. Stearns: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered. Defendants Digatrade Financial Corp., Bradley J Moynes, and Vancap Ventures, Inc., having filed an Answer, the court, enters the following pretrial schedule. Initial disclosures required by Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a)(1) must be completed by 12/2/22. All amendments to the pleadings and/or joinder of additional parties shall be completed by 1/6/23. The court will permit 30 interrogatories, 30 requests for admissions and 30 document requests without leave of court and expects those requests to be filed with the opposition within 30 days of the initial disclosures. If the parties would like to participate in the court's mediation program, they must notify our docket clerk Arnold Pacho (617-748-9812) by 5/17/23 (it may take several weeks to get a mediation date). All fact discovery must be completed no later than 6/9/23. Dispositive Motions, if any, are due by 7/7/23, with Oppositions to dispositive motions due 7/28/23; Reply, if any, by leave of court. If a party intends to utilize an expert, they must file a notice on the docket no later than 5/12/23, in order for the court to consider whether an expert is appropriate and, if so, to alter the existing schedule. (Zierk, Marsha) |
|
Friday, October 28, 2022 | ||
18 | 18
answer
Answer to Complaint
Fri 10/28 1:38 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint with Jury Demand by Digatrade Financial Corp., Bradley J Moynes, Vancap Ventures, Inc..(Scammon, Kristen) |
|
Monday, September 26, 2022 | ||
17 | 17
notice
Notice of Appearance
Mon 09/26 3:14 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Alfred A. Day on behalf of Securities Exchange Commission (Day, Alfred) |
|
Monday, September 19, 2022 | ||
16 | 16
notice
Notice of Withdrawal of Appearance
Mon 09/19 12:29 PM
NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance by Miranda Hooker (Hooker, Miranda) |
|
Thursday, September 15, 2022 | ||
14 | 14
motion
Extension of Time to File Answer
Thu 09/15 2:24 PM
Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to October 28, 2022 to File Answer by Digatrade Financial Corp., Bradley J Moynes, Vancap Ventures, Inc..(Scammon, Kristen) |
|
13 | 13
notice
Notice of Appearance
Thu 09/15 2:22 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Kristen S. Scammon on behalf of Digatrade Financial Corp., Bradley J Moynes, Vancap Ventures, Inc. (Scammon, Kristen) |
|
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer
Thu 09/15 4:07 PM
Judge Richard G. Stearns: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting14 Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to October 28, 2022 to File Answer to 1 Complaint for All Defendants. There will be no further extensions. (Zierk, Marsha) |
||
Wednesday, July 13, 2022 | ||
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer
Wed 07/13 6:30 AM
Judge Richard G. Stearns: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting11 Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to 09/19/2022 to File Answer. (Zierk, Marsha) |
||
Tuesday, July 12, 2022 | ||
11 | 11
motion
Extension of Time to File Answer
Tue 07/12 4:41 PM
Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to 09/19/2022 to File Answer by Digatrade Financial Corp., Bradley J Moynes, Vancap Ventures, Inc..(Hooker, Miranda) |
|
10 | 10
notice
Notice of Appearance
Tue 07/12 4:37 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Miranda Hooker on behalf of Digatrade Financial Corp., Bradley J Moynes, Vancap Ventures, Inc. (Hooker, Miranda) |
|
Wednesday, July 06, 2022 | ||
9 | 9
notice
Notice of Appearance
Wed 07/06 12:19 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Jennifer A. Cardello on behalf of Securities Exchange Commission (Cardello, Jennifer) |
|
Thursday, June 30, 2022 | ||
8 | 8
service
Summons Returned Executed
Thu 06/30 4:11 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed Vancap Ventures, Inc. served on 6/30/2022, answer due 7/21/2022. (Shields, Kathleen) |
|
7 | 7
service
Summons Returned Executed
Thu 06/30 4:10 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed Digatrade Financial Corp. served on 6/30/2022, answer due 7/21/2022. (Shields, Kathleen) |
|
6 | 6
service
Summons Returned Executed
Thu 06/30 4:09 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed Bradley J Moynes served on 6/30/2022, answer due 7/21/2022. (Shields, Kathleen) |
|
Wednesday, June 29, 2022 | ||
notice
Notice of Case Assignment
Wed 06/29 7:06 AM
ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case RE-Assignment. Judge Richard G. Stearns assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Judith G. Dein. (Finn, Mary) |
||
Tuesday, June 28, 2022 | ||
order
Order Of Recusal
Tue 06/28 4:47 PM
Magistrate Judge Paul G Levenson: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered. ORDER OF RECUSAL.(York, Steve) |
||
Monday, June 27, 2022 | ||
3 | 3
2
pgs
service
Summons Issued
Mon 06/27 11:00 AM
Summons Issued as to Digatrade Financial Corp., Bradley J Moynes, Vancap Ventures, Inc.. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Dore, Samantha) |
|
2 | 2 NOTICE of Case Assignment. Paul G Levenson assigned to case. Plaintiff's counsel, or defendant's counsel if this case was initiated by the filing of a Notice of Removal, are directed to the Notice and Procedures regarding Consent to Proceed before the Magistrate Judge which can be downloaded [LINK:here] . These documents will be mailed to counsel not receiving notice electronically. Pursuant to General Order 09-3, until the Court receives for filing either a consent to the Magistrate Judge's jurisdiction or the reassignment of the case to a District Judge, the initial assignment of a civil case to the Magistrate Judge is a referral to the Magistrate Judge under 28 USC 636(b) for all pretrial non-dispositive matters and Report and Recommendations, but not for the Rule 16(b) scheduling conference. (Finn, Mary) | |
1 | 1
27
pgs
cmp
Complaint
Mon 06/27 10:09 AM
COMPLAINT against Digatrade Financial Corp., Bradley J Moynes (Fee Status: US Government), filed by Securities Exchange Commission.(Shields, Kathleen) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Category Sheet | ||
notice
Notice of Case Assignment to a Magistrate Judge
Mon 06/27 10:57 AM
NOTICE of Case Assignment. Paul G Levenson assigned to case. Plaintiff's counsel, or defendant's counsel if this case was initiated by the filing of a Notice of Removal, are directed to the Notice and Procedures regarding Consent to Proceed before the Magistrate Judge which can be downloaded [LINK:here] . These documents will be mailed to counsel not receiving notice electronically. Pursuant to General Order 09-3, until the Court receives for filing either a consent to the Magistrate Judge's jurisdiction or the reassignment of the case to a District Judge, the initial assignment of a civil case to the Magistrate Judge is a referral to the Magistrate Judge under 28 USC 636(b) for all pretrial non-dispositive matters and Report and Recommendations, but not for the Rule 16(b) scheduling conference. (Finn, Mary) |