Oregon District Court
Judge:Ann L Aiken
Case #: 6:22-cv-00917
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Employment Discrimination
Case Filed:Jun 27, 2022
Case in other court:Deschutes County Circuit Court, 22CV15330
Last checked: Saturday Dec 24, 2022 2:03 AM PST
Defendant
Team Drive In Bend, LLC
Represented By
Stephen M. Scott
Fisher & Phillips, LLP
contact info
Daniel Schmidt
Fisher & Phillips
contact info
Plaintiff
David McDaniel
Represented By
Christopher J. Kuhlman
Kuhlman Law, LLC
contact info

GPO Jun 30 2022
ORDER: Granting Stipulated Motion to Dismiss and, Motion to Remand to State Court 7. Signed on 6/30/2022 by Judge Ann L. Aiken. (ck)

Docket last updated: 53 minutes ago
Thursday, July 14, 2022
oth_evt Confirmation of Transmittal of Case to State Court Thu 07/14 9:32 AM
Confirmation of Transmittal of Case to Deschutes County via OJD website. (jw)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 30, 2022
9 9 oth_evt Transmittal of Case to State Court Thu 06/30 1:28 PM
Transmittal of Certified Copy of Docket Sheet and Certified Copy of Order on Motion to Dismiss, Order on Motion to Remand to Deschutes County Circuit Court8 . (jw)
Related: [-]
8 8 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Dismiss Order on Motion to Remand Thu 06/30 11:15 AM
ORDER: Granting Stipulated Motion to Dismiss and, Motion to Remand to State Court7 . Signed on 6/30/2022 by Judge Ann L. Aiken. (ck)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 28, 2022
7 7 motion Dismiss Remand Tue 06/28 4:17 PM
Stipulated Motion to Dismiss and , Motion to Remand to State Court. Filed by Team Drive In Bend, LLC. (Scott, Stephen)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 27, 2022
6 6 order 3 - Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order - FORM EVENT Mon 06/27 3:26 PM
Notice of Case Assignment to Judge Ann L. Aiken and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order. Discovery is to be completed by 10/25/2022. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 11/25/2022. Pretrial Order is due by 11/25/2022. Ordered by Judge Ann L. Aiken. (jw)
Related: [-]
5 5 3 pgs order Order Mon 06/27 11:19 AM
CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER. Signed on 6/27/2022 by Judge Ann L. Aiken. (ck)
Related: [-]
4 4 oth_doc Corporate Disclosure Statement Mon 06/27 10:40 AM
Corporate Disclosure Statement . Filed by Team Drive In Bend, LLC. (Scott, Stephen)
Related: [-]
3 3 oth_sup Certificate of Compliance Mon 06/27 10:38 AM
Certificate of Compliance (Notice of Removal) . Filed by Team Drive In Bend, LLC. (Scott, Stephen)
Related: [-]
2 2 16 pgs oth_sup Declaration Mon 06/27 10:36 AM
Declaration of Stephen Scott in Support of Notice of Removal . Filed by Team Drive In Bend, LLC. Related [+] (Scott, Stephen)
Related: [-] Notice of Removal,1 .
1 1 4 pgs cmp Notice of Removal Mon 06/27 10:31 AM
Notice of Removal of Case Number 22CV15330 from Deschutes County Circuit Court. Filing Fee in amount of $402 collected. Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-8566243 issued. Filer is subject to the requirements of Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1.. Filed by Team Drive In Bend, LLC. (Scott, Stephen)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 2 pgs Civil Cover Sheet