Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 8:22-bk-80649

Alabama Northern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Clifton R Jessup Jr
Case #: 8:22-ap-80233
Nature of Suit14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Jun 24, 2022
Terminated:Jan 13, 2023
Last checked: never
Defendant
Alteon Health, LLC
12420 Milestone Center Drive, Ste. 200
Germantown, MD 20876
Plaintiff
Devonna Talley
1715 S. Scott St.
Scottsboro, AL 35768
Represented By
John C. Larsen
Larsen Law, P.C.
contact info
Trustee
Judith Thompson
P. O. Box 18966
Huntsville, AL 35804


Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Friday, January 13, 2023
court Close Adversary Case Fri 01/13 3:31 PM
Adversary Case 8:22-ap-80233 Closed (mmb)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 15, 2022
20 20 court BNC Certificate of Notice Thu 12/15 11:37 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice Related [+]. Notice Date 12/15/2022. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 18 Order on Application for Compensation
19 19 court BNC Certificate of Notice Thu 12/15 11:37 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice Related [+]. Notice Date 12/15/2022. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 17 Order on Motion to Approve Compromise and/or Settlement
Tuesday, December 13, 2022
18 18 order Compensation Tue 12/13 3:23 PM
Order Approving Application For Compensation Related [+] for John C. Larsen, Debtor's Attorney, Period: to , Fees awarded: $4050, Expenses awarded: $0.00; Awarded on 12/13/2022 Signed on 12/13/2022. (dwh)
Related: [-] #12
17 17 order Approve Compromise and/or Settlement Tue 12/13 3:17 PM
Order Approving Motion to Approve Compromise and/or Settlement Related [+] Signed on 12/13/2022. (dwh)
Related: [-] #11
Tuesday, December 06, 2022
15 15 trustee Bankruptcy Administrator Statement of Review Regarding Application for Comp & Reimburse Tue 12/06 1:47 PM
Bankruptcy Administrator's Statement of Review Regarding Application for Compensation and Reimbursement of Expenses Filed by Bankruptcy Administrator Richard M Blythe Related [+]. (Blythe, Richard)
Related: [-] 12 Application for Compensation of Attorney's Fee for John C. Larsen, Debtor's Attorney, Period: 6/17/2022 to 12/12/2022, Fee: $4,050.00, Expenses: $. Filed by Attorney John C. Larsen filed by Plaintiff Devonna Talley
Thursday, November 10, 2022
14 14 court BNC Certificate of Notice Thu 11/10 11:36 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice Related [+]. Notice Date 11/10/2022. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 13 Notice of Hearing
Tuesday, November 08, 2022
13 13 court Notice of Hearing-Van200 Tue 11/08 4:01 PM
Notice of Hearing on Related [+] Hearing scheduled 12/12/2022 at 10:00 AM at 3rd Floor Courtroom (CRJ) Decatur. (dwh)
Related: [-] 11 Motion to Approve Compromise and/or Settlement filed by Plaintiff Devonna Talley,12 Application for Compensation filed by Plaintiff Devonna Talley
12 12 motion Compensation Tue 11/08 11:27 AM
Application for Compensation of Attorney's Fee for John C. Larsen, Debtor's Attorney, Period: 6/17/2022 to 12/12/2022, Fee: $4,050.00, Expenses: $. Filed by Attorney John C. Larsen (Larsen, John)
Related: [-]
11 11 motion Approve Compromise and/or Settlement - Motion Tue 11/08 11:24 AM
Motion to Approve Compromise and/or Settlement Regarding Alleged Stay Violation under Rule 9019 and Approval of Attorney's Fee Filed by Plaintiff Devonna Talley (Larsen, John)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 14, 2022
10 10 court BNC Certificate of Notice Wed 09/14 11:38 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice Related [+]. Notice Date 09/14/2022. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 9 Order Vacating Order
Monday, September 12, 2022
9 9 order Vacating Order Mon 09/12 9:06 AM
Order Vacating Status Conference and Remaining Deadlines Signed on 9/12/2022 Related [+]. (dwh)
Related: [-] 6 Order and Notice of Status Conference
Friday, September 09, 2022
8 8 misc Report to Court Fri 09/09 1:27 PM
Report to Court Notice of Settlement Filed by Plaintiff Devonna Talley. (Larsen, John)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 08, 2022
7 7 court BNC Certificate of Notice Thu 09/08 11:40 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice Related [+]. Notice Date 09/08/2022. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 6 Order and Notice of Status Conference
Tuesday, September 06, 2022
6 6 2 pgs order Order and Notice of Status Conference Tue 09/06 11:44 AM
Order: (1) Requiring Affidavits and Briefs: and (2) Scheduling Status Conference Signed on 9/6/2022. Status hearing to be held on 10/26/2022 at 10:00 AM at Huntsville Federal Building (CRJ). (bng)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 02, 2022
5 5 answer Answer Fri 09/02 10:25 AM
Answer Related [+] Filed by Defendant Alteon Health, LLC (Keenan, George)
Related: [-] ;1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Devonna Talley
Thursday, August 25, 2022
4 4 misc Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Thu 08/25 4:27 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice by George Matthew Keenan Filed by Defendant Alteon Health, LLC. (Keenan, George)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 06, 2022
3 3 misc Certificate of Service Wed 07/06 3:58 PM
Certificate of Service Related [+]. (Larsen, John)
Related: [-] 2 Summons Issued Alteon Health, LLC Date Issued 6/24/2022, Answer Due 7/25/2022 (dwh)
Friday, June 24, 2022
2 2 cmp Summons Issued Fri 06/24 4:02 PM
Summons Issued Alteon Health, LLC Date Issued 6/24/2022, Answer Due 7/25/2022 (dwh)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Fri 06/24 2:03 PM
Adversary case 22-80233 14 Related [+]) Complaint by Devonna Talley against Alteon Health, LLC. Receipt Number N/A, Fee Amount $350 (Larsen, John)
Related: [-] covery of money/property - other
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 - BNC Certificate of Notice
Att: 2 Exhibit Exhibit 2 - Alteon Letter 5-11-22